Providence St. Joseph Health et al v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Astera Health, Providence St. Joseph Health, UPMC, UHS of Delaware, MAYO CLINIC, Intermountain Health Care, Inc., Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Novant Health, Inc., RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., Ochsner Clinic Foundation, LEHIGH VALLEY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., WELLPATH LLC, Allina Health System, Fairview Health Services, Montefiore Medical Center, St Lukes Health Network, Inc. d/b/a St Lukes University Health Network, Lifespan Corporation, NYU Langone Hospitals, Peacehealth, Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health, Avera Health, UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health, COMMANDING OFFICER SANFORD, The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health, THE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA, UMass Memorial Care, Inc., Baystate Health, Inc., Care New England Health System doing business as Care New England, The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System, The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital, St. Lukes Health System, Ltd., MAIN LINE HEALTH INC, SELECT MEDICAL CORPORATION, Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare, Essentia Health, Baptist Health, WakeMed doing business as WakeMed Health & Hospitals, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health, Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview, Nationwide Childrens Hospital, Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Olmsted Medical Center, CentraCare Health System, Valley Health System, Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc., Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc., Nuvance Health, Guthrie Hospitals, Marana Heath Center, Inc., North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health, Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health, White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center, Billings Clinic, St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth, CaroMont Health, Inc., Lake Region Healthcare Corporation, Winona Health Services, Baxter County Hospital, Inc. doing business as Baxter Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Butler Health System, Berkshire Health Systems, Inc., International Community Health Services, Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc., Stamford Health, Inc., Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health, Lakewood Health System, Northfield Hospitals Clinics, Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center, Penn Highlands Healthcare, Excela Health, Welia Health, Erie Family Health Center, Inc., HealthPoint, Confluence Health, Conway Regional Health System, Logan Health, Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health, Mount Nittany Health System, Tri-County Health Care, Riverview Healthcare Association, Great Lakes Bay Health Centers, Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health, Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health, Overlake Hospital Medical Center, East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation, LifeCare Medical Center, Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center, Central Texas Community Health Centers doing business as CommUnity Care, Mille Lacs Health System, Fulton County Medical Center, Rivers Edge Hospital, Glacial Ridge Health System, Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc., Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health, Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Crusaders Central Clinic Association, Community Health Center of Snohomish, Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics, United Hospital District, Duval Pharmacy, Inc., Shasta Community Health Center, Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy, Ortonville Area Health Services, Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare, Millcreek Community Hospital, Health Partners of Western Ohio, Greater Lawrence Family Health Center, Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc., Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley, Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center, Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc., MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts, Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital, St. Thomas Community Health Center, Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital, Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc., Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital, Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health, Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center, Swift County-Benson Health Services, Sleepy Eye Medical Center, Murray County Medical Center, Cook Hospital, Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System, SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital, Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center, North Olympic Healthcare Network, Tri-Area Community Health, Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe, Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation, Madelia Health, Kittson Healthcare, Peak Vista Community Health Centers, Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc., The Chautauqua Center, Inc., North Big Horn Hospital District, Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health, MedCura Health, Inc., Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic, Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network, North Canyon Medical Center, Inc., Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics, St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health, Evangelical Community Health, Delta Memorial Hospital, Dallas County Medical Center, Valor Health and Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACETO CORPORATION, Akorn Operating Company LLC, AKORN SALES, INC., ALVOGEN INC., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, APOTEX CORP., ARA APRAHAMIAN, ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, David Berthold, Mitchell Blashinsky, Douglas Boothe, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JAMES BROWN, Maureen Cavanaugh, CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Tracy Sullivan DiValerio, Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA LLC, Marc Falkin, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, GLENMARK GENERICS INC., USA, James Grauso, KEVIN GREEN, GREENSTONE LLC, ROBIN HATOSY, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC, HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC, JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Walter Kaczmarek, HECTOR ARMANDO KELLUM, RAJIV MALIK, MALLINCKRODT INC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, Mayne Pharma LLC, SATISH MEHTA, MYLAN INC, MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,, Jill Nailor, James Nesta, Kurt Orlofski, Konstantin Ostaficiuk, Padagis US LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC., NISHA PATEL, Michael Perfetto, PERRIGO NEW YORK INC., Pfizer Inc, The Pharma Network, LLC, David Rekenthaler, Richard Rogerson, SANDOZ INC, Strides Pharma Inc., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., TORRENT PHARMA INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VERSAPHARM INC., VIATRIS INC., Erika Vogel-Baylor, JOHN WESOLOWSKI, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC and ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Case Number: 5:2023cv03636
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Referring Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 178 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alvogen Pharma US, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ALVOGEN INC..(KEELEY, MICHAEL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. KEELEY on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(KEELEY, MICHAEL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M. MATHIAS on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(MATHIAS, EDWARD)
November 8, 2023 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL ADCOX on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(ADCOX, RACHEL)
November 8, 2023 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by EVA YUNG on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(YUNG, EVA)
