February 8, 2017 |
Filing
319
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration/Objections (Doc. 316) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel (Doc 317) is DENIED. Plaintiff 9;s Status Report (Doc. 315) is construed as a motion for a sixty (60) days stay is GRANTED. This case is stayed for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall notify the court immediately when he receives his legal property in this matter. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 2/8/17. (ga)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
314
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). The stay previously imposed and continued in the above matter until January 11, 2017, is LIFTED for the purposes of deciding the ripe motions addressed in the attached Memorandum. Plainti ff is to advise the court within ten (10) days if he has now received his legal materials in this action. Plaintiff's motion to strike (Doc. 295) is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for clarification/explanation (Doc. 307) is GRANTED only to the extent that the accompanying Memorandum explains the scope of the Magistrate Judge's Reports and Recommendations and the court orders adopting said Reports and Recommendations.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 1/18/17. (ga)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
286
ORDER: denying without prejudice 109 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 232 Report and Recommendation; denying 240 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; adopting 242 Report and Recommendation; denying 259 Pla intiff's Motion to Certify Non-Final Order for Interlocutory Appeal; adopting 262 Report and Recommendation; adopting 263 Report and Recommendation; denying 268 Plaintiffs Motion for Relief from an Order; adopting 270 Report and Recommendation; denying 257 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse; and, referring action back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 2/25/2016. (emksec, )
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
281
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 277 MOTION to Compel the clerk to serve this complaint of judicial disability on the Circuit Executive filed by Scott Njos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 13, 2016. (kjn)
|
October 27, 2015 |
Filing
261
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 257 MOTION for Recusal filed by Scott Njos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 27, 2015. (kjn)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
234
ORDER:(1) The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson filed on September 1, 2015 (Doc. 219 ) is ADOPTED; (2) Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment (Docs. 103 , 124 , 150 and 206 ) are DENIED; (3) Defendants Motion to Strike (Doc. 211 ) is DISMISSED as moot; and, (4) Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Judicial Notice (Doc. 225 ) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 9/28/2015. (emksec, )
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing
222
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 183 MOTION For A Voluntary Dismissal Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Scott Njos, 181 MOTION to Clarify filed by Scott Njos. 1. Njos is advised that the court has addressed all pending motions in this case either through orders or Reports and Recommendations.2. As a matter of law, an amended complaint takes the place of the originalcomplaint, effectively invalidating the original complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 10, 2015. (kjn)
|
September 2, 2015 |
Filing
221
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 147 MOTION Regarding The Suffieciency of an Answer and Objection filed by Scott Njos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 2, 2015. (kjn)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
220
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 188 MOTION for Judicial Review filed by Scott Njos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 1, 2015. (kjn)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
176
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). 1. Plaintiffs motion for counsel (Doc. 145) is denied without prejudice. 2. Plaintiffs motion to strike Defendants brief in opposition to his motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 138 ) is denied. 3. Plaintiffs objection to the Magistrate Judges order of August 8, 2014 (Doc. 107) is construed to be a motion for reconsideration, and is denied without prejudice. 4. Plaintiffs motion for a mental status examination (Doc. 122) is den ied. 5. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a joint brief (Doc. 135) is granted to the extent that the Clerk of Court shall also docket Document 127 as Plaintiffs brief in reply to Defendants brief in opposition to his motion for partial summary jud gment (Doc. 103.) 6. Plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief (Doc. 167) is denied. 7. Defendants motion for a protective order (Doc. 163) is granted only to the extent that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the parties shall each file a status report with the court outlining any outstanding unresolved discovery issues in accordance with the attached Memorandum. 8. The Clerk of Court is directed to correct the docket to reflect that Plaintiffs filing entitled Motion Regarding Sufficiency of Answer and Objection (Doc. 147) is a motion to compel. 9. Plaintiffs motion for relief/adjudication (Doc. 172) is denied as moot. 10. All remaining motions on the docket (Docs. 103, 109, 115, 124, 147, 150) are stayed pending receipt of the discovery status reports.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 3/30/2015. (bg)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM & ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick dated November 6, 2013 (Doc. 52) is ADOPTED. The Planitiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 38) is DENIED as premature without prejudice and the motion requesting ruling (Doc. 51) is DENIED as moot. The above-captioned action is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 12/10/13. (ga)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt dated April 3, 2013 (Doc. 31) is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 27) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case and to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Magistrate Judge.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 4/30/13. (ga)
|