MCGEE v. ZAKEN et al
Petitioner: KEVIN DOUGLAS MCGEE
Respondent: MICHAEL ZAKEN, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Case Number: 5:2022cv02650
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Referring Judge: SCOTT W REID
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 Receipt of State Court Record on 8/23/22, sent from Clerk's Office to Chambers of Magistrate Judge Lloret. (fdc)
August 19, 2022 State Court Record received and forwarded to Judge Reid's Chambers. (ke)
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 Letter dated 8-9-22 by KEVIN DOUGLAS MCGEE Re: Correct Inmate Number (er)
August 9, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #7 TO PETITIONER ON 8/9/22. (jaa, )
August 9, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #6 TO PETITIONER ON 8/9/22. (jaa, )
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER TO THE CLAIMS IN MR. MCGEE'S HABEAS PETITION AND SUPPORTING LEGAL MEMORANDUM WITHIN 45 DAYS FRO THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK FOR THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF BERKS COUNTY SHALL FILED WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS ETC IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. MCGEE, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF BERKS COUNTY,CP-06-CR-3738-2013 WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 8/8/22. 8/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE SCOTT W. REID, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/8/22. 8/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
August 8, 2022 Copy of Habeas Petition #1 and Order #7 emailed to Berks County District Attorney's Office and the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General. (mbh)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Order #7 sent to CCP of Berks County, Pennsylvania. (mbh)
August 8, 2022 Copy of Habeas Petition #1 and Order #6 emailed to Berks County District Attorney's Office and the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General. (mbh)
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Election and Inmate No. Change and/or correction by KEVIN DOUGLAS MCGEE. (fdc)
July 25, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20000606 (sbt)
July 19, 2022 DOC 3 & IFP SHORT FORM MAILED TO MCGEE (rf, )
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MCGEE WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (SHORT FORM) BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/18/22. 7/18/22 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO MCGEE.(fdc)
July 11, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILLED BY KEVIN DOUNGLAS MCGEE. NO FILING FEE PAID. NO IFP. ENVELOPE INCLUDED. (mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGEE v. ZAKEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIN DOUGLAS MCGEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL ZAKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?