SILVERBERG v. DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC. et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD J. SILVERBERG
Defendant: DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC., DOW, INC., CORTEVA, INC., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES, INC, AVANTOR, INC., LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC., THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, BALLARD SPAHR LLP, GELLERT SCALI BUSENKELL & BROWN LLC, OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL, EDWARD BREEN, ANDREW LIVERIS, RAJIV GUPTA, ANDREAS FIBIG, DAVID H. LONG, TIMOTHY BUCKLEY, JANET HAAS, M.D., JAMES KENNEY, MARCEL S. PRATT, DIANA CORTES, MARISSA O'CONNELL, BRIAN R. CULLIN, GARY F. SEITZ, THOMAS J. FARRELL, RICHARD HERNANDEZ, JOSHUA ROBERTS, DANIEL ANDERS and JOHN DOE NOS. 1-5
Case Number: 2:2024cv00924
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 50 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #48 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. USCA Case Number 24-1775 (er)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT UNTIL OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT, ANY PRETRIAL FILINGS BY ANY PARTY OR PARTIES IN EITHER OF THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES SHALL USE THE ABOVE DUAL CAPTION AND SHALL BE FILED IN BOTH CASES.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/26/24. 4/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
April 25, 2024 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEAL by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-17422907. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 16, 2024 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. GARY F. SEITZ waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 16, 2024 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. GELLERT SCALI BUSENKELL & BROWN LLC waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 15, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY FRANCIS SEITZ on behalf of GELLERT SCALI BUSENKELL & BROWN LLC, GARY F. SEITZ (SEITZ, GARY)
April 12, 2024 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. DAVID H. LONG waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 12, 2024 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 11, 2024 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM B. SHUEY on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL with Certificate of Service(SHUEY, WILLIAM)
April 10, 2024 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. CORTEVA, INC. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES, INC waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. AVANTOR, INC. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. BALLARD SPAHR LLP waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. EDWARD BREEN waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. RAJIV GUPTA waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. ANDREAS FIBIG waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 10, 2024 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. MARCEL S. PRATT waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 5, 2024 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., TIMOTHY BUCKLEY. THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., TIMOTHY BUCKLEY waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (BAUGHMAN, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/8/2024 (lisad, ).
April 5, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. BAUGHMAN on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., TIMOTHY BUCKLEY with Certificate of Service(BAUGHMAN, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/8/2024 (lisad, ).
April 5, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN H. CALLAWAY on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., TIMOTHY BUCKLEY with Certificate of Service(CALLAWAY, BRIAN) Modified on 4/8/2024 (lisad, ).
April 3, 2024 Filing 28 Letter to the Courts Re: Silverberg v. DuPont de Nemours, et al. dated 4/1/24 by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG (bw)
April 3, 2024 Filing 27 Letter to the Courts Re: Silverberg v. DuPont de Nemours, et al. dated 3/19/24 by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG (bw)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT THE SUBJECT TO THE EXCEPTIONS NOTED IN PARAGRAPH 2 BELOW, ALL SUBMISSIONS TO THE COURT REGARDING SUBSTANTIVE MATTERS BEFORE THE COURT FOR DECISION SHALL BE FILED OF RECORD VIA CM/ECF OR OTHERWISE IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 5.1.2 OR THE WAYS TO FILE INSTRUCTIONS FOR PRO SE LITIGANTS (AVAILABLE AT HTTPS://WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV/PRO-SE/PRO-SE-COMPLAINT) AND SHALL NOT BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT VIA EMAIL OR OTHER CORRESPONDENCE. EMAIL OR OTHER CORRESPONDENCE TO THE COURT IS ONLY PERMITTED REGARDING PROCEDURAL OR ADMINISTRATIVE INQUIRES OR JOINT REQUESTS, SUCH AS AGREED-UPON REQUESTS FOR SCHEDULE MODIFICATION OR EXTENSION, NOTIFICATION TO THE COURT THAT THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED A SETTLEMENT, AND JOINT REQUESTS FOR A CONFERENCE WHERE THE PARTIES HAVE BEEN UNABLE TO RESOLVE A DISCOVERY DISPUTE THROUGH THE MEET AND CONFER PROCESS. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN SUCH SANCTIONS AGAINST THE OFFENDING PARTY AS THE COURT DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/2/24. 4/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #8 IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED FOR PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND PROCEEDINGS. ALL DISCOVERY IN THESE MATTERS IS STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. WITH RESPECT TO ANY MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT OR ANY AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CASE NO. 24-924, AND ANY RESPONSES THERETO, THE PARTIES MAY: INCORPORATE AND STAND ON THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS OR RESPONSE PREVIOUSLY FILED IN CASE NO. 23-1868; INCORPORATE IN WHOLE OR IN PART THEIR PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION OR RESPONSE AND FILE SUCH SUPPLEMENT THERETO AS THEY DEEM NECESSARY TO RESPOND TO THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT IN CASE NO. 24-924; OR FILE A NEW, SEPARATE MOTION TO DISMISS OR RESPONSE THERETO WITH RESPECT TO THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT IN CASE NO. 24-924. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/2/24. 4/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
