MDL 2816 IN RE: SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Whipkey, Richard Whipkey, Alfonso Goree, Michael A Mckinney, Kermit Cantrell, Liric Jackson, Jean Jones, Joseph Stewart, Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella, Robert Jones, Wilma Abplanalp, Barbara Ann Cantrell, Maria Isabel Meza, Nicole Crumb, Donrue Talley Brathovd, Duane Eisenberg, Pamela J. Surdi, Nolan Dunaway, Robin Crawford, Lloyd A. Hershey, Ms. Bessie Linda Selfridge, Elizabeth J. Dezenski, Agnes Hesse, Hester A. Hershey, Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr., James Thomason, John P. Garcia, Jennifer Ramirez, Benjamin Haupt, Paul Santore, Elizabeth A Reed, Dwight Southall, Jr., Richard Diaz, Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez, Margaret R Klestinez, Donna Jenkins, Thomas Fowler, Lorraine Diaz, Francisco Javier Meza, Jon Sykes, Christine Crabtree, William Stewart, Kyle Hamer, Joseph C. Surdi, Lori Weinacker, Gloria Collins, Keith O'Neal Ford, Christina Mann, Phillip Lamar West, Jason Sams, Kuo Raid Grant Chen, Tina DeYoung Smith, Lyndee Miller, Ms. Michelle D Terry, Ross Reed, Carol Mckinney, Maggie Haupt, Richard P Klestinez, Carolyn Green, Melissa Canfield, Carol Bopp, Debra Prescott, Ennis Bagwell, Tina B Leger, Hayes Garver, II, William Clanton, Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kristine L. Hamilton, Vivian Summerville, Bridget Southall, Dana Menesses, Karen Austin, Elizabeth Ahl, Edward Ray Waddell, Martin Austin Colson, Elizabeth Kvammen, Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Joseph Britt, Anna Upicksoun, Delacy Lucas, James Patterson, Alexandra Colson, Ronald Reed, M.D. James Thomas, Robert Sheely, Michael D. Menesses, Jr., Timothy Crabtree, Susaun Kmak, Lynne Williams-Sykes, Rosann Fowler, Robert M. King, Laura Gilstrap, Albert Summerville, Maria Garver, Harold Green, Melba Favors, Melvin Mattison, Gary F. Gerardi, Janna Eisenberg, Van Sidney Blevins, III, Nancy Stewart, Kerry Lyons, Dennis Jenkins, Debra Schuster, Vanita L. Thompson, Earl Gilstrap, Mrs Tanika Carter, Lari Miller, Dolores Harmon, Kaye Thomason, Melissa Edwards, Armando Cuellar, Danna Brackenbury, Matthew Adams, Heather Stewart, Kathy Thomas, Patricia Faeth, Tanika Carter, Jason Bopp, Brenda Britt, Sandra M. Susco, James J. Judge, Theresa Williams, Michael Santore, Donald Hesse, James R. Teal, Terrence A Smith, Elizabeth (I) Ahl, Theresa Kuhnmuench, Helen Ann Reed, Bernard Poole, Aleyda Romero, Meloney Sheely, Felicia Johnson, Thomas Dezenski, Michelle D Terry, Kenneth Kvammen, Heather Bopp, Peter Kuhnmuench, Vickie Bagwell, Armando Lopez, Shelly Lynn Sedatol Ford, The Estate of Father Harold W. Kist, Edward Enriquez and Margaret Seed
Defendant: SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM, Sorin Group USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Jane Doe Corporation, Livanova PLC, LivaNova USA, Inc., Cedars Sinai Medical Center, Sorin USA, Inc., Sorin Group S.P.A., LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Does 1-200 inclusive, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, John Doe Corporation, Sorin Group Deutchland, Kimberly Bagwell, Sorin Group Deutschland, GmbH and Sorin Group USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018md02816
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER re: extension of time in 18cv2379 (eo)
November 3, 2020 Filing 438 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 11/3/20 (mw)
October 29, 2020 Filing 437 REPLY BRIEF re #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 43, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 45)(Briant, Jared)
October 15, 2020 Filing 436 by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. #434 Brief in Opposition,, #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy Amended. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Exhibit(s))(LeClercq, Ben)
October 14, 2020 Filing 435 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #424 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Proposed Order)(LeClercq, Ben)
October 14, 2020 Filing 434 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy filed by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Proposed Order)(LeClercq, Ben)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting #432 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 432 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(LeClercq, Ben)
October 5, 2020 Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by Doug Schreiner on behalf of Margaret Seed (Schreiner, Doug)
October 2, 2020 Filing 430 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-31) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 9/25/20 (mw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 429 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 9/21/20 (mw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 428 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 6/30/20(mw)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines Signed by Chief Judge John E. Jones, III on 9/29/2020. (mw)
August 31, 2020 Filing 426 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #424 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5)(Briant, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 425 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #424 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc..(Briant, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 424 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(Briant, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 423 EXHIBIT 31 by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. re #420 Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 42)(Briant, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 422 EXHIBIT 17 re: #420 Brief in Support by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 25, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 28, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 29, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 30)(Briant, Jared) Modified on 9/1/2020 (ep).
August 31, 2020 Filing 421 EXHIBIT 1 by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. re #420 Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 16)(Briant, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 420 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc..(Briant, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude)(Briant, Jared)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge John E. Jones, III on 8/24/2020. (mfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 417 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/19/20 (mfa)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge John E. Jones, III on 7/27/2020. (ve)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to paragraph 12 of Case Management Conference Order No. 15, Kmak v. Sorin Group Deutschland, GmbH et al. (Case No. 1:18-cv-0237-JEJ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to show cause Signed by Chief Judge John E. Jones, III on 7/21/2020. (mfa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 414 NOTICE by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. of Plaintiff Kmak's Failure to Respond to CMO 15 and Submission of Proposed Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice)(Briant, Jared)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER extending time in case 18cv2379 (eo)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER In the interest of fairness and recognizing the unusual challenges posed bythe COVID-19 pandemic, we shall EXTEND Plaintiff Kmaks deadline to respondto CMO 15 to June 30, 2020. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no furtherextensions shall be granted. (eo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 411 REPLY BRIEF re #397 MOTION for Order To Show Cause Why The Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice (Kmak) in Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Briant, Jared)
April 21, 2020 Filing 410 RESPONSE by Susaun Kmak to #398 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing)(Caras, Dean)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting #408 Motion for Attorney Fees (eo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 408 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Wilma Abplanalp, Matthew Adams, Elizabeth Ahl, Elizabeth (I) Ahl, Karen Austin, Ennis Bagwell, Vickie Bagwell, Van Sidney Blevins, III, Carol Bopp, Heather Bopp, Jason Bopp, Danna Brackenbury, Donrue Talley Brathovd, Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt, Melissa Canfield, Barbara Ann Cantrell, Kermit Cantrell, Tanika Carter, Tanika Carter, Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen, William Clanton, Gloria Collins, Alexandra Colson, Martin Austin Colson, Christine Crabtree, Timothy Crabtree, Robin Crawford, Nicole Crumb, Armando Cuellar, Elizabeth J. Dezenski, Thomas Dezenski, Lorraine Diaz, Richard Diaz, Nolan Dunaway, Melissa Edwards, Duane Eisenberg, Janna Eisenberg, Edward Enriquez, Patricia Faeth, Melba Favors, Keith O'Neal Ford, Shelly Lynn Sedatol Ford, Rosann Fowler, Thomas Fowler, John P. Garcia, Hayes Garver, II, Maria Garver, Gary F. Gerardi, Earl Gilstrap, Laura Gilstrap, Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez, Alfonso Goree, Carolyn Green, Harold Green, Kyle Hamer, Kristine L. Hamilton, Dolores Harmon, Benjamin Haupt, Maggie Haupt, Hester A. Hershey, Lloyd A. Hershey, Agnes Hesse, Donald Hesse, Liric Jackson, Dennis Jenkins, Donna Jenkins, Felicia Johnson, Jean Jones, Robert Jones, James J. Judge, Robert M. King, Margaret R Klestinez, Richard P Klestinez, Susaun Kmak, Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench, Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen, Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger, Armando Lopez, Delacy Lucas, Kerry Lyons, Christina Mann, Melvin Mattison, Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney, Dana Menesses, Michael D. Menesses, Jr., Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza, Lari Miller, Lyndee Miller, Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr, James Patterson, Bernard Poole, Debra Prescott, Jennifer Ramirez, Elizabeth A Reed, Helen Ann Reed, Ronald Reed, Ross Reed, Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella, Aleyda Romero, Jason Sams, Michael Santore, Paul Santore, Debra Schuster, Bessie Linda Selfridge, Meloney Sheely, Robert Sheely, Terrence A Smith, Tina DeYoung Smith, Bridget Southall, Dwight Southall, Jr, Heather Stewart, Joseph Stewart, Nancy Stewart, William Stewart, Albert Summerville, Vivian Summerville, Joseph C. Surdi, Pamela J. Surdi, Sandra M. Susco, Jon Sykes, James R. Teal, Michelle D Terry, Michelle D Terry, The Estate of Father Harold W. Kist, James Thomas, Kathy Thomas, James Thomason, Kaye Thomason, Vanita L. Thompson, Anna Upicksoun, Edward Ray Waddell, Lori Weinacker, Phillip Lamar West, Elizabeth Whipkey, Richard Whipkey, Theresa Williams, Lynne Williams-Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s) Sol Weiss Declaration)(Weiss, Sol)
March 23, 2020 Filing 406 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to #405 Order, by Kyle Hamer. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 505 Receipt Number: 0314-5043103 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (aaa)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER 1. Plaintiff Kyle Hamers case, docketed at 1:18-cv-1645, is DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Case ManagementOrder 15.2. The Clerk of Court shall close 1:18-cv-1645.3. Plaintiff Kyle Hamers Motion to Remand (Doc. 373) is DISMISSEDAS MOOT. (eo)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER directing that the Britts' request for addt'l discovery #401 is DENIED w/out prejudice to their requesting specific discovery, if necessary, after the Daubert motion is filed & briefed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 3/19/20. (ki)
March 17, 2020 Filing 402 Letter from LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. and Sorin Group USA, Inc. To J. Schwab Regarding Britt Deposition Transcript Request. (Briant, Jared)
March 13, 2020 Filing 401 SEALED - 3/9/20 Letter from Attorney Ben Le Clercq to Magistrate Judge Schwab re: discovery dispute(s). (ki)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a telephone conference regarding the discovery dispute outlined in the March 9, 2020 letter (doc. 399 ) from Ben Le Clercq, Esquire shall be held on March 19, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The conference will be by telephone. Attorney Le Clercq shall initiate the call by calling Chambers. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on March 11, 2020. (kjn)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting #397 Motion for Order to Show Cause. See order for details. (eo)
February 28, 2020 Filing 397 MOTION for Order To Show Cause Why The Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice (Kmak) by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER - BRIEFING SCHEDULE. See order for details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/26/2020. (mfa)
February 25, 2020 Filing 394 STIPULATION Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Briant, Jared)
February 20, 2020 Filing 393 NOTICE by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc. Notice of Firm Name Change and E-Mail Contact Change (Briant, Jared)
