Wong v. Betti et al
Plaintiff: Steven Wong
Defendant: Tim Betti, Wellpath and Lackawanna County Jail Administration Dept.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01063
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Steven Wong. (ao)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff at Pike County Correctional Facility. Signed by LP on 08/02/2022. (lp)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Wong (ep)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #3 Instruction Sheet, #4 Local and Federal Rules) (ibr)
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. (ibr)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ibr)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 (Uncertified) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Wong. (ibr)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Steven Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Betti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Betti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lackawanna County Jail Administration Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?