ESTATE OF JOHNSON v. STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHNSON
Defendant: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, MARK COPOULOS doing business as BRUCHA HOLDINGS REALTY, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, BANK OF NEW YORK, JASON YATES, JAY ROSENBERG doing business as AVENUE 365 LENDER SERVICES, JAMES LEONARD, DAN EGAN doing business as NEW PENN FINANCIAL, JOEL FURLOS INTERLOPER doing business as BRUCHA HOLDINGS REALTY, LLC, JOSH SHAPIRO doing business as ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, MARCIA FUDGE, DIANE CORTES, CHARLES RETTIG and NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 2:2021cv04597
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR EMERGENCY STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/14/21.12/15/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT AND FOR JOINDER OF ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFFS (DOC. NO. 10) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS ALSO ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST (DOC. NO. 3) AND PRAECIPE TO AMEND RESPONDENT(S) AND ENTER CRIMINAL COMPLAINT AND ORDER (DOC. NO. 4) ARE DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/10/2021.12/13/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE.(ahf)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 PETITION by ESTATE OF JOHNSON FOR EMERGENCY STAY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (JL )
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE FILING.(sg, ) Modified on 12/13/2021 (sg, ). (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/13/2021) (sg, ).
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Support of Motion filed by BANK OF NEW YORK, DAN EGAN, NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, JASON YATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STACKO, JEFFREY)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 CLAIMANT BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT AND FOR JOINDER OF ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFFS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. No envelope included. (JL ) Modified on 11/29/2021 (lisad, ).
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum of Law in Support re #8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BANK OF NEW YORK, DAN EGAN, NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, JASON YATES. (STACKO, JEFFREY)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BANK OF NEW YORK, DAN EGAN, NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, JASON YATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STACKO, JEFFREY)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY STACKO on behalf of BANK OF NEW YORK, DAN EGAN, JASON YATES, NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (STACKO, JEFFREY) Modified on 11/19/2021 (md, ).
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MUST FOLLOW THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND THE LOCAL RULES OF THE COURT IN SEEKING ANY RELIEF AND SHALL REFRAIN FROM TELEPHONE CALLS TO THE JUDGE'S CHAMBERS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/26/21. 10/26/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 PRAECIPE by ESTATE OF JOHNSON TO AMEND RESPONDENTS AND ENTER CRIMINIAL COMPLAINT AND ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. No envelope included. (JL ) Modified on 10/26/2021 (lisad, ).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST by ESTATE OF JOHNSON. No envelope included - e-mailed to chambers. (JL ) Modified on 10/25/2021 (lisad, ).
October 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to BANK OF NEW YORK, MARK COPOULOS, DIANE CORTES, DAN EGAN, MARCIA FUDGE, JOEL FURLOS, JAMES LEONARD, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, CHARLES RETTIG, JAY ROSENBERG, JOSH SHAPIRO, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, JASON YATES. E-MAILED To: PRO SE on 10/21/21 (bw, )
October 21, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE233164 (sg, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - NOTICE OF REMOVAL against BANK OF NEW YORK, MARK COPOULOS, DIANE CORTES, DAN EGAN, MARCIA FUDGE, JOEL FURLOS, JAMES LEONARD, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, CHARLES RETTIG, JAY ROSENBERG, JOSH SHAPIRO, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, JASON YATES, filed by ESTATE OF JOHNSON. NOTICE OF REMOVAL ATTACHED. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw, )
October 20, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ESTATE OF JOHNSON. (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF JOHNSON v. STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK COPOULOS doing business as BRUCHA HOLDINGS REALTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NEW YORK
Represented By: JEFFREY M. STACKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON YATES
Represented By: JEFFREY M. STACKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY ROSENBERG doing business as AVENUE 365 LENDER SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN EGAN doing business as NEW PENN FINANCIAL
Represented By: JEFFREY M. STACKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL FURLOS INTERLOPER doing business as BRUCHA HOLDINGS REALTY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO doing business as ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIA FUDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES RETTIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: JEFFREY M. STACKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?