February 20, 2020 Filing 392 NOTICE by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc. Notice of Name Change (Bodtke, Emily)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER - This matter is before the Court pursuant to Plaintiff Susaun Kmaks Motion for a 60-Day Extension to Comply with Case Management Order 15, Section C.10. Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED, and the February 21, 2020 deadline to comply with Section C.10 of CMO 15 is extended for Susaun Kmak until 4/21/2020. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/11/2020. (sc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 386 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Thomas W Kerrigan, II terminated on behalf of The Estate of Father Harold W. Kist. (mfa)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Order approving re #384 Application (eo)
February 3, 2020 Filing 384 Application to Withdraw Appearance for LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. and Sorin Group USA, Inc. of Bridget Ahmann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER: The status call scheduled for 2/12/20 at 2:30 p.m. is RESET for 2/26/20 at 2:30 p.m. Lead and Liaison Counsel Sol H. Weiss shall convene the call to Chambers, (717) 221-3986, with all appropriate counsel on the line and prepared to proceed. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 1/28/20. (ma)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Order approving #380 Application (eo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 380 Application of LivaNova Defendants to Withdraw the Appearance of Peter J. Goss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
January 22, 2020 Filing 379 REPLY BRIEF re #369 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Case Should Not be Dismissed with Prejudice and/or Sanctions Ordered Response To Plaintiff's Reply To Show Cause Order Regarding Dismissal for Failure to Comply with CMO 15 filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc..(Briant, Jared)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Order approving re #377 Stipulation (eo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 377 STIPULATION First Supplemental Joint Stipulation Regarding Sealed Filing Privileges by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
January 9, 2020 Filing 374 REPLY BRIEF re #369 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Case Should Not be Dismissed with Prejudice and/or Sanctions Ordered Reply to Show Cause Order Regarding Dismissal for Failure to Comply with CMO 15 filed by Kyle Hamer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G)(Centola, Lawrence)
January 9, 2020 Filing 373 MOTION to Remand by Kyle Hamer. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F)(Centola, Lawrence)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #371 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
January 7, 2020 Filing 371 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Joint Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitations of Local Rule 7.8 in Supporting and Opposition Briefs to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE 1:18-CV-1645 SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE - Plaintiff's counsel in Hamer v. LivaNova PLC et al shall have 21 days to respond to said order, failure to show cause shall dismiss case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/19/2019. (mfa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 369 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Case Should Not be Dismissed with Prejudice and/or Sanctions Ordered by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER DISMISSING CASE 1:19-CV-1451 WITH PREJUDICE for failure to show causeSigned by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/16/2019. (mfa)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court shall conduct a status call in this matter on February 12, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Lead and Liaison Counsel Sol H. Weiss shall convene the call to Chambers, (717) 221-3986, with all appropriate counsel on the line and prepared to proceed Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/16/19(mfa)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER - 1)Defendants shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to file their motion for summary judgment. 2)Litigating plaintiffs shall have 21 days from the filing of the motion for summary judgement to file a response. 3)Defendants shall have 10 days from the filing of response to file a replySigned by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/11/2019. (mfa)
December 10, 2019 Filing 364 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01084-JEJ, Plaintiffs James J. Judge et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting #362 Motion for Order to Dismiss case with Prejudice. See order for details. (eo)
December 9, 2019 Filing 362 MOTION for Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #360 Motion for Order to Show Cause (eo)
November 19, 2019 Filing 360 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why the Enriquez Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice and/or Sanctions Ordered by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER approving #357 Application filed by Sorin Group USA, Inc., LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. (eo)
November 14, 2019 Filing 357 Application to Withdraw the Appearance of Ross W. Johnson , filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER re #355 - In an effort to narrow the issues presented on the upcoming December 11, 2019 call, and to give Attorney Le Clercq a full opportunity to be heard, we shall DIRECT that Lead and Liaison counsel for the Plaintiffs and counsel for the Defendants engage Attorney Le Clercq on a conference call sufficiently in advance of the December 11, 2019 call so that Attorney Le Clercqs concerns can be fully discussed prior to the said call. Further, we do not find it necessary to invite Attorney Le Clercq to participate in the November 18, 2019 call with counsel for the CHNOLA Plaintiffs inasmuch as the Court anticipates that call will concern issues specific to those Plaintiffs only. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 11/13/19. (dmn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 355 Letter from Ben Le Clercq To Judge Jones. (LeClercq, Ben)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER re #347 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause - The deadline to show cause under the Order having now passed, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to paragraph 12 of Case Management Conference Order No. 15, the following cases are dismissed with prejudice for failure to show cause: 1:18-cv-1880, 1:19-cv-509 and 1:18-cv-1901. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 11/7/19. (dmn)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/18/2019 02:00 PM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 11/6/19. (dmn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 352 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00232-JEJ, Plaintiffs Jon Sykes et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
November 5, 2019 Filing 351 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01691-JEJ, Plaintiffs Anna Upicksoun et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #349 Motion to Extend Time (eo)
October 28, 2019 Filing 349 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with CMO 15 by Jason Sams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eckhart, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 348 Letter from Irving J. Warshauer . (Warshauer, Irving)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #346 to Show Cause - See Order for Details.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/7/19. (dmn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 346 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Dismissed with Prejudice and/or Sanctions Ordered by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Case Management Order No. 15, #2 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
October 4, 2019 Filing 345 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00261-JEJ, Plaintiff Edward Ray Waddell by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court shall conduct a status call in this matter on December 11, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Lead and Liaison Counsel Sol H. Weiss shall convene the call to Chambers, (717) 221-3986, with all appropriate counsel on the line and prepared to proceed.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/2/19. (dmn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 343 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01647-JEJ, Plaintiffs Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr. et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 30, 2019 Filing 342 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00262-JEJ, Plaintiffs Phillip Lamar West and Karen Austin by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 30, 2019 Filing 341 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00352-JEJ, Plaintiffs James R. Teal et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #338 Motion to Extend Time (eo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 338 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 2 weeks by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt.(LeClercq, Ben)
September 9, 2019 Filing 337 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00253-JEJ, Plaintiffs Lori Weinacker et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 336 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00257-JEJ, Plaintiffs James and Kaye Thomason by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 335 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00263-JEJ, Plaintiffs Robert Sheely et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 334 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01621-JEJ, Plaintiff James Patterson by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 333 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00585-JEJ, Plaintiffs Carol McKinney et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 332 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00256-JEJ, Plaintiffs Melvin Mattison et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 331 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01978-JEJ, Plaintiff Armando Lopez by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 330 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00260-JEJ, Plaintiffs Earl and Laura Gilstrap by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 329 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00254-JEJ, Plaintiffs Thomas and Rosann Fowler by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 328 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00259-JEJ, Plaintiffs Tina DeYoung Smith et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 327 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00491-JEJ, Plaintiffs Kuo Raid Grant Chen et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 326 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01033-JEJ, Plaintiff Donrue Talley Brathovd by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00308-JEJ, Plaintiff Jennifer Ramirez et al., by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 9, 2019 Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00255-JEJ, Plaintiff, Kimberly Bagwell et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #322 Motion to Dismiss 18cv1812 (eo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 322 MOTION to Dismiss by Armando Cuellar, Aleyda Romero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wicker, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER - After a conference call with the parties on a discovery dispute and in accordance with the discussion at that conference, IT IS ORDERED that the Britts' request to depose defendants' sales representatives Adam Clark and Chelsea Meadows and defendants' former service engineer Allan Whittington is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the Britts seeking such discovery in accordance with paragraphs E.14 and E.15 of Case Management Order No. 15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/27/2019. (ktt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 320 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00244-JEJ, Plaintiff Debra Prescott, Individually and as Executor of the Estate of Ronald Prescott by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 27, 2019 Filing 319 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00258-JEJ, Plaintiff Felicia Johnson by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 27, 2019 Filing 318 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00246-JEJ, Plaintiffs Dennis Jenkins and Donna Jenkins by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 27, 2019 Filing 317 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01649-JEJ, Plaintiffs Keith O'Neal Ford and Shelly Lynn Sedatol Ford, Individually and on Behalf of their minor child, B.E.F. