MCGRIFF v. KAUFFMAN et al
Plaintiff: Anthony McGriff
Defendant: Captain Kauffman, SGT. Reihart, Long, County Comm. Tucker, RWS NURSE Sean Mcgorkle, RNS Brady Lynch, Major Wakefield, S. Ellenberger, Doctor Goss, COIS Yost, MR. C. Stone, J. Rivello, Sgt. Young, Sloppy, Kyper, Wendle, Mrs. Cousins, J Spyker, J. Kohler, Ms. D George, C/O Kilcolt and C/O Dwer
Case Number: 1:2022cv01547
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Filing 22 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ga)
November 3, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST dtd 10/31/22 for status of case by Anthony McGriff. (ao)
November 3, 2022 Filing 20 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (dw)
November 3, 2022 Filing 19 Letter from Mr. McGriff dated 10/31/22 re: fines and restitution. (dw)
November 3, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from Mr. McGriff dated 10/21/22. (dw)
November 3, 2022 Filing 17 AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ao)
November 3, 2022 Filing 16 Letter from Mr. McGriff dated 10/21/22. (dw)
November 2, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony McGriff.(dw)
October 26, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony McGriff.(dw)
October 26, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time by Anthony McGriff.(dw)
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 (CERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony McGriff. (ep)
October 17, 2022 Filing 11 (CERTIFIED) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony McGriff.(ep)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/04/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/4/2022) (lp).
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-03794 containing electronic documents.
October 4, 2022 DOC 6 AND PRO SE TRANSFER LETTER MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 Letter to Pro Se Party regarding transfer of case. (not mailed pro se). (er) (er). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT 1. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. 2. THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/3/22. 10/3/22 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) (er) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ANTHONY MCGRIFF. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANTHONY MCGRIFF..(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANTHONY MCGRIFF..(bw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/28/2022) (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COUSINS, DWER, S. ELLENBERGER, D. GEORGE, GOSS, KAUFFMAN, KILCOLT, J. KOHLER, KYPER, LONG, BRADY LYNCH, SEAN MCGORKLE, REIHART, J. RIVELLO, SLOPPY, J. SPYKER, C. STONE, TUCKER, WAKEFIELD, WENDLE, YOST, YOUNG, filed by ANTHONY MCGRIFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 USM 285 FORM)(bw) Modified on 9/28/2022 (lisad, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/28/2022) (lisad, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/28/2022) (lisad, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/28/2022) (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]
September 21, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY MCGRIFF. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGRIFF v. KAUFFMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony McGriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Reihart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Comm. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWS NURSE Sean Mcgorkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNS Brady Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Ellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COIS Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rivello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sloppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Spyker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. D George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Kilcolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Dwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?