Little et al v. Mottern et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Little and Kareem H. Milhouse
Defendant: B. Mottern, Boussaug, Loyek, J. E. Thomas, John Does 1-10, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and FBOP
Case Number: 1:2014cv00953
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: LQ
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - AND NOW, on this 26th day of April 2018, in accordance with the accompanying Memorandum, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1.Milhouses motion for relief pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)(1),(2), (3) and (6) (Doc. No. 231), is DENIED; and2.Milhouses motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)(6) (Doc. No.234), is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/26/18. (dmn)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/22/17. (rw)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- IT IS ORDERED that Defendants motions 174 & 175 to dismiss and/or for summaryjudgment are GRANTED. Pltf Littles claims against Defendants Holland, Hubbardand Middleton are DISMISSED fo r lack of personal jurisdiction. The claims of Pltf Little & Pltf Milhouse against Defendants Thomas, Butler, Heath, Entzel and Taggart are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may begranted pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) without furth er leave to file a fourth amended complaint. The claims of Pltf Little & Pltf Milhouse against the UnitedStates under the FTCA are DISMISSED for failure to exhaust their administrative tort remedies. The claims of Pltf Little & Pltf Milhouse against Mottern, Boussag, Loyek, Eck, Dowkus and Diltz under Bivens areDISMISSED for failure to exhaust their administrative remedies. The claims against the Federal Bureau of Prison are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under Rule 12(b)(6). Pltf Littles motion 165 for summary judgment is DENIED. Pltf Milhouses motion 189 for summary judgment is DENIED. Pltf Milhouses so-called motion 202 to proceed as a John Doe and his motion 206 for a copy of Defendants motion forsummary judgment are DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case andterminate any other motions pending on the docket. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/7/17. (rw)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Littles document purporting to be a set of interrogatories (Doc. 132) is stricken from the record. The Clerk of Court shall delete the filing (Doc. 132) from the docket. 120 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Little shall file a brief in opposition to that pending motion to dismiss (Doc. 120) the third amended complaint (Doc. 35) on or before December 4, 2015.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/24/15. (sc)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT ISHEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Littles documents purporting to be a request for the production of a document and a surveillance tape(Doc. 133) and a request for admissions (Doc. 136) are s tricken from the record. 2. The Clerk of Court shall delete Docs. 133 and 136 from the docket. 3. Littles motion for change of venue (Doc. 134)is denied. 4. Littles motion for reconsideration (Doc. 137) is denied. 137 134 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/23/15. (sc)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the 82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael R. Little is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/13/15. (sc)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/13/15. (sc)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBYORDERED THAT: 1) The motions (Doc. No. 18, 110) are DENIED; 2) Plaintiff Milhouses claims are hereby DISMISSED for failure to pay the filing fee;3) In accordance with this courts prior order (Doc. No. 79), Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 35) within thirty (30) days of the date of this ruling. 18 110 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/2/15. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little et al v. Mottern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem H. Milhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Mottern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boussaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. E. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?