November 8, 2023 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Matthew Reiser on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(Reiser, Craig)
October 17, 2023 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD W. HAWTHORNE on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(HAWTHORNE, DONALD)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION (MDL DOC NO. 2658) IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/11/23. 10/11/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL.(mbh)
October 10, 2023 Filing 170 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Defendant Alvogen, Inc. to Respond to Hospital and Pharmacy Direct Action Plaintiffs' Complaint) by ALVOGEN INC.. (Reiser, Craig)
September 29, 2023 Filing 169 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO HOSPITAL AND PHARMACY DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/29/23. 9/29/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL.(mbh) (SEE 16-md-2724; Doc #2587)
September 26, 2023 Filing 168 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:23-cv-03298. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2023 Filing 167 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17). In Re: Generic Pharmaceuticals Pricing Antitrust Litigation. Signed by MDL Panel on 9/8/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 166 Certificate of Interested Entities by SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 8/22/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable P. Casey Pitts in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials PCP immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Pitts by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after November 13, 2023, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 13, 2023, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before September 11, 2023, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here. A Joint Case Management Statement is not required in prisoner cases in which the prisoner plaintiff/petitioner is not represented by counsel. 9. Judge Pitts participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project; hearings and trials in civil cases are thus eligible for video recording upon request and with the consent of the parties and Judge Pitts. Please see the Court's #Pilot Project webpage and # General Order 65 for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED.Dated: 08/18/2023FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEEMark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
August 10, 2023 Filing 165 Certificate of Interested Entities by Swift County-Benson Health Services identifying Other Affiliate CentraCare for Swift County-Benson Health Services. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 8/10/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Filing 164 Certificate of Interested Entities by Butler Health System identifying Corporate Parent Independence Health System for Butler Health System. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 8/4/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 31, 2023 Filing 163 Certificate of Interested Entities by Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Filing 162 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peacehealth identifying Corporate Parent PeaceHealth Networks for Peacehealth. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/28/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 161 Certificate of Interested Entities by Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/27/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 160 Certificate of Interested Entities by Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/27/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 159 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/27/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 158 Certificate of Interested Entities by Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/27/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 157 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rivers Edge Hospital and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/27/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 156 Certificate of Interested Entities by Welia Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 155 Certificate of Interested Entities by St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 154 Certificate of Interested Entities by Northfield Hospitals + Clinics and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 153 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 152 Certificate of Interested Entities by Excela Health identifying Corporate Parent Independence Health System for Excela Health. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 151 Certificate of Interested Entities by Essentia Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 150 Certificate of Interested Entities by Confluence Health identifying Other Affiliate Wenatchee Valley Hospital, Other Affiliate Central Washington Health Services Association, d/b/a Central Washington Hospital for Confluence Health. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 149 Certificate of Interested Entities by White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 148 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 147 Certificate of Interested Entities by Montefiore Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 146 Certificate of Interested Entities by Evangelical Community Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 145 Certificate of Interested Entities by Duval Pharmacy, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 144 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dallas County Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 143 Certificate of Interested Entities by Community Health Center of Snohomish and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 142 Certificate of Interested Entities by Central Texas Community Health Centers and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 141 Certificate of Interested Entities by Health Partners of Western Ohio and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 140 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Shands Jacksonville HealthCare, Inc. for Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 139 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital identifying Other Affiliate The Childrens Medical Center Corporation for The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 138 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wellpath LLC (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 137 Certificate of Interested Entities by UHS of Delaware identifying Corporate Parent Universal Health Services, Inc. for UHS of Delaware. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 136 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stamford Health, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 135 Certificate of Interested Entities by Select Medical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation for Select Medical Corporation. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 134 Certificate of Interested Entities by Glacial Ridge Health System and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 133 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate University of Florida Board of Trustees for Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 132 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership identifying Corporate Parent LifePoint Health, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc. for Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 131 Certificate of Interested Entities by Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 130 Certificate of Interested Entities by Baxter County Hospital, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Baxter Regional Health System for Baxter County Hospital, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 129 Certificate of Interested Entities by Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 128 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 127 Certificate of Interested Entities by Winona Health Services and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 126 Certificate of Interested Entities by North Big Horn Hospital District and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 125 Certificate of Interested Entities by North Olympic Healthcare Network and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 124 Certificate of Interested Entities by UPMC and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 123 Certificate of Interested Entities by UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 122 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Chautauqua Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 121 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 120 Certificate of Interested Entities by Penn Highlands Healthcare and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 119 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peak Vista Community Health Centers and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 118 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nuvance Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 117 Certificate of Interested Entities by MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 116 Certificate of Interested Entities by Murray County Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 115 Certificate of Interested Entities by Millcreek Community Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Millcreek Health System, d/b/a LECOM Health for Millcreek Community Hospital. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023)[Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 114 Certificate of Interested Entities by Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 113 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 112 Certificate of Interested Entities by Novant Health, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 111 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nationwide Childrens Hospital identifying Other Affiliate Nationwide Children's Hospital, Inc. for Nationwide Childrens Hospital. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 110 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health identifying Corporate Parent Mary Rutan Health Association of Logan County for Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 109 Certificate of Interested Entities by Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 108 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tri-Area Community Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 107 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia identifying Corporate Parent The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia Foundation for The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 106 Certificate of Interested Entities by Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 105 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 104 Certificate of Interested Entities by St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 103 Certificate of Interested Entities by St. Lukes Health System, Ltd. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 102 Certificate of Interested Entities by St Lukes Health Network, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 101 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 100 Certificate of Interested Entities by Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 99 Certificate of Interested Entities by Riverview Healthcare Association and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 98 Certificate of Interested Entities by Olmsted Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 97 Certificate of Interested Entities by North Canyon Medical Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 96 Certificate of Interested Entities by Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by LifeCare Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by WakeMed and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Entities by University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by UMass Memorial Care, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shasta Community Health Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 88 Certificate of Interested Entities by Overlake Hospital Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent Overlake Hospital Association for Overlake Hospital Medical Center. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 87 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ochsner Clinic Foundation and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 82 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lehigh Valley Health Network, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 81 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lakewood Health System and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Intermountain Health Care, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crusaders Central Clinic Association and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Care New England Health System and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by Astera Health and Corporate Disclosure (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Hospital District and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hennepin County for Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to ACETO Corporation ONLY by Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc., Allina Health System, Astera Health, Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health, Avera Health, Baptist Health, Baxter County Hospital, Inc., Baystate Health, Inc., Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc., Berkshire Health Systems, Inc., Billings Clinic, Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc., Butler Health System, Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc., Care New England Health System, CaroMont Health, Inc., CentraCare Health System, Central Texas Community Health Centers, Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network, Community Health Center of Snohomish, Confluence Health, Conway Regional Health System, Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health, Cook Hospital, Crusaders Central Clinic Association, Dallas County Medical Center, Delta Memorial Hospital, Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health, Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System, Duval Pharmacy, Inc., East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation, Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital, Erie Family Health Center, Inc., Essentia Health, Evangelical Community Health, Excela Health, Fairview Health Services, Fulton County Medical Center, Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare, Glacial Ridge Health System, Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health, Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy, Great Lakes Bay Health Centers, Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc., Greater Lawrence Family Health Center, Guthrie Hospitals, Health Partners of Western Ohio, HealthPoint, Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc., Intermountain Health Care, Inc., International Community Health Services, Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare, Kittson Healthcare, Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth, Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health, Lake Region Healthcare Corporation, Lakewood Health System, Lehigh Valley Health Network, Inc., LifeCare Medical Center, Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, Lifespan Corporation, Logan Health, Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe, Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center, MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts, Madelia Health, Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital, Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital, Main Line Health, Inc., Marana Heath Center, Inc., Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Mayo Clinic, MedCura Health, Inc., Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics, Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center, Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health, Millcreek Community Hospital, Mille Lacs Health System, Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., Murray County Medical Center, NYU Langone Hospitals, Nationwide Childrens Hospital, North Big Horn Hospital District, North Canyon Medical Center, Inc., North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health, North Olympic Healthcare Network, Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley, Northfield Hospitals + Clinics, Novant