Cooper v. Pennsylvania Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jamil Cooper
Defendant: Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, John Wetzel, Marirosa Lamas, Kurt Granlund, Sergeant Strohm and Correctional Officer Sheman
Case Number: 1:2012cv01186
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Centre
Presiding Judge: LQ
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE Defendant Pennsylvania Department of Corrections from this action in accordance with the Courts March 31, 2016 Order; 2. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 93) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. Defendants motion (Doc. No. 93) is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs due process claim regarding Misconduct B384789 (the September 7, 2011 mis conduct), and the Clerk of Court is directed to defer the entry of judgment in favor of Defendants on this claim until the conclusion of the above-captioned proceedings; b. Defendants motion (Doc. No. 93) is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs First Am endment retaliation claim and due process claim regarding Misconduct B384784 (the September 6, 2011 misconduct); and 3. A separate Order scheduling a status conference in the above-captioned action shall issue. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/7/2019. (ve)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT ISHEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc.No. 55) is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor ofDefendants and against Plaintiff. 3. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. 55 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/31/16. (sc)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Postpone Summary Jgm is GRANTED. Pltf's bropp, counter statement of facts and exhibits are TIMELY FILED. No further period for discovery will be granted. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/21/15. (sc)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff Jamil Coopers motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. No. 44) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff Jamil Coopers motion to amend judgment (Doc. No. 48.) is DENIED. 48 44 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/19/14. (sc)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to all claimsexcept the retaliation and the due process claim. Within twenty (20) days from the date of this order, Defendants shall file an answer with respect to the remaining claims.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/21/14. (sc)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1)Dfts' 21 Motion to Strike is DENIED. 2)W/i 20 days from the date of this order, Dfts shall respond to the allegations set forth in the amdcmp. 3)Dfts' 23 Motion to Stay is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on April 25, 2013. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Pennsylvania Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marirosa Lamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Granlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Sheman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?