GEIST v. AMMARY et al
Plaintiff: VICTORIA GEIST
Defendant: JASON AMMARY and CITY OF ALLENTOWN
Case Number: 5:2011cv07532
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Lehigh
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MAY SERVE A SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM ON MS. CARISSA THOMAS WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE DEFENDANTS MAY DEPOSE MS. CARISSA THOMAS WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER THE PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE THE DEFENDANTS WITH ANY CONTACT INFORMATION FOR MS. CARISSA THOMAS THE PLAINTIFF MAY HAVE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/6/2014. 10/7/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO.65) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 8/21/2014. 8/22/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kk, )
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 8) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I OF THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS III AND IV OF THE COMPLAINT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 12/20/2012. 12/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEIST v. AMMARY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA GEIST
Represented By: RICHARD J. ORLOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON AMMARY
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ALLENTOWN
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?