Health, Inc., Nuvance Health, Ochsner Clinic Foundation, Olmsted Medical Center, Ortonville Area Health Services, Overlake Hospital Medical Center, Peacehealth, Peak Vista Community Health Centers, Penn Highlands Healthcare, Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Providence St. Joseph Health, Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc., RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview, Rivers Edge Hospital, Riverview Healthcare Association, Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center, Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic, SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital, Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center, Sanford, Select Medical Corporation, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shasta Community Health Center, Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation, Sleepy Eye Medical Center, St Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health, St. Lukes Health System, Ltd., St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth, St. Thomas Community Health Center, Stamford Health, Inc., Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc., Swift County-Benson Health Services, Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics, The Chautauqua Center, Inc., The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital, The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia, The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health, Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health, Tri-Area Community Health, UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health, UHS of Delaware, UMass Memorial Care, Inc., UPMC, United Hospital District, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health, Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center, Valley Health System, Valor Health, WakeMed, Welia Health, Wellpath LLC, White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center, Winona Health Services (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Baystate Health, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by Berkshire Health Systems, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by Billings Clinic and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 69 Certificate of Interested Entities by Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 67 Certificate of Interested Entities by Erie Family Health Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fairview Health Services and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 65 Certificate of Interested Entities by Great Lakes Bay Health Centers and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by CentraCare Health System and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities by Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cook Hospital (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by HealthPoint and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 59 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mount Sinai Health System, Inc. for Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sleepy Eye Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by St. Thomas Community Health Center and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Valor Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 53 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allina Health System and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Delta Memorial Hospital and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by Greater Lawrence Family Health Center and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kittson Healthcare and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 49 Certificate of Interested Entities by Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pikeville Medical Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Main Line Health, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Main Line Health System for Main Line Health, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ortonville Area Health Services and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mount Nittany Health System and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mille Lacs Health System and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by MedCura Health, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Madelia Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fulton County Medical Center and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by CaroMont Health, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Avera Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Filing 33 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, October 13, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by International Community Health Services and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lake Region Healthcare Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Logan Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mass General Brigham Incorporated and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mayo Clinic and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by NYU Langone Hospitals identifying Corporate Parent NYU Langone Health System for NYU Langone Hospitals. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 8, 2023 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanford and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/8/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Conway Regional Health System and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Valley Health System and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Guthrie Hospitals identifying Corporate Parent The Guthrie Clinic for Guthrie Hospitals. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lifespan Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marana Heath Center, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Baptist Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Providence St. Joseph Health and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc., Allina Health System, Astera Health, Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health, Avera Health, Baptist Health, Baxter County Hospital, Inc., Baystate Health, Inc., Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc., Berkshire Health Systems, Inc., Billings Clinic, Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc., Butler Health System, Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc., Care New England Health System, CaroMont Health, Inc., CentraCare Health System, Central Texas Community Health Centers, Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network, Community Health Center of Snohomish, Confluence Health, Conway Regional Health System, Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health, Cook Hospital, Crusaders Central Clinic Association, Dallas County Medical Center, Delta Memorial Hospital, Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health, Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System, Duval Pharmacy, Inc., East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation, Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital, Erie Family Health Center, Inc., Essentia Health, Evangelical Community Health, Excela Health, Fairview Health Services, Fulton County Medical Center, Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare, Glacial Ridge Health System, Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health, Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy, Great Lakes Bay Health Centers, Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc., Greater Lawrence Family Health Center, Guthrie Hospitals, Health Partners of Western Ohio, HealthPoint, Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc., Intermountain Health Care, Inc., International Community Health Services, Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare, Kittson Healthcare, Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth, Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health, Lake Region Healthcare Corporation, Lakewood Health System, Lehigh Valley Health Network, Inc., LifeCare Medical Center, Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, Lifespan Corporation, Logan Health, Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe, Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center, MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts, Madelia