April 3, 2024 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/2/24. 4/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
April 2, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. BRIAN R. CULLIN waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 2, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. MARISSA O'CONNELL waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 2, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. DIANA CORTES waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 2, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. JAMES KENNEY waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 2, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
April 1, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by DANIEL ANDERS, THOMAS J. FARRELL, RICHARD HERNANDEZ, OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL, JOSHUA ROBERTS. (FEIGENBAUM, NICOLE)
March 29, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION. (Scott, Gabriella)
March 28, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina M. Peltz on behalf of DOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(Peltz, Bina)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART T. STEINBERG on behalf of DOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, STUART)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLA GRAFF on behalf of DOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(GRAFF, CARLA)
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Winton on behalf of JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(Winton, Jacqueline)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriella Maria Scott on behalf of JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(Scott, Gabriella)
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION, JANET HAAS, M.D.. WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024; JANET HAAS, M.D. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (KIRCHER, PHILIP)
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP G. KIRCHER on behalf of JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(KIRCHER, PHILIP)
March 22, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. DOW, INC. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
March 15, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(SILVERBERG, RICHARD).
March 11, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. THOMAS J. FARRELL waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. RICHARD HERNANDEZ waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. JOSHUA ROBERTS waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. DANIEL ANDERS waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DANIEL ANDERS, AVANTOR, INC., BALLARD SPAHR LLP, EDWARD BREEN, TIMOTHY BUCKLEY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA CORTES, CORTEVA, INC., BRIAN R. CULLIN, DOW, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC., THOMAS J. FARRELL, ANDREAS FIBIG, GELLERT SCALI BUSENKELL & BROWN LLC, RAJIV GUPTA, JANET HAAS, M.D., RICHARD HERNANDEZ, INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES, INC, JAMES KENNEY, LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC., ANDREW LIVERIS, DAVID H. LONG, MARISSA O'CONNELL, OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL, MARCEL S. PRATT, JOSHUA ROBERTS, GARY F. SEITZ, THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/4/24 (bw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/7/2024) (bw).
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17302613.), filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SILVERBERG, RICHARD) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/4/2024) (sbt). Modified on 3/5/2024 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVERBERG v. DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD J. SILVERBERG
Represented By: RICHARD J. SILVERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOW, INC.
Represented By: STUART T. STEINBERG
Represented By: Bina M. Peltz
Represented By: CARLA GRAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORTEVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVANTOR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BAUGHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION
Represented By: PHILIP G. KIRCHER
Represented By: Gabriella Maria Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: WILLIAM B. SHUEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALLARD SPAHR LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GELLERT SCALI BUSENKELL & BROWN LLC
Represented By: GARY FRANCIS SEITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL
Represented By: NICOLE A. FEIGENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD BREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW LIVERIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJIV GUPTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREAS FIBIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H. LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY BUCKLEY
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BAUGHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET HAAS, M.D.
Represented By: PHILIP G. KIRCHER
Represented By: Gabriella Maria Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES KENNEY
Represented By: WILLIAM B. SHUEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL S. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANA CORTES
Represented By: WILLIAM B. SHUEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARISSA O'CONNELL
Represented By: WILLIAM B. SHUEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN R. CULLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM B. SHUEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY F. SEITZ
Represented By: GARY FRANCIS SEITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. FARRELL
Represented By: NICOLE A. FEIGENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Represented By: NICOLE A. FEIGENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA ROBERTS
Represented By: NICOLE A. FEIGENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL ANDERS
Represented By: NICOLE A. FEIGENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE NOS. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?