County of Albany et al v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: County of Schuyler, City of Mobile, WCA Group Health Trust, MEBCO, County of Albany, County of Essex, MagnaCare Insurance, County of Erie, County of Columbia, Town of Amherst, County of Chenango, City of Poughkeepsie, County of Yates, County of Otsego, County of Oneida, County of Livingston, County of Osceola, COUNTY OF MONROE, County of Onondaga, County of Chemung, County of Shelby and County of Cattaraugus
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC, UDL LABORATORIES INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TELIGENT INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, IMPAX LABORATORIES INC., VERSAPHARM INC., TORRENT PHARMA INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK INC., CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD., GREENSTONE LLC, Bausch Health US Inc., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, MYLAN N.V, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, MYLAN INC, JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL INC, MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, APOTEX CORP., SANDOZ INC, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., URL Pharma, Inc., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, Mayne Pharma USA Inc., ALVOGEN INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, G & W LABORATORIES, Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Inc Pfizer, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01875
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01650. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 20, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 15) IN RE: GENERIC PHARMACEUTICALS PRICING ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL No. 2724. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 15) IN RE: GENERIC PHARMACEUTICALS PRICING ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL No. 2724. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received from County Clerk's Office; State of New York; County of Suffolk, Index No, 619573/2020. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants response to Complaint due either: (a) 60 days after the entry of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL);or (b) a time agreed upon by the parties or ordered by the Eastern District of Pennsylvania following the transfer of this case to the action captioned In Re Generic Pharmaceuticals Pricing Antitrust Litigation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/2/2021. (Trimes, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc.. (Ahuja, Jasmeet) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 1, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. AttentionAlastair J.M. Findeis, Thomas A. Narducci, Seth Davis, Seth A. Moskowitz, Edward M. Mathias, Michael L. Keeley, Rachel Adcox, Lisa Rumin, Paul M. Thompson, Raymond Jacobsen, Melanie S. Carter, Terry M. Henry, Sarah O'Laughlin Kulik, Sean McConnell, Wayne A. Mack, Robin D. Adelstein, Alison Tanchyk, Amanda B. Robinson, J. Gordon Cooney, Jr., John Pease, William T. McEnroe, Sarah E. Hsu Wilbur, Heather Lamberg-Kafele, Keith R. Palfin, Anne E. Lemmo, Christopher P. Wilson, Erik T. Koons, Lauri A. Kavulich, Lindsay S. Fouse, Stacey L. Turner, John P. McClam, Tiffany E. Engsell, John E. Schmidtlein Sarah F. Kirkpatrick, Aaron Van Nostrand, Brian T. Feeney, Laura S. Shores, Melina R. DiMattio, R. Brendan Fee, Steven A. Reed, Wendy West Feinstein, Andrew C. Bernasconi, Edward B. Schwartz, Nicholas V. Albu, Jan P. Levine, Michael J. Hartman, Robin P. Summer, Jeremy A. Rist, Leiv Blad, Zarema Jaramillo, Brian J. Smith, Lauren Norris Donahue, Michael Martinez, Setven Kowal, Adam K. Levin, Benjamin Holt, Justin W. Bernick, Harvey Bartle, IV, John Clayton Everett, Scott Alan Stempel, Tracey F. Milich, Ben C. Fabens-Lassen, Edward S. Scheidman, Ilana H. Eisenstein, Devora Allon, Bradley Kitlowski, Jason R. Parish, Martin J. Amundson, George G. Gordon, Gerald Arth, Julia Chapman, Nathan Buchter, Ryan Becker. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Kirchner, Mary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/31/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Viatris Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan Holdings Sub Inc. for Mylan Inc.. (Ahuja, Jasmeet) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 619573/2020. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYEDC-14317585) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Filings, #5 Certificate of Service) (Ahuja, Jasmeet) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Albany et al v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: JASMEET AHUJA
Represented By: JUSTIN W. BERNICK
Represented By: ADAM K. LEVIN
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Heather Lamberg-Kafele
Represented By: KEITH R. PALFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT INC.
Represented By: HEATHER K. MCDEVITT
Represented By: BRYAN DANIEL GANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA LABS, INC.
Represented By: Robin P. Summer
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: NICOLE L. CASTLE
Represented By: Lisa Rumin
Represented By: PAUL M. THOMPSON
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMA INC.
Represented By: ADAM C. HEMLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK INC.
Represented By: TRACEY F MILICH
Represented By: J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: Stacy L. Turner
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health US Inc.
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: NICOLE L. CASTLE
Represented By: Lisa Rumin
Represented By: PAUL M. THOMPSON
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC
Represented By: JASMEET AHUJA
Represented By: JUSTIN W. BERNICK
Represented By: ADAM K. LEVIN
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: JEREMY A. RIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: GEORGE G. GORDON
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: Gerald Arth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: NICHOLAS V. ALBU
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Peng-Rue
Represented By: GRANT R. MACQUEEN
Represented By: Sarah E. Hsu Wilbur
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: Stacy L. Turner
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: JOHN MCCLAM
Represented By: TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: SARAH F. KIRKPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: JASMEET AHUJA
Represented By: JUSTIN W. BERNICK
Represented By: ADAM K. LEVIN
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: MELANIE S. CARTER
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: MEG TRACI SLACHETKA
Represented By: ZAREMA A. JARAMILLO
Represented By: LEIV H. BLAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URL Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: DEVORA W. ALLON
Represented By: ALEXIA R BRANCATO
Represented By: JAY P. LEFKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayne Pharma USA Inc.
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: Lauren Norris Donahue
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN INC.
Represented By: RACHEL ADCOX
Represented By: EDWARD M. MATHIAS
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KEELEY
Represented By: CRAIG M. REISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: SARAH F. KIRKPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: WENDY WEST FEINSTEIN
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & W LABORATORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: Aaron Van Nostrand
Represented By: ROGER B. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Represented By: ILANA H. EISENSTEIN
Represented By: Edward S. Scheidman
Represented By: BEN C. FABENS-LASSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: WAYNE A. MACK
Represented By: Sarah O'Laughlin Kulik
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Represented By: Robin P. Summer
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.
Represented By: Robin P. Summer
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Represented By: Martin J. Amundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: NICOLE L. CASTLE
Represented By: Lisa Rumin
Represented By: PAUL M. THOMPSON
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC.
Represented By: Robin P. Summer
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Schuyler
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Mobile
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WCA Group Health Trust
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEBCO
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Albany
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Essex
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MagnaCare Insurance
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Erie
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Columbia
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Amherst
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Chenango
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Poughkeepsie
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Yates
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Otsego
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Oneida
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Livingston
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Osceola
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF MONROE
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Onondaga
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Chemung
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Shelby
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Cattaraugus
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Alastair J.M. Findeis
Represented By: Thomas A. Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?