Health, Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital, Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital, Main Line Health, Inc., Marana Heath Center, Inc., Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Mayo Clinic, MedCura Health, Inc., Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics, Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center, Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health, Millcreek Community Hospital, Mille Lacs Health System, Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., Murray County Medical Center, NYU Langone Hospitals, Nationwide Childrens Hospital, North Big Horn Hospital District, North Canyon Medical Center, Inc., North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health, North Olympic Healthcare Network, Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley, Northfield Hospitals + Clinics, Novant Health, Inc., Nuvance Health, Ochsner Clinic Foundation, Olmsted Medical Center, Ortonville Area Health Services, Overlake Hospital Medical Center, Peacehealth, Peak Vista Community Health Centers, Penn Highlands Healthcare, Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Providence St. Joseph Health, Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc., RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview, Rivers Edge Hospital, Riverview Healthcare Association, Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center, Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic, SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital, Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center, Sanford, Select Medical Corporation, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shasta Community Health Center, Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation, Sleepy Eye Medical Center, St Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health, St. Lukes Health System, Ltd., St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth, St. Thomas Community Health Center, Stamford Health, Inc., Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc., Swift County-Benson Health Services, Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics, The Chautauqua Center, Inc., The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital, The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia, The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health, Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health, Tri-Area Community Health, UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health, UHS of Delaware, UMass Memorial Care, Inc., UPMC, United Hospital District, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health, Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center, Valley Health System, Valor Health, WakeMed, Welia Health, Wellpath LLC, White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center, Winona Health Services.. (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/7/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendants Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, DAVA Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Endo International plc by DAVA Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Endo International plc, Generics Bidco I, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ghosh, Debmallo) (Filed on 7/6/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Debmallo Shayon Ghosh (Ghosh, Debmallo) (Filed on 7/6/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/5/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 3, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2023)[Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 3, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 3, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Please file one summons listing defendants. Attach an additional sheet to proposed summons with name and addresses of other defendants' that can not fit on summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Valley Health System, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Butler Health System, Wellpath LLC, Logan Health, Millcreek Community Hospital, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Health Partners of Western Ohio, East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation, The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System, WakeMed, Murray County Medical Center, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview, Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health, CaroMont Health, Inc., Astera Health, Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center, Ortonville Area Health Services, Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health, White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center, North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health, Conway Regional Health System, Greater Lawrence Family Health Center, Mayo Clinic, Duval Pharmacy, Inc., Penn Highlands Healthcare, NYU Langone Hospitals, International Community Health Services, Nuvance Health, Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health, Avera Health, Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center, St. Thomas Community Health Center, HealthPoint, Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley, Peacehealth, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center, Sleepy Eye Medical Center, Mount Nittany Health System, Dallas County Medical Center, Fairview Health Services, St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth, Montefiore Medical Center, Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc., Olmsted Medical Center, Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health, Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc., Great Lakes Bay Health Centers, Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health, Glacial Ridge Health System, Berkshire Health Systems, Inc., The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia, Baystate Health, Inc., Madelia Health, Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital, Baxter County Hospital, Inc., Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center, Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc., Central Texas Community Health Centers, North Canyon Medical Center, Inc., Crusaders Central Clinic Association, Nationwide Childrens Hospital, Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health, Erie Family Health Center, Inc., MedCura Health, Inc., Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe, t. Lukes Health Network, Inc., d/b/a St. Lukes University Health Network, The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital, Guthrie Hospitals, Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health, Novant Health, Inc., Marana Heath Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shasta Community Health Center, Providence St. Joseph Health, Fulton County Medical Center, Welia Health, Tri-Area Community Health, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health, Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health, Rivers Edge Hospital, Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health, Billings Clinic, Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc., MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts, Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic, The Chautauqua Center, Inc., Sanford, Evangelical Community Health, Ochsner Clinic Foundation, Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare, Baptist Health, Valor Health, Lehigh Valley Health Network, Inc., Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc., Allina Health System, The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health, Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc., Excela Health, Community Health Center of Snohomish, Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital, RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., Swift County-Benson Health Services, Kittson Healthcare, Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network, Peak Vista Community Health Centers, St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health, UMass Memorial Care, Inc., Stamford Health, Inc., Lakewood Health System, Riverview Healthcare Association, St. Lukes Health System, Ltd., Care New England Health System, Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare, Mille Lacs Health System, SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital, Overlake