October 3, 2019 |
Filing
253
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defts' MIL 230 - both parties are precluded from discussing, referencing, or introducing evidence re: the 5/4/11 cell-extraction events or any documentary or video evidence re: thereto. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/2/19. (ki)
|
September 25, 2019 |
Filing
247
ORDER granting pltf's motion 234 to appear @ trial w/out shackles - USM shall permit pltf to appear w/out shackles, handcuffs or other restraints during time jury is present in ctrm - at all other times, USM shall determine whether restraints are necessary to maintain safety or security in the ctrm. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/25/19. (ki)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
217
ORDER (Memorandum 216 filed previously as separate docket entry) conditionally granting pltf's MIL 212 & directing that subject to conditions in memo 216 evidence of pltf's prior convictions, length of sentence & disciplinary history shall be excluded from civil trial. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/18/18. (ki)
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
202
ORDER denying motion to alter or amend judgment 191 , conditionally granting motion to appt cnsl 170 , noting if cnsl cannot be found to rep pltf this condt'l appt order will be revoked & pltf will proceed pro se, Clrk of Ct directed to fwd m at'ls to pro bono chair of MDPA Chapter of FBA, w/in 60 days of date of this order pro bono chair to notify ct in writing whether volunteer atty will enter app on pltf's behalf, & noting ct will issue revised pretrial sched by separate order. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/6/18. (ki)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing
186
ORDER:1. The report 180 of Mue Mehalchick is ADOPTED.2. Dfts mtn 140 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows:a. GRANTED with respect to all claims against dft Warden B. A. Bledsoe;b. GRANTED with respect to Collins claim for excessive fo rce arising from events on 5/4/11;c. GRANTED with respect to Collins claim for denial of medical care; andd. The mtn (Doc. 140) is otherwise DENIED.3. Plaintiffs motion 151 for partial summary judgment is DENIED.4. This matter shall proceed on the following claims:a. Pltfs claim for excessive force against dfts Lieutenant J. Fleming, Correctional Officer K. Gemberling, and Correctional Officer S. Prutzman arising from events on 5/3/11; andb. Pltfs claim for failure to intervene against dft Ass ociate Warden D. Hudson arising from events on 5/3/11.5. Entry of judgment in accordance with paragraph 2 above is deferred pending trial on the remaining claims and defenses sub judice.6. A separate pretrial scheduling order shall issue. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/25/17. (ma)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
166
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 124 MOTION for Contempt filed by Larry Joe Collins, 126 MOTION to Suppress filed by Larry Joe Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 6/8/2017. (cw)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
138
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 1/13/2017. (emksec, )
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 11/9/2016. (rm)
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
119
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, the plaintiffs motions to compel further responses to document requests (Doc. 91 .) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The defendants shall undertake further review of BOP re cords to determine whether any potentially responsive documents exist that indicate actual findings of misconduct on the part of defendant Fleming, R. Johnson, or T. Johnson relating to the treatment of inmates. If any such documents exist, the defen dants shall provide them to the Court in camera within 30 days of the date of this order so that a determination can be made as to whether they should be produced in whole or in part to Collins. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. In addition, Collinss motion to compel defendant Hicks to provide further answers to interrogatories (Doc. 108.) is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 7, 2015. (kjn)
|
September 2, 2015 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (Doc. 108 .) is DENIED. We note that the Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, (Doc. 107 .), which sought to extend discovery deadlines to June 2015. This motion is GRANTED insofar as the court will deem discovery requests propounded by the parties on or before June 30, 2015, to be timely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on Septemer 2, 2015. (kjn)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) (lh)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 9/30/14. (