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 27, 2019 Filing 316 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00288-JEJ, Plaintiffs Kermit Cantrell and Barbara Ann Cantrell by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 15, 2019 Filing 314 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Casse No. 1:18-cv-00883-JEJ, Plaintiff Ken Kvammen by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 15, 2019 Filing 313 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 18-cv-00272-JEJ, Plaintiff, Maria Garver by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 15, 2019 Filing 312 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01881-JEJ, Plaintiff, John P. Garcia by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 15, 2019 Filing 311 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 18-cv-00264-JEJ, Plaintiff, Danna Brackenbury by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 310 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the District of California Central requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-27 Tag Along Order filed 8/13/19. (dmn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 309 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/13/19.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/13/19. (dmn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 308 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01036 - JEJ, Plaintiffs, Therese Williams et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 307 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 18-cv-01035-JEJ, Plaintiffs, Francisco Meza and Maria Isabel Meza by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00581-JEJ, Plaintiffs, Jean Jones,et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 305 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-02147-JEJ, Plaintiff Dolores Harmon by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 304 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 18-cv-01627-JEJ, Plaintiffs, Gary F. Gerardi et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 303 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00584-JEJ, Plaintiff Melba Favors by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 302 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00266-JEJ, Plaintiffs Thomas Dezenski and Elizabeth Dezenski by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 301 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01379-JEJ, Plaintiffs Donald Hesse and Agnes Hesse by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 12, 2019 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Goss on behalf of LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin USA, Inc. (Goss, Peter)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference RESCHEUDLED for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/6/2019. (ktt)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a telephone conference regarding the discovery dispute outlined in the August 2, 2019, letter from Ben Le Clercq, Esquire shall be held on August 12, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be by telephone. Attorney Le Clercq shall initiate the call by calling Chambers. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on August 5, 2019. (kjn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 297 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:17-cv-01233-JEJ, Plaintiffs Richard Whipkey, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 296 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01685-JEJ, Plaintiff Vanita L. Thompson by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 295 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00247-JEJ, Plaintiffs Kathy Thomas, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 294 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01461-JEJ, Plaintiffs Michelle D. Terry, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 293 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01512-JEJ, Plaintiffs Joseph Surdi, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 292 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01356-JEJ, Plaintiffs Vivian Summerville, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 291 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00236-JEJ, Plaintiffs Nancy Stewart, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 290 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00248-JEJ, Plaintiff Terrence A. Smith by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 289 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00835-JEJ, Plaintiff Bessie Selfridge by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 288 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00242-JEJ, Plaintiffs Helen Ann Reed, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 287 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00834-JEJ, Plaintiffs Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 286 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00276-JEJ, Plaintiffs Peter Kuhnmuench, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 285 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01427-JEJ, Plaintiffs Richard P. Klestinez, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 284 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00635-JEJ, Plaintiff Robert King by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 283 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01768-JEJ, Plaintiffs Hester A. Hershey, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 282 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01420-JEJ, Plaintiffs Benjamin Haupt, et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 281 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00882-JEJ, Plaintiff Kristine L. Hamilton by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 280 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00243-JEJ, Plaintiffs Alfonso Goree et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 279 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00238-JEJ, Plaintiff Patricia Faeth by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 278 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00239-JEJ, Plaintiffs Duane Eisenberg et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 277 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00240-JEJ, Plaintiffs Lorraine Diaz et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 276 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01369-JEJ, Plaintiffs Magaly De La Cruz et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00241-JEJ, Plaintiffs Robin Crawford et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 274 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00234-JEJ, Plaintiffs Martin Austin Colson et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 273 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01620-JEJ, Plaintiffs William Clanton et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 272 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01459-JEJ, Plaintiffs Tanika Carter et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 271 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-01352-JEJ, Plaintiffs Carol Bopp et al. by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 270 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00235-JEJ, Plaintiff Van Sidney Blevins III by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
August 1, 2019 Filing 269 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Case No. 1:18-cv-00245-JEJ, Plaintiff Matthew Adams by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED and Plaintiff is permitted to file her aforesaid Petition and all exhibits thereto under seal and the Clerk of Court is directed to immediately seal those documents.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/23/19. (dmn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 266 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolyn Green, Harold Green (Petoyan, Marcus)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a telephonic status conference in this matter on September 25, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs shall ensure that counsel for Defendants is on the line before initiating the call into Chambers at (717) 221-3986.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/17/19. (dmn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 262 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jared B. Briant (Briant, Jared)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER re #260 Application Approved - Attorney Bethany M Gullman terminated.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 6/11/19. (dmn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 260 Application to Withdraw the Appearance of Bethany M. Gullman , filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the LivaNova Defendants' Application to Withdraw the Appearance of Bethany M. Gullman)(Gullman, Bethany)
June 4, 2019 Filing 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(LeClercq, Ben)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #257 Motion to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund (eo)
May 31, 2019 Filing 257 Unopposed MOTION Establish Qualified Settlement Fund by Wilma Abplanalp, Matthew Adams, Elizabeth Ahl, Elizabeth (I) Ahl, Karen Austin, Ennis Bagwell, Vickie Bagwell, Van Sidney Blevins, III, Carol Bopp, Heather Bopp, Jason Bopp, Danna Brackenbury, Donrue Talley Brathovd, Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt, Melissa Canfield, Barbara Ann Cantrell, Kermit Cantrell, Tanika Carter, Tanika Carter, Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen, William Clanton, Gloria Collins, Alexandra Colson, Martin Austin Colson, Christine Crabtree, Timothy Crabtree, Robin Crawford, Nicole Crumb, Armando Cuellar, Elizabeth J. Dezenski, Thomas Dezenski, Lorraine Diaz, Richard Diaz, Nolan Dunaway, Melissa Edwards, Duane Eisenberg, Janna Eisenberg, Patricia Faeth, Melba Favors, Keith O'Neal Ford, Shelly Lynn Sedatol Ford, Rosann Fowler, Thomas Fowler, John P. Garcia, Hayes Garver, II, Maria Garver, Gary F. Gerardi, Earl Gilstrap, Laura Gilstrap, Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez, Alfonso Goree, Carolyn Green, Harold Green, Kyle Hamer, Kristine L. Hamilton, Dolores Harmon, Benjamin Haupt, Maggie Haupt, Hester A. Hershey, Lloyd A. Hershey, Agnes Hesse, Donald Hesse, Liric Jackson, Dennis Jenkins, Donna Jenkins, Felicia Johnson, Jean Jones, Robert Jones, James J. Judge, Robert M. King, Margaret R Klestinez, Richard P Klestinez, Susaun Kmak, Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench, Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen, Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger, Armando Lopez, Delacy Lucas, Kerry Lyons, Christina Mann, Melvin Mattison, Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney, Dana Menesses, Michael D. Menesses, Jr., Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza, Lari Miller, Lyndee Miller, Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr, James Patterson, Bernard Poole, Debra Prescott, Jennifer Ramirez, Elizabeth A Reed, Helen Ann Reed, Ronald Reed, Ross Reed, Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella, Aleyda Romero, Jason Sams, Michael Santore, Paul Santore, Debra Schuster, Bessie Linda Selfridge, Meloney Sheely, Robert Sheely, Terrence A Smith, Tina DeYoung Smith, Bridget Southall, Dwight Southall, Jr, Heather Stewart, Joseph Stewart, Nancy Stewart, William Stewart, Albert Summerville, Vivian Summerville, Joseph C. Surdi, Pamela J. Surdi, Sandra M. Susco, Jon Sykes, James R. Teal, Michelle D Terry, Michelle D Terry, The Estate of Father Harold W. Kist, James Thomas, Kathy Thomas, James Thomason, Kaye Thomason, Vanita L. Thompson, Anna Upicksoun, Edward Ray Waddell, Lori Weinacker, Phillip Lamar West, Elizabeth Whipkey, Richard Whipkey, Theresa Williams, Lynne Williams-Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Sol)
May 10, 2019 Filing 256 Letter from Counsel for New Orleans Plaintiffs . (Bialous, Todd)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 02:00 PM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs shall ensure that counsel for Defendants is on the line before initiating the call into Chambers at 717-221-3986.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 5/2/19. (dmn)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER regarding Restricted Access to Children's Documents. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 4/29/2019. (ktt)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 4/16/2019. (ktt)
April 16, 2019 Filing 250 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 15 - Docket Control Order For Any Ongoing Litigation. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 4/16/19. (dmn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER - AND NOW, upon receipt and consideration of the parties regarding a discovery dispute with Children's Hospital New Orleans, (Doc. 248), and consistent with our prior Case Management Order of June 4, 2018, appointing Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab as the Discovery Master for this multi-district litigation, (Doc. 60), it is hereby ORDERED that this dispute shall be REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for resolution.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 4/15/19. (dmn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 248 Letter from Sol H Weiss . (Weiss, Sol)
March 27, 2019 Filing 246 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS, filed by Wesley J. Armstrong, of status conference call held before Judge Jones on 27 March 2019. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Jones on 27 March 2019. By: s/ Wesley J. Armstrong, RMR.