Hospital Medical Center, Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc., North Big Horn Hospital District, Intermountain Health Care, Inc., UPMC, Winona Health Services, CentraCare Health System, Main Line Health, Inc., Select Medical Corporation, United Hospital District, Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center, Lifespan Corporation, Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc., Confluence Health, Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy, Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System, UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health, North Olympic Healthcare Network, Delta Memorial Hospital, Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics, UHS of Delaware, Cook Hospital, Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation, Essentia Health, Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics, LifeCare Medical Center, Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth, Lake Region Healthcare Corporation, Northfield Hospitals + Clinics (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc., Allina Health System, Astera Health f/k/a Tri-County Health Care, Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health, Avera Health, Baptist Health, Baxter County Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Baxter Regional Medical Center, Baystate Health, Inc., Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc., Berkshire Health Systems, Inc., Billings Clinic, Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc., Butler Health System, Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc., Care New England Health System, d/b/a Care New England, CaroMont Health, Inc., CentraCare Health System, Central Texas Community Health Centers, d/b/a CommUnityCare, Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network, Community Health Center of Snohomish, Confluence Health, Conway Regional Health System, Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health, Cook Hospital, Crusaders Central Clinic Association, Dallas County Medical Center, Delta Memorial Hospital, Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health, Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System, Duval Pharmacy, Inc., East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation, Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital, Erie Family Health Center, Inc., Essentia Health, Evangelical Community Health, Excela Health, Fairview Health Services, Fulton County Medical Center, Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare, Glacial Ridge Health System, Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health, Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy, Great Lakes Bay Health Centers, Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc., Greater Lawrence Family Health Center, Guthrie Hospitals, Health Partners of Western Ohio, HealthPoint, Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc., Intermountain Health Care, Inc., International Community Health Services, Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare, Kittson Healthcare, Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth, Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health, Lake Region Healthcare Corporation, Lakewood Health System, Lehigh Valley Health Network, Inc., LifeCare Medical Center, Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, Lifespan Corporation, Logan Health, Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe, Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center, MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts, Madelia Health, Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital, Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital, Main Line Health, Inc., Marana Heath Center, Inc., Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Mayo Clinic, MedCura Health, Inc., Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics, Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center, Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health, Millcreek Community Hospital, Mille Lacs Health System, Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., Murray County Medical Center, NYU Langone Hospitals, Nationwide Childrens Hospital, North Big Horn Hospital District, North Canyon Medical Center, Inc., North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health, North Olympic Healthcare Network, Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley, Northfield Hospitals + Clinics, Novant Health, Inc., Nuvance Health, Ochsner Clinic Foundation, Olmsted Medical Center, Ortonville Area Health Services, Overlake Hospital Medical Center, Peacehealth, Peak Vista Community Health Centers, Penn Highlands Healthcare, Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Providence St. Joseph Health, Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc., RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview, Rivers Edge Hospital, Riverview Healthcare Association, Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center, Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic, SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital, Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center, Sanford, Select Medical Corporation, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shasta Community Health Center, Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation, Sleepy Eye Medical Center, St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health, St. Lukes Health System, Ltd., St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth, St. Thomas Community Health Center, Stamford Health, Inc., Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc., Swift County-Benson Health Services, Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics, The Chautauqua Center, Inc., The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital, The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia, The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health, Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health, Tri-Area Community Health, UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health, UHS of Delaware, UMass Memorial Care, Inc., UPMC, United Hospital District, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health, Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center, Valley Health System, Valor Health, WakeMed, d/b/a WakeMed Health & Hospitals, Welia Health, Wellpath LLC, White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center, Winona Health Services, t. Lukes Health Network, Inc., d/b/a St. Lukes University Health Network of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/1/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 1, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/1/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]
July 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18414263.). Filed byCook Hospital, Care New England Health System, d/b/a Care New England, LifeCare Medical Center, St. Thomas Community Health Center, Northfield Hospitals + Clinics, Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics, Fairview Health Services, Sleepy Eye Medical Center, Wellpath LLC, Nationwide Childrens Hospital, Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health, Sanford, Riverview Healthcare Association, Rivers Edge Hospital, Billings Clinic, t. Lukes Health Network, Inc., d/b/a St. Lukes University Health Network, Millcreek Community Hospital, Valor Health, East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation, Evangelical Community Health, Baystate Health, Inc., St. Lukes Health System, Ltd., The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Confluence Health, Mille Lacs Health System, Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy, The Childrens Hospital of Philadelphia, Berkshire Health Systems, Inc., Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc., Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center, St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth, Lehigh Valley Health Network, Inc., Peak Vista Community Health Centers, Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health, Lake Region Healthcare Corporation, Penn Highlands Healthcare, Community Health Center of Snohomish, Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health, Erie Family Health Center, Inc., Baxter County Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Baxter