Nkosi v. Commissioner et al
Petitioner: Pharaoh Ojore Nkosi
Respondent: U.S. Parole Commissioner, Ms. Cuswa and Warden
Case Number: 1:2021cv02166
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: SM
2 Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Receipt of payment from PHARAOH OJORE NKOSI in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 1/7/2022. Receipt number 333079477 processed by epetrosk. (jjs)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333079477. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ga)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 Proof of Request to have filing fee sent submitted by Pharaoh Ojore Nkosi.. (lp) Modified on 12/29/2021 (lp).
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Pharaoh Ojore Nkosi. (lp)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Pharaoh Ojore Nkosi. (Attachments: #1 List of Attachments and Exhibits, #2 CFR 2.2-03 (Military Prisoners), #3 Exhibit A-Program Statement 1/7/2000, #4 Exhibit B-Preliminary Assessment Worksheet, #5 Exhibit C-Notice of Action June 18, 2020, #6 Exhibit D-Letter to US Parole Commission dated 06/05/2013 from Petitioner and response thereto dated 09/04/2013, #7 Exhibit E-CFR 2.20(h)(2) 1 Nov 81, #8 Parole Hearings Section 524.24 pg 9, #9 P5100.08 9/12/2006 Chap 6 pg 11 Institutional Infractions)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nkosi v. Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pharaoh Ojore Nkosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Parole Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms. Cuswa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?