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Order - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Livanova PLC, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, and Livanova Deutschland GMBH - SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/27/19. (dmn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 244 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Ohio Southern District requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-26 Tag Along Order filed 3/20/19. (dmn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 243 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/20/19. (dmn)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #238 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leland Patrick Abide terminated.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/11/19. (dmn)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #237 Motion for Reconsideration - The February 26, 2019 Order entered in Civil Action No. 18-cv-2379-JEJ is hereby amended to require that: Plaintiffs shall complete service on Sorin Group Deutschland pursuant to the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and the Hague Convention Procedures. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/8/19. (dmn)
March 8, 2019 Filing 238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Elizabeth Ahl, Danna Brackenbury, Melba Favors, Maria Garver, Dolores Harmon, Kenneth Kvammen, Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza, Anna Upicksoun. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abide, Leland)
March 7, 2019 Filing 237 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Authorizing Service on US Counsel by Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Service on Defendant Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH by Delivery to Its US Attorney, #2 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
March 4, 2019 Filing 236 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 14.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/4/19. (dmn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 235 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Proposed Case Management Order No. 14 by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference call currently scheduled for February 28, 2019, at 2:00 pm. shall be reset for 12:30 p.m. on the same day. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 1/30/19. (dmn)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #230 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leslie Benita Hayden shall be withdrawn.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 1/10/19.(dmn)
January 9, 2019 Filing 230 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Leslie)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conferences set for 1/23/2019 @ 02:00 PM; 2/28/2019 @ 02:00 PM; 3/27/2019 @ 02:00; and 4/23/2019 @ 02:00 PM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Plaintiffs' Leadership Group shall ensure that Defendants' Lead and Liaison counsel are on the line before initiating the calls into Chambers at 717-221-3986.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/21/18. (dmn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 227 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Armando Lopez. LivaNova USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (McMullen, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 226 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Armando Lopez. Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (McMullen, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER - Upon Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute Parties and Enter his First Amended Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED: 1) Ken Kvammen, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Estate of ElizabethKvammen, is named as Plaintiff in this action; and 2)Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, as attached to his Motion, is hereby entered.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/17/18. (dmn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 224 MOTION to Substitute Party and Enter First Amended Complaint by Kenneth Kvammen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER - Considering the forgoing Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint #217 ; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is granted, allowing the filing of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint into the record, this 17th day of December, 2018.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/17/18. (dmn)
December 15, 2018 Filing 222 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Gloria Collins. LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Bialous, Todd)
December 15, 2018 Filing 221 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Gloria Collins. Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (Bialous, Todd)
December 14, 2018 Filing 220 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the District of South Carolina requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-25 Tag Along Order filed 12/14/18. (dmn)
December 14, 2018 Filing 219 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/14/18. (dmn)
December 13, 2018 Filing 218 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Gary F. Gerardi. (Bowden, Wesley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 217 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Gary F. Gerardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Letters of Administration, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D - Amended Complaint Red line version, #5 Proposed Order)(Bowden, Wesley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary F. Gerardi Stipulated Dismissal as to LivaNova PLC (Bowden, Wesley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 215 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dolores Harmon. Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 11/26/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (Johnson, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 214 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Dolores Harmon. (Johnson, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #212 Motion to Substitute Party and Enter Amended Complaint.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/10/18. (dmn)
December 7, 2018 Filing 212 MOTION to Substitute Party and Enter Amended Complaint by Kuo Raid Grant Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Letters of Administration, #3 Exhibit(s) C - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) D- Red line version of First Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Order)(Bowden, Wesley)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Parties and enter her First Amended Complaint #207 is Granted.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/6/18. (dmn)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER - Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #203 is granted, allowing the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint into the Record.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/6/18 (dmn)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER - Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #202 is granted, allowing the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint into the Record.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/6/18. (dmn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 208 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Hsue Y. Jenny Chen by Kuo Raid Grant Chen. (Bowden, Wesley)
December 4, 2018 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party and Enter Amended Complaint by Carol Mckinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) B) Letters of Administration, #3 Exhibit(s) C) Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) D) Amended Complaint - Red line version, #5 Proposed Order)(Bowden, Wesley)
December 4, 2018 Filing 206 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Michael A. McKinney by Carol Mckinney. (Bowden, Wesley)
December 4, 2018 Filing 205 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kyle Hamer. Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Fransen, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 204 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kyle Hamer. LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Fransen, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 203 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Theresa Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit(s) B) Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C) Red line Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Bowden, Wesley)
December 4, 2018 Filing 202 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Jennifer Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit(s) B) Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C) Red line version of Second Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Bowden, Wesley)
December 3, 2018 Filing 201 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 13 - APPOINTING SETTLEMENT MASTER.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 12/3/18. (dmn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Leland Patrick Abide on behalf of Dolores Harmon (Abide, Leland)
November 26, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Pearson on behalf of Dolores Harmon (Pearson, Kenneth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Johnson on behalf of Dolores Harmon (Johnson, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #194 Motion to Dismiss.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 11/16/18. (dmn)
November 12, 2018 Filing 195 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Kenneth Kvammen. (Johnson, Michael)
November 12, 2018 Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25 by Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Patitsas, Magda)
November 9, 2018 Filing 193 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John P. Garcia. LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Sorin Group USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Salkow, Richard)
November 6, 2018 Filing 192 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Central District of California requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-24 Tag Along Order filed 11/6/18. (dmn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 191 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 11/6/18.(dmn)
November 1, 2018 Filing 190 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michelle D Terry. Michelle D Terry waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Widmann, Harry)
November 1, 2018 Filing 189 NOTICE Waiver of Service of Summons , filed by Tanika Carter.(Widmann, Harry)
November 1, 2018 Filing 188 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Michelle D Terry, filed by Michelle D Terry.(Widmann, Harry)
November 1, 2018 Filing 187 STIPULATION by Tanika Carter, Tanika Carter, filed by Tanika Carter, Tanika Carter.(Widmann, Harry)
October 30, 2018 Filing 186 Summons by Delacy Lucas, Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr. #118 Order,, #119 Letter on LivaNova USA, Inc. of Complaint 18-cv-6965. (Thomas, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint EDLA 2:18-cv-06965 served on Sorin Group USA, Inc. on 08/14/18, filed by Delacy Lucas, Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr. (Thomas, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by David Abboud Thomas on behalf of Delacy Lucas, Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr (Thomas, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Shienvold on behalf of LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc. (Shienvold, Adam)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/19/18. (dmn)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re #178 adopting Joint Status Report on Proceedings.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/16/18. (dmn)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin J Hakala terminated on behalf of Plaintiffs Peter Kuhnmuench and Theresa Kuhnmuench.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/15/18. (dmn)
October 12, 2018 Filing 178 STATUS REPORT on Proceedings (Joint) by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Svitak, Linda)
October 12, 2018 Filing 177 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex. 1)(Hakala, Justin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 176 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Southern District of Florida requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-23 Tag Along Order filed 10/11/18. (dmn)
October 11, 2018 Filing 175 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 10/11/18.(dmn)