Regional Medical Center, Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc., The Chautauqua Center, Inc., SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital, UPMC, Allina Health System, Mount Nittany Health System, Health Partners of Western Ohio, St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health, Ochsner Clinic Foundation, Madelia Health, Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health, Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc., North Canyon Medical Center, Inc., Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc., Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health, North Big Horn Hospital District, Swift County-Benson Health Services, Duval Pharmacy, Inc., North Olympic Healthcare Network, Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital, Conway Regional Health System, Peacehealth, Glacial Ridge Health System, Murray County Medical Center, CentraCare Health System, Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health, Select Medical Corporation, Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview, Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital, Intermountain Health Care, Inc., The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System, Lifespan Corporation, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Mass General Brigham Incorporated, UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health, Logan Health, Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center, Excela Health, Winona Health Services, Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare, Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc., Central Texas Community Health Centers, d/b/a CommUnityCare, United Hospital District, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley, Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth, MedCura Health, Inc., Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center, Valley Health System, Ortonville Area Health Services, Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health, HealthPoint, Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe, Delta Memorial Hospital, Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center, Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc., Essentia Health, Butler Health System, Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc., WakeMed, d/b/a WakeMed Health & Hospitals, Novant Health, Inc., Guthrie Hospitals, White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center, International Community Health Services, Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Montefiore Medical Center, North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health, Lakewood Health System, Stamford Health, Inc., Providence St. Joseph Health, Kittson Healthcare, MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts, Overlake Hospital Medical Center, UMass Memorial Care, Inc., Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network, Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health, Crusaders Central Clinic Association, Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System, Avera Health, The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health, Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc., Welia Health, Astera Health f/k/a Tri-County Health Care, Baptist Health, Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation, CaroMont Health, Inc., Dallas County Medical Center, Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center, Marana Heath Center, Inc., Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health, Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health, NYU Langone Hospitals, Olmsted Medical Center, RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., Shasta Community Health Center, Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, Great Lakes Bay Health Centers, UHS of Delaware, Main Line Health, Inc., Fulton County Medical Center, Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics, Greater Lawrence Family Health Center, Nuvance Health, Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare, Mayo Clinic, The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital, Tri-Area Community Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meister, Melissa) (Filed on 7/1/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/26/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Providence St. Joseph Health et al v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astera Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence St. Joseph Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS of Delaware
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYO CLINIC
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermountain Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifepoint Corporate Services, General Partnership
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mass General Brigham Incorporated
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novant Health, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RWJBarnabas Health, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEHIGH VALLEY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLPATH LLC
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allina Health System
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairview Health Services
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Lukes Health Network, Inc. d/b/a St Lukes University Health Network
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifespan Corporation
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYU Langone Hospitals
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peacehealth
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jefferson University, d/b/a Jefferson Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avera Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UC Health, LLC, d/b/a UC Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMANDING OFFICER SANFORD
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan on behalf of University of Michigan Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMass Memorial Care, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baystate Health, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Care New England Health System doing business as Care New England
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The DCH Health Care Authority, d/b/a DCH Health System
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Childrens Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Boston Childrens Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Lukes Health System, Ltd.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAIN LINE HEALTH INC
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECT MEDICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson-Madison County General Hospital District, operating as West Tennessee Healthcare
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essentia Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WakeMed doing business as WakeMed Health & Hospitals
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, d/b/a ECU Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgeview Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a Ridgeview
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Childrens Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olmsted Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CentraCare Health System
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Health System
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Cod Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hennepin Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuvance Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guthrie Hospitals
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marana Heath Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Memorial Health Care, d/b/a North Memorial Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kootenai Hospital District, an Idaho Public District Hospital, d/b/a Kootenai Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White River Health System, Inc., d/b/a White River Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billings Clinic
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CaroMont Health, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Region Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winona Health Services
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baxter County Hospital, Inc. doing business as Baxter Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pikeville Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butler Health System
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Community Health Services
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stigler Health & Wellness Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stamford Health, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusta Health Care, Inc., d/b/a Augusta Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakewood Health System
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northfield Hospitals Clinics
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Hospital of Laramie County, d/b/a Cheyenne Regional Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn Highlands Healthcare
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excela Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welia Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Family Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HealthPoint
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confluence Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conway Regional Health System
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middlesex Health System, Inc., d/b/a Middlesex Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Nittany Health System
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-County Health Care
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverview Healthcare Association
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Bay Health Centers
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glencoe Regional Health Services, d/b/a Glencoe Regional Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perham Hospital District, d/b/a Perham Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overlake Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Boston Neighborhood Health Center Corporation
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LifeCare Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uphams Corner Health Committee, Inc., d/b/a Uphams Corner Health Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Texas Community Health Centers doing business as CommUnity Care
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mille Lacs Health System
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton County Medical Center
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rivers Edge Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glacial Ridge Health System
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pueblo Community Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas County Hospital, d/b/a Alomere Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crusaders Central Clinic Association
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Health Center of Snohomish
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meeker Memorial Hospital and Clinics
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Hospital District
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duval Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasta Community Health Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granby Pharmacy, Inc., d/b/a Center Pharmacy
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortonville Area Health Services
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillette Childrens Specialty Healthcare
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millcreek Community Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Partners of Western Ohio
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Lawrence Family Health Center
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Salt Plains Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Itasca Hospital District, d/b/a Bigfork Valley
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roanoke Chowan Community Health Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albany Area Primary Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MVMEDSHOP, Inc., d/b/a Vineyard Scripts
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ely-Bloomenson Community Hospital
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Thomas Community Health Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Health, f/k/a Madison Memorial Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Healthcare Services, d/b/a Madison Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook County Hospital District, d/b/a North Shore Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem Community Hospital, d/b/a Salem Regional Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift County-Benson Health Services
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sleepy Eye Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray County Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook Hospital
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Memorial Hospital, Inc., d/b/a Drew Memorial Health System
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGOH Acquisition, Inc., d/b/a Ozarks Community Hospital
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lutheran Charity Association, d/b/a Jamestown Regional Medical Center
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Olympic Healthcare Network
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Area Community Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longview Wellness Center, Inc., d/b/a Wellness Pointe
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee Health Service and Development Corporation
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelia Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kittson Healthcare
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peak Vista Community Health Centers
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broad Top Area Medical Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chautauqua Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Big Horn Hospital District
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rutan Hospital, d/b/a Mary Rutan Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedCura Health, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rutherford County Primary Care Clinic, Inc., d/b/a Primary Care & Hope Clinic
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collier Health Services, Inc., d/b/a Healthcare Network
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Canyon Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syringa Hospital Districts, d/b/a Syringa Hospital & Clinics
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Clair Health Corp., d/b/a St. Clair Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evangelical Community Health
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas County Medical Center
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valor Health
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight Health Holdings LLC, d/b/a ScionHealth
Represented By: CINDY ZONE REICHLINE
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: KEITH LAWRENCE BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACETO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akorn Operating Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN INC.
Represented By: Craig Matthew Reiser
Represented By: EDWARD M. MATHIAS
Represented By: EVA YUNG
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KEELEY
Represented By: RACHEL ADCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARA APRAHAMIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berthold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Blashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Boothe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: DONALD W. HAWTHORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Debmallo Shayon Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Sullivan DiValerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Represented By: Debmallo Shayon Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Falkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Represented By: Debmallo Shayon Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK GENERICS INC., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grauso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN HATOSY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [