HOLT v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: DAVID HOLT, II
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STEVEN JOHNSON and KRISTAL TURNER-CHILDS
Case Number: 5:2010cv05510
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Berks
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES IS GRANTED IN PART; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS AWARDED $362,173.50 IN FEES AND $9,680.31 COSTS, FOR A TOTAL OF $371,853.81; AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVA NIA, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, SHALL REMIT THIS PAYMENT TO THE LAW OFFICE OF BRIAN M. PURICELLI, ESQ. NO LATER THAN 30 DAYS FROM ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, SUBJECT TO MR. PURICELLI PROVIDING ANY NECESSARY INFORMATION OR DOCUMENTATION REQUIRED BY THE COMMONWEALTH TO PROCESS THIS PAYMENT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/1/20. 5/1/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECUSAL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/17/20. 1/17/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL 263 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/30/18. 10/30/18 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS MATTER OF LAW, AS TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE VII (RETALIATION) IS GRANTED; THE DEFENDANT STEVEN JOHNSON'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AS TO PLAINTIFF' ;S PENNSYLVANIA HUMAN RELATIONS ACTION AIDING AND ABETTING CLIAM (RETALIATION) IS GRANTED; THE DEFENDANT GERALD BRAHL'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 EQUAL PROTECTION (RACE DISCRIMINATION) IS GRANTED; THE DEFENDANT KATHY JO WINTERBOTTOM'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 EQUAL PROTECTION IS DENIED; THE DEFENDANT KATHY JO WINTERBOTTOM'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AS TO PLAINTIFF' S SECTION 1983 EQUAL PROTECTION (RACE DISCRIMINATION) CLAIM FOR HER INITIATION OF AN IAD INVESTIGATION IS GRANTED; THE DEFENDANT KATHY JO WINTERBOTTOM'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 CLAIM FOR THE " SCHIZOPHRENIC MEMO" IS GRANTED; THE DEFENDANT KATHY JO WINTERBOTTOM'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 EQUAL PROTECTION CLAIM FOR HER DECISION NOT TO ASSIGN PLAINTIFF TO THE STATION COMMANDER POSITION, IS DENIED; T HE DEFENDANT KATHY JO WINTERBOTTOM'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 EQUAL PROTECTION CLAIM FOR HER DECISION NOT TO ASSIGN PLAINTIFF TO THE STATION COMMANDER POSITION, ON THE GROUNDS THAT THE AWARD WAS EXCESSIVE, IS CO NDITIONALLY DENIED. SHOULD PLAINTIFF NOT ACCEPT A REMITTITUR OF $150,000 AS TO THE COMPENSATORY AWARD AND $250,000 AS TO THE PUNITIVE DAMAGE AWARD BY 9/9/2015, THE MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL WILL BE GRANTED AND A NEW TRIAL WILL BE ORDERED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/19/15. 8/19/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BRAHL'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER DENYING HIM JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDMENT RETALIATION CLAIM (DOC. NO. 138) IS DENIED; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 135) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/14/2014. 8/15/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT "DEFENDANTS' POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL" 121 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/25/14. 6/25/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED, AND OUR 9/18/13 ORDER WHICH DENIED "DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT" (55) IS REAFFIRMED AS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/8/13. 10/8/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLT v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HOLT, II
Represented By: BRIAN M. PURICELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTAL TURNER-CHILDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?