October 11, 2018 Filing 174 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Debra Schuster.(Reilly, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 173 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Debra Schuster. (Reilly, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 172 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Debra Schuster. Sorin Group USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Reilly, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 171 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Debra Schuster. Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 9/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Reilly, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference call currently scheduled for November 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. shall be reset for November 26, 2018, at 2:00 p.m.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/11/18. (dmn)
October 9, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Meyers on behalf of Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench (Meyers, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2018 Filing 168 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Bridget Southall, Dwight Southall, Jr. Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 9/28/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Kraus, Douglas)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #166 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/4/18. (dmn)
October 3, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Gloria Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) First Supplemental and Amending Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Bialous, Todd)
October 3, 2018 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany M Gullman on behalf of LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., LivaNova USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC (Gullman, Bethany)
October 1, 2018 Filing 164 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by William Clanton, Melissa Edwards. LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Knoll, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #160 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/1/18 (ve)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/1/18 (ve)
September 28, 2018 Filing 161 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez. Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Sorin Group USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Busby, Adrienne)
September 28, 2018 Filing 160 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Tanika Carter. (Attachments: #1 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint)(Widmann, Harry)
September 28, 2018 Filing 159 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Michelle D Terry. (Attachments: #1 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint)(Widmann, Harry)
September 27, 2018 Filing 158 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Ennis Bagwell. (dmn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 157 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Elizabeth Ahl. Livanova Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Johnson, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Ahl. LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. served on 8/3/2018, answer due 8/24/2018. (Johnson, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 155 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Central District of California, District of Connecticut and Southern District of Mississippi requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-22 Tag Along Order filed 9/24/18. (dmn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 154 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 9/24/18.(dmn)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 9/17/18 (dmn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint by Kyle Hamer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1st Supplemental and Amending Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to File 1st Supplemental and Amending Complaint)(Fransen, Matthew)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #142 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 9/12/18 (ve)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 9/12/18 (ve)
September 7, 2018 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint by Bridget Southall, Dwight Southall, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kraus, Douglas)
September 7, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Leland Patrick Abide on behalf of Anna Upicksoun (Abide, Leland)
September 7, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Pearson on behalf of Anna Upicksoun (Pearson, Kenneth)
September 7, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Johnson on behalf of Anna Upicksoun (Johnson, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Filing 144 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-21 Tag Along Order filed 9/5/18. (ve)
September 5, 2018 Filing 143 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-21) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 9/5/18. (ve)
August 31, 2018 Filing 142 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Jean Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Weiss, Sol)
August 31, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth D. St. Pe' on behalf of Keith O'Neal Ford, Shelly Lynn Sedatol Ford (St. Pe', Kenneth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc. on 8/10/18, filed by Gary F. Gerardi. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Bowden, Wesley)
August 30, 2018 Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on LivaNova Deutschland on 7/18/18, filed by Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bowden, Wesley)
August 30, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley A. Bowden on behalf of Gary F. Gerardi (Bowden, Wesley)
August 30, 2018 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on LivaNova, PLC on 6/8/18, filed by Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bowden, Wesley)
August 30, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley A. Bowden on behalf of James Patterson (Bowden, Wesley)
August 30, 2018 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on LivaNova, PLC on 6/8/18, filed by James Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bowden, Wesley)
August 23, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicola K Larmond-Harvey on behalf of Joseph C. Surdi, Pamela J. Surdi (Larmond-Harvey, Nicola)
August 23, 2018 Filing 133 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Central District of California requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-20 Tag Along Order filed 8/23/18. (dmn)
August 23, 2018 Filing 132 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-20) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 8/23/18.(dmn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H Saunders on behalf of Joseph C. Surdi, Pamela J. Surdi (Saunders, Joseph)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference call currently scheduled for November 27, 2018, at 2:00 pm. shall be reset for 10:00 a.m. on the same day.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/22/18. (dmn)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/22/18 (dmn)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/22/18. (dmn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Liric Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Wicker, Thomas)
August 21, 2018 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #88 Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. 5 - 1:18-cv-1367) - 1. Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This matter shall be remanded back to the Civil District Court for the Parish of New Orleans. 2. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Plaintiffs from MDL Docket No. 2816, 1:18-md-2816. 3. The Clerk of Court shall further close individual docket no. 1:18-cv-1367. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/21/18. (dmn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Joensen on behalf of LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc. (Joensen, Thomas)
August 17, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Damages by Dana Menesses, Michael D. Menesses, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - First Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Proposed Order)(Warshauer, Irving)
August 17, 2018 Filing 123 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc., filed by Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Jaffe, Mark)
August 15, 2018 Filing 122 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF in Support of Motion to Remand by Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger as to #117 Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) Invoice)(Robertson, Pearl)
August 15, 2018 Filing 121 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Middle District of Florida & Southern District of Indiana requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-19 Tag Along Order filed 8/15/2018. (dmn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 120 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 8/15/18.(dmn)
August 14, 2018 Filing 119 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana & District of Colorado requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-18 Tag Along Order filed 8/14/2018. (dmn)
August 14, 2018 Filing 118 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 8/14/18.(dmn)
August 10, 2018 Filing 117 RESPONSE by Sorin Group USA, Inc. to #88 Order, Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand [Dkt. 5 in Civ. A. No. 1:18-cv-1367]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Gebauer, Mark)
August 9, 2018 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on LivaNova, PLC on 6/8/18, filed by Theresa Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service)(Bowden, Wesley)
August 9, 2018 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc. on 7/9/18, filed by Richard P Klestinez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service)(Bowden, Wesley)
August 2, 2018 Filing 114 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 11 - GRANTING SEALED FILING PRIVILEGES. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/2/2018. (ve)
August 2, 2018 Filing 113 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (ve)
August 2, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Pearl A Robertson on behalf of Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger (Robertson, Pearl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Pearl A Robertson on behalf of Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger (Robertson, Pearl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 110 STIPULATION Regarding Sealed Filing Privileges by Wilma Abplanalp, Matthew Adams, Elizabeth Ahl, Elizabeth (I) Ahl, Karen Austin, Ennis Bagwell, Vickie Bagwell, Van Sidney Blevins, III, Carol Bopp, Heather Bopp, Jason Bopp, Danna Brackenbury, Donrue Talley Brathovd, Melissa Canfield, Barbara Ann Cantrell, Kermit Cantrell, Tanika Carter, Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen, Alexandra Colson, Martin Austin Colson, Christine Crabtree, Timothy Crabtree, Robin Crawford, Nicole Crumb, Elizabeth J. Dezenski, Thomas Dezenski, Lorraine Diaz, Richard Diaz, Duane Eisenberg, Janna Eisenberg, Patricia Faeth, Melba Favors, Rosann Fowler, Thomas Fowler, Hayes Garver, II, Maria Garver, Earl Gilstrap, Laura Gilstrap, Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez, Alfonso Goree, Carolyn Green, Harold Green, Kristine L. Hamilton, Benjamin Haupt, Maggie Haupt, Hester A. Hershey, Lloyd A. Hershey, Agnes Hesse, Donald Hesse, Liric Jackson, Dennis Jenkins, Donna Jenkins, Felicia Johnson, Jean Jones, Robert Jones, James J. Judge, Robert M. King, Margaret R Klestinez, Richard P Klestinez, Susaun Kmak, Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench, Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen, Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger, Kerry Lyons, Christina Mann, Melvin Mattison, Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney, Dana Menesses, Michael D. Menesses, Jr., Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza, Lari Miller, Lyndee Miller, Bernard Poole, Debra Prescott, Jennifer Ramirez, Elizabeth A Reed, Helen Ann Reed, Ronald Reed, Ross Reed, Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella, Jason Sams, Michael Santore, Paul Santore, Bessie Linda Selfridge, Meloney Sheely, Robert Sheely, Terrence A Smith, Tina DeYoung Smith, Bridget Southall, Dwight Southall, Jr, Nancy Stewart, William Stewart, Albert Summerville, Vivian Summerville, Sandra M. Susco, Jon Sykes, James R. Teal, Michelle D Terry, James Thomas, Kathy Thomas, James Thomason, Kaye Thomason, Edward Ray Waddell, Lori Weinacker, Phillip Lamar West, Elizabeth Whipkey, Richard Whipkey, Theresa Williams, Lynne Williams-Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Sol)
July 31, 2018 Filing 108 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order - Protective Order)(Briant, Jared)
July 31, 2018 Filing 107 Defendant Fact Sheet. (ve)
July 31, 2018 Filing 106 Plaintiff Fact Sheet (ve)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Order Regarding Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Fact Sheets and Service Protocol. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/31/2018 (ve)
July 30, 2018 Filing 104 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Robert Jones Jones v. LivaNova Deutschland GmbH, et al. 1:18-cv-00581 by Jean Jones. (Weiss, Sol)
July 24, 2018 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Fact Sheets and Service Protocol by Wilma Abplanalp, Matthew Adams, Elizabeth Ahl, Elizabeth (I) Ahl, Karen Austin, Ennis Bagwell, Vickie Bagwell, Van Sidney Blevins, III, Carol Bopp, Heather Bopp, Jason Bopp, Danna Brackenbury, Donrue Talley Brathovd, Melissa Canfield, Barbara Ann Cantrell, Kermit Cantrell, Tanika Carter, Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen, Alexandra Colson, Martin Austin Colson, Christine Crabtree, Timothy Crabtree, Robin Crawford, Nicole Crumb, Elizabeth J. Dezenski, Thomas Dezenski, Lorraine Diaz, Richard Diaz, Duane Eisenberg, Janna Eisenberg, Patricia Faeth, Melba Favors, Rosann Fowler, Thomas Fowler, Hayes Garver, II, Maria Garver, Earl Gilstrap, Laura Gilstrap, Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez, Alfonso Goree, Carolyn Green, Harold Green, Kristine L. Hamilton, Benjamin Haupt, Maggie Haupt, Hester A. Hershey, Lloyd A. Hershey, Agnes Hesse, Donald Hesse, Liric Jackson, Dennis Jenkins, Donna Jenkins, Felicia Johnson, Jean Jones, Robert Jones, James J. Judge, Robert M. King, Margaret R Klestinez, Richard P Klestinez, Susaun Kmak, Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench, Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen, Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr, Tina B Leger, Kerry Lyons, Christina Mann, Melvin Mattison, Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney, Dana Menesses, Michael D. Menesses, Jr., Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza, Lari Miller, Lyndee Miller, Bernard Poole, Debra Prescott, Jennifer Ramirez, Elizabeth A Reed, Helen Ann Reed, Ronald Reed, Ross Reed, Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella, Jason Sams, Michael Santore, Paul Santore, Bessie Linda Selfridge, Meloney Sheely, Robert Sheely, Terrence A Smith, Tina DeYoung Smith, Bridget Southall, Dwight Southall, Jr, Nancy Stewart, William Stewart, Albert Summerville, Vivian Summerville, Sandra M. Susco, Jon Sykes, James R. Teal, Michelle D Terry, James Thomas, Kathy Thomas, James Thomason, Kaye Thomason, Edward Ray Waddell, Lori Weinacker, Phillip Lamar West, Elizabeth Whipkey, Richard Whipkey, Theresa Williams, Lynne Williams-Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Weiss, Sol)
July 20, 2018 Filing 102 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Lyndee Miller; Miller v. LivaNova PLC et al., 1:18-CV-00221-JEJ by Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (Gebauer, Mark)
July 18, 2018 Filing 101 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana & Middle District of Florida requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-17 Tag Along Order filed 7/18/2018 (ve)
July 18, 2018 Filing 100 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/18/2018. (ve)
July 17, 2018 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Bessie Linda Selfridge. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 17, 2018 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 17, 2018 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 17, 2018 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 17, 2018 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Bessie Linda Selfridge. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 17, 2018 Filing 94 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana, Eastern District of Missouri, Eastern District of New York and Northern District of Texas requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-16 Tag Along Order filed 7/17/2018 (ve)
July 17, 2018 Filing 93 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/17/2018. (ve)
July 16, 2018 Filing 92 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-15 Tag Along Order filed 7/16/2018. (ve)
July 16, 2018 Filing 91 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/16/2018. (ve)
July 13, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bessie Linda Selfridge as to LivaNova, PLC only (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 13, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella as to LivaNova, PLC only (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re MOTION to Remand to State Court (Doc #5- 1:18-cv-1367) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants SHALL FILE a brief in opposition to the motion to remand by or before August 10, 2018.2. Plaintiffs MAY FILE a brief in reply within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the Defendants brief in opposition. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/10/2018.(ve) (ve)
July 10, 2018 Filing 87 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10- ESTABLISHING STATE COURT LIAISON COMMITTEE; Motion for Appointment of State Court Liasion Committee #85 is hereby GRANTED. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/10/18. (ve)
July 10, 2018 Filing 86 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 9- ESTABLISHING OBLIGATIONS OF PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP GROUP. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/10/2018. (ve)
July 10, 2018 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Wilma Abplanalp, Matthew Adams, Elizabeth Ahl, Elizabeth (I) Ahl, Karen Austin, Ennis Bagwell, Vickie Bagwell, Van Sidney Blevins, III, Carol Bopp, Heather Bopp, Jason Bopp, Danna Brackenbury, Donrue Talley Brathovd, Melissa Canfield, Barbara Ann Cantrell, Kermit Cantrell, Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen, Alexandra Colson, Martin Austin Colson, Christine Crabtree, Timothy Crabtree, Robin Crawford, Nicole Crumb, Elizabeth J. Dezenski, Thomas Dezenski, Lorraine Diaz, Richard Diaz, Duane Eisenberg, Janna Eisenberg, Patricia Faeth, Melba Favors, Rosann Fowler, Thomas Fowler, Hayes Garver, II, Maria Garver, Earl Gilstrap, Laura Gilstrap, Alfonso Goree, Carolyn Green, Harold Green, Kristine L. Hamilton, Hester A. Hershey, Lloyd A. Hershey, Dennis Jenkins, Donna Jenkins, Felicia Johnson, Jean Jones, Robert Jones, James J. Judge, Robert M. King, Susaun Kmak, Peter Kuhnmuench, Theresa Kuhnmuench, Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen, Christina Mann, Melvin Mattison, Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney, Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza, Lari Miller, Lyndee Miller, Bernard Poole, Debra Prescott, Jennifer Ramirez, Elizabeth A Reed, Helen Ann Reed, Ronald Reed, Ross Reed, Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella, Jason Sams, Bessie Linda Selfridge, Meloney Sheely, Robert Sheely, Terrence A Smith, Tina DeYoung Smith, Nancy Stewart, William Stewart, Albert Summerville, Vivian Summerville, Sandra M. Susco, Jon Sykes, James R. Teal, James Thomas, Kathy Thomas, James Thomason, Kaye Thomason, Edward Ray Waddell, Lori Weinacker, Phillip Lamar West, Elizabeth Whipkey, Richard Whipkey, Theresa Williams, Lynne Williams-Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Weiss, Sol)
July 9, 2018 Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8- COORDINATION LETTER TO STATE JUDGES. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/9/18. (ve)
July 9, 2018 Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7- LIFT DISCOVERY STAY AND SEALING PROCEDURE. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/9/2018. (ve)
July 6, 2018 Filing 84 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana and Clerk in the Northern District of New York requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-14 Tag Along Order filed 7/6/2018. (ve)
July 6, 2018 Filing 83 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on on 7/6/18. (ve)
July 5, 2018 Filing 80 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-13 Tag Along Order filed 7/5/2018. (ve)
July 5, 2018 Filing 79 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/5/2018. (ve)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #73 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant LivaNova PLC Without Prejudice filed by Donrue Talley Brathovd. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 7/2/18. (ve)
June 29, 2018 Filing 74 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6 - outlining certain case-specific and generic discovery and other goals for the next 120 day period. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 6/29/18. (aaa)
June 28, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donrue Talley Brathovd of Defendant LivaNova PLC Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeGaris, Annesley)
June 28, 2018 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Donrue Talley Brathovd. (DeGaris, Annesley)
June 28, 2018 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Donrue Talley Brathovd. (DeGaris, Annesley)
June 26, 2018 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hsue Y. Jenny Chen, Kuo Raid Grant Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on a Corporation)(Bowden, Wesley)
June 22, 2018 Filing 78 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Central District of California, Eastern District of California and District of Colorado requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-12 Tag Along Order filed 6/22/2018. (ve)
June 22, 2018 Filing 77 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-12) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 6/22/2018. (ve)
June 20, 2018 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kristine L. Hamilton. All Defendants. (Shuart, Blake)
June 19, 2018 Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5- ESTABLISHING COMMON BENEFIT FEE AND EXPENSE FUND. See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 6/19/18. (ve)
June 19, 2018 Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Revised Joint Proposal for initial case schedule (first 120 days) by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order revised joint proposed CMO for Court entry)(Gebauer, Mark)
June 19, 2018 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by James J. Judge. (Rosenband, David)
June 19, 2018 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by James J. Judge. (Rosenband, David)
June 19, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by David Rosenband on behalf of James J. Judge (Rosenband, David)
June 8, 2018 CASE REFERRED for discovery only to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab;. (jw)
June 7, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey W. Shannon on behalf of Robert M. King (Shannon, Kelsey)
June 6, 2018 Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Bernard Poole. [Filed in 1:18-cv-273 on 6/6/2018] (ve)
June 5, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Bradley on behalf of Francisco Javier Meza (Bradley, Michael)
June 4, 2018 Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 - Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 6/4/18. (ve)
June 4, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley A. Bowden on behalf of Bernard Poole (Bowden, Wesley)
May 31, 2018 Filing 57 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 - Appointment of Lead & Liason Counsel and Executive Committee. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 5/31/2018. (ve)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Substitute Party. Lorraine Diaz added. See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 5/30/2018 (ve)
May 31, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Substitute Party and Enter an Amended Complaint filed by Lorraine Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) Letters of Administration, #3 Proposed Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)[Filed in case 1:18-cv-240 on 5/29/2018]
May 31, 2018 Filing 54 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Richard Diaz [Filed in case 1:18-cv-240 on 5/29/2018] (ve)
May 31, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carol Mckinney, Michael A Mckinney as to LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc. [Filed in case 1:18-cv-585 on 5/29/2018] (ve)
May 31, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Theresa Williams as to LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc. [Filed in case 1:18-cv-1036 on 5/29/2018] (ve)
May 30, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P Fahey on behalf of Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA, Inc. (Fahey, Sean)
May 29, 2018 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza. (Johnson, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza. (Johnson, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza. (Johnson, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Leland Patrick Abide on behalf of Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza (Abide, Leland)
May 29, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Pearson on behalf of Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza (Pearson, Kenneth)
May 29, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Johnson on behalf of Francisco Javier Meza, Maria Isabel Meza (Johnson, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen. (Johnson, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen. (Johnson, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Melba Favors. (Johnson, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melba Favors. (Johnson, Michael)
May 23, 2018 Filing 40 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Northern District of New York requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-11 Tag Along Order filed 5/23/2018. (ve)
May 23, 2018 Filing 39 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/23/2018. (ve)
May 16, 2018 Filing 38 Joint MDL Conference Agenda filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH. (Gebauer, Mark)
May 16, 2018 Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH. (Gebauer, Mark)
May 16, 2018 Filing 36 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-10 Tag Along Order filed 5/16/2018. (ve)
May 16, 2018 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/16/2018. (ve)
May 15, 2018 Filing 34 Application for Proposed Plaintiffs' Leadership Group . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Michael)
May 14, 2018 Filing 33 Application Application to PSC . (Bordes, Kenneth)
May 14, 2018 Filing 32 Application for the PSC . (Centola, Lawrence)
May 14, 2018 Filing 31 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Central District of California and Southern District of Alabama requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-9 Tag Along Order filed 5/11/2018. (ve)
May 11, 2018 Filing 30 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/11/2018. (ve)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sorin Group S.P.A., LivaNova USA, Inc., Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Livanova Deutschland GMBH. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 5/7/2018. (ve)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Substitute Party. It is hereby ORDERED: 1) Maria Garver, Individually and as Successor in Interest to the Estate of Hayes Garver, is named as Plaintiff in this action; and 2) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, as attached to her Motion, is hereby entered. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 5/7/2018. (ve)
May 4, 2018 Filing 27 First MOTION to Substitute Party and Amend Complaint by Maria Garver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Michael)
May 4, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Maria Garver Suggesting Death of Plaintiff Hayes G Garver (Johnson, Michael)
May 3, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LivaNova USA, Inc., Livanova Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group S.P.A. Joint Stipulation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busby, Adrienne)
May 2, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Pearson on behalf of Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen (Pearson, Kenneth)
May 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Johnson on behalf of Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen (Johnson, Michael)
May 2, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Leland Patrick Abide on behalf of Elizabeth Kvammen, Kenneth Kvammen (Abide, Leland)
April 24, 2018 Filing 21 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Central District of California and District of Kansas requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-8 Tag Along Order filed 4/23/2018 (ve)
April 23, 2018 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/23/2018. (ve)
April 17, 2018 Filing 19 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Southern District of Florida requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-7 Tag Along Order filed 4/17/2018 (ve)
April 17, 2018 Filing 18 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/17/2018. (ve)
April 13, 2018 Filing 17 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Southern District of Florida requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-6 Tag Along Order filed 4/13/2018. (ve)
April 13, 2018 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/13/2018. (ve)
March 23, 2018 Filing 15 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Northern District of New York requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-5 Tag Along Order filed 3/23/2018. (ve)
March 23, 2018 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/23/2018. (ve)
March 13, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the District of Nebraska, District of Maryland and Southern District of Indiana requesting transfer of their case(s) to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-4 Tag Along Order filed 3/13/2018. (ve)
March 13, 2018 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on on 3/13/2018. (ve)
March 9, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-3 Tag Along Order filed 3/9/2018. (ve)
March 9, 2018 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/9/2018. (ve)
February 28, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the Middle District of North Carolina requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-2 Tag Along Order filed 2/28/2018 (ve)
February 28, 2018 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/28/18 (ve)
February 26, 2018 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2- RE: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2018 @ 10:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Honorable John E. Jones III. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/26/2018. (ve)
February 12, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the District of Colorado requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-1 Tag Along Order filed 2/12/2018. (ve)
February 12, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/12/18. (ve)
February 9, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1- See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/8/2018. (ve)
February 8, 2018 Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1 - See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/8/2018. (ve)
February 8, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: NOTICE TO COUNSEL: PLEASE BE ADVISED, PRO HAC VICE PETITIONS SHOULD NOT BE FILED IN THIS CASE (ve)
February 6, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Svitak and Attorney Briant specially admitted under 17cv1233. (ch1)
February 5, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Svitak and Attorney Briant. (ch1)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Deputy Clerk addresssed to multiple districts with cases to be transferred in to our MDL case. Certified Transfer Order from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel in Washington, DC attached. (sc)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1 UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER - MDL No. 2816. The actions listed in the order are transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvnia, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E. Jones, III for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chair, of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Sarah S. Vance on 2/1/2018. (jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDL 2816 IN RE: SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Represented By: Mark E. Gebauer
Represented By: Linda S Svitak
Represented By: Jared B Briant
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Sharp
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Represented By: Matthew A Barley
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Represented By: Mark J. Winebrenner
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Ross W Johnson
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Represented By: Lisa M Rice
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Represented By: Joseph M. Price
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Del Val
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Represented By: Douglas L. Prochnow
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Meghan E. Carter
Represented By: Sean P Fahey
Represented By: Traci McKee
Represented By: Sara Sofia Svedberg
Represented By: Adrienne F Busby
Represented By: Haroon Anwar
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Represented By: Elisha Calvin Biel
Represented By: James Cullen Evans
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Represented By: Blake Anthony Angelino
Represented By: Christin Jaye Eaton
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Gwenn Snyder Karr
Represented By: Mark J Arndt
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livanova Deutschland GMBH
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Represented By: Mark E. Gebauer
Represented By: Linda S Svitak
Represented By: Jared B Briant
Represented By: Emily R. Bodtke
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Stricklin
Represented By: Mark A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Ryan D. Ewles
Represented By: Ross W Johnson
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Lisa M Rice
Represented By: Joseph M. Price
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Del Val
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Traci McKee
Represented By: Elisha Calvin Biel
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: James Cullen Evans
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Represented By: Amrit K Dhaliwal
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Gwenn Snyder Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livanova PLC
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Represented By: Mark E. Gebauer
Represented By: Emily R. Bodtke
Represented By: Mark A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Ryan D. Ewles
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivaNova USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedars Sinai Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Ross W Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Price
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group S.P.A.
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emily R. Bodtke
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Stricklin
Represented By: Mark A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Ryan D. Ewles
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Represented By: Lisa M Rice
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Traci McKee
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: Amrit K Dhaliwal
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Represented By: Erica Abshez Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-200 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Represented By: Mark E. Gebauer
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Sharp
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Ross W Johnson
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Del Val
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Represented By: Douglas L. Prochnow
Represented By: Sean P Fahey
Represented By: Sara Sofia Svedberg
Represented By: Adrienne F Busby
Represented By: Haroon Anwar
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Represented By: Blake Anthony Angelino
Represented By: Christin Jaye Eaton
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Mark J Arndt
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutchland
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Bagwell
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland, GmbH
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Represented By: Mark E. Gebauer
Represented By: Emily R. Bodtke
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Stricklin
Represented By: Mark A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Ryan D. Ewles
Represented By: Ross W Johnson
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Lisa M Rice
Represented By: Joseph M. Price
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Del Val
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Traci McKee
Represented By: Elisha Calvin Biel
Represented By: James Cullen Evans
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Represented By: Amrit K Dhaliwal
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Gwenn Snyder Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group USA Inc.
Represented By: Emily R. Bodtke
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Stricklin
Represented By: Mark A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Ryan D. Ewles
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Represented By: Lisa M Rice
Represented By: Jared B. Briant
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Represented By: Bridget M Ahmann
Represented By: Leslie Benita Hayden
Represented By: Traci McKee
Represented By: Amrit K Dhaliwal
Represented By: Bethany M Gullman
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Peter J Goss
Represented By: Erica Abshez Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Whipkey
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Whipkey
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Goree
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Represented By: Richard R Rosenthal
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Mckinney
Represented By: Scott B Goldstein
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kermit Cantrell
Represented By: James L Ward, Jr
Represented By: Olen G Haynes
Represented By: Olen G Haynes, Jr
Represented By: J Stephen Welch
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liric Jackson
Represented By: James A Watkins
Represented By: Thomas Carey Wicker, III
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Jones
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Stewart
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Bordes
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Kenneth C Bordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Represented By: Katherine Ann Kiziah
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Abplanalp
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Douglas A. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Cantrell
Represented By: James L Ward, Jr
Represented By: Olen G Haynes
Represented By: Olen G Haynes, Jr
Represented By: J Stephen Welch
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Isabel Meza
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Jordon R Harlan
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Crumb
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donrue Talley Brathovd
Represented By: Annesley H DeGaris
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Eisenberg
Represented By: Melissa R. Jelen
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Represented By: Steven W. Sanford
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Surdi
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Represented By: Nicola K Larmond-Harvey
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Dunaway
Represented By: James M. Priest, Jr.
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Crawford
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce L Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd A. Hershey
Represented By: Nicole T. Matteo
Represented By: Paul D. Brandes
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Peter M. Villari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Bessie Linda Selfridge
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Represented By: Katherine Ann Kiziah
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. Dezenski
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Adams
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Hesse
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ryan M. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hester A. Hershey
Represented By: Nicole T. Matteo
Represented By: Paul D. Brandes
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Peter M. Villari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Paul Mitchell, Sr.
Represented By: David Abboud Thomas
Represented By: Hayden A. Moore
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomason
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Garcia
Represented By: Richard G Salkow
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ramirez
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Adams
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Haupt
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Santore
Represented By: Kathleen P Kettles
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A Reed
Represented By: Karen A Lorenzen
Represented By: Michael Hayes Biderman
Represented By: James P Hayes
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Southall, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Brener
Represented By: Chelsea B. Cusimano
Represented By: Susannah C. McKinney
Represented By: Douglas R. Kraus
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Lisa Brener (T)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Diaz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: David Rosenband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magaly de la Cruz Gonzalez
Represented By: Mark Eric Jaffe
Represented By: Louis L. Plotkin
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret R Klestinez
Represented By: Ellen A Presby
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ellen A. Presby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jenkins
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Richard Schulte
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Diaz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: David Rosenband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Meza
Represented By: Michael C Bradley
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Jordon R Harlan
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sykes
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Crabtree
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola
Represented By: Kenneth C Bordes
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stewart
Represented By: Ashton R. Smith
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hamer
Represented By: Jeffery Patrick Brothers
Represented By: Matthew Remy Fransen
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Sanders
Represented By: David L. Colvin
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Surdi
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Represented By: Nicola K Larmond-Harvey
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Weinacker
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Collins
Represented By: Todd J Bialous
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith O'Neal Ford
Represented By: Kenneth D. St. Pe'
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Mann
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Lamar West
Represented By: J Stephen Welch
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sams
Represented By: Robert Thomas Dassow
Represented By: William Frederick Eckhart
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuo Raid Grant Chen
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Represented By: Lauren Oriana Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina DeYoung Smith
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndee Miller
Represented By: M. Edvard Shprukhman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Michelle D Terry
Represented By: Harry T. Widmann
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Reed
Represented By: Karen A Lorenzen
Represented By: Michael Hayes Biderman
Represented By: James P Hayes
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Mckinney
Represented By: Scott B Goldstein
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Haupt
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P Klestinez
Represented By: Ellen A Presby
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ellen A. Presby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Green
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Marcus A Petoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Canfield
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bopp
Represented By: Andrew C. Bryman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Prescott
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce L Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ennis Bagwell
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina B Leger
Represented By: Charles A. Mouton
Represented By: Pearl A Robertson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Patrick Hillary Hufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayes Garver, II
Represented By: Khaldoun A Baghdadi
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Jasleen Singh
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Peter L Kaufman
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clanton
Represented By: Gregory L. Laker
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Knoll
Represented By: Jeff S. Gibson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Greg L. Laker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hsue Y. Jenny Chen
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Lauren Oriana Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine L. Hamilton
Represented By: Anne M. Hull
Represented By: Blake A. Shuart
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Andrew W. Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Summerville
Represented By: Andrew C. Bryman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Southall
Represented By: Lisa Brener
Represented By: Chelsea B. Cusimano
Represented By: Susannah C. McKinney
Represented By: Douglas R. Kraus
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Lisa Brener (T)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Menesses
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Robert J. David
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Austin
Represented By: J Stephen Welch
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ahl
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ray Waddell
Represented By: James L Ward, Jr
Represented By: J Stephen Welch
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Austin Colson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Scott McFadyen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kvammen
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Ross Weltin
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Aubrey Leger, Jr
Represented By: Charles A. Mouton
Represented By: Pearl A Robertson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Patrick Hillary Hufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Britt
Represented By: Ben LeClercq
Represented By: Scott P. Riddell
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Upicksoun
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Jordon R Harlan
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delacy Lucas
Represented By: David Abboud Thomas
Represented By: Hayden A. Moore
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Patterson
Represented By: Seth Alan Katz
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Colson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Scott McFadyen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Reed
Represented By: Karen A Lorenzen
Represented By: Michael Hayes Biderman
Represented By: James P Hayes
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. James Thomas
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Richard Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sheely
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: Evan W. Jones
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Eric Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Menesses, Jr.
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Robert J. David
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Crabtree
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola
Represented By: Kenneth C Bordes
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susaun Kmak
Represented By: Dean James Caras
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Williams-Sykes
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosann Fowler
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. King
Represented By: Kelsey W. Shannon
Represented By: Walter F. Benson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gilstrap
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Summerville
Represented By: Andrew C. Bryman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Garver
Represented By: Khaldoun A Baghdadi
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Jasleen Singh
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Peter L Kaufman
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Green
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Marcus A Petoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba Favors
Represented By: Thomas R. Lamb
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Mattison
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary F. Gerardi
Represented By: Wesley Bowden
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Adams
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janna Eisenberg
Represented By: Melissa R. Jelen
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Represented By: Steven W. Sanford
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Sidney Blevins, III
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Charles G. Monnett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Stewart
Represented By: Ashton R. Smith
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Lyons
Represented By: Glenn Charles McGovern
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Harry T. Widmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Jenkins
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Richard Schulte
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Schuster
Represented By: Matthew D Paradisi
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanita L. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bryman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Gilstrap
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs Tanika Carter
Represented By: Glenn Charles McGovern
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Harry T. Widmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lari Miller
Represented By: M. Edvard Shprukhman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Harmon
Represented By: Khaldoun A Baghdadi
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Jasleen Singh
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Thomason
Represented By: Mackenzie Brooke Garrison Archenhold
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Edwards
Represented By: Gregory L. Laker
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Knoll
Represented By: Jeff S. Gibson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Greg L. Laker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Cuellar
Represented By: Vincent E Odom
Represented By: James A Watkins
Represented By: Thomas Carey Wicker, III
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danna Brackenbury
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Kenneth W Pearson
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Adams
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Stewart
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Bordes
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Kenneth C Bordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Thomas
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Richard Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Faeth
Represented By: Steven S. Siegel
Represented By: S. Blakely Smith
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ashlee Edwards Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanika Carter
Represented By: Harry T. Widmann
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bopp
Represented By: Andrew C. Bryman
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Britt
Represented By: Ben LeClercq
Represented By: Scott P. Riddell
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M. Susco
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Represented By: Stephanie A. Palmer
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Judge
Represented By: David Rosenband
Represented By: James T. Snyder
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: James T Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Williams
Represented By: Benjamin Warren Gordon, Jr.
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Santore
Represented By: Kathleen P Kettles
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hesse
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Ryan M. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Teal
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence A Smith
Represented By: Paola Pearson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Michael G Reilly
Represented By: Bruce L Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth (I) Ahl
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Kuhnmuench
Represented By: Jeffrey T Meyers
Represented By: Justin J Hakala
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Ann Reed
Represented By: Karen A Lorenzen
Represented By: Michael Hayes Biderman
Represented By: James P Hayes
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Poole
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Adams
Represented By: Wesley A. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleyda Romero
Represented By: Vincent E Odom
Represented By: James A Watkins
Represented By: Thomas Carey Wicker, III
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meloney Sheely
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Roopal P Luhana
Represented By: Evan W. Jones
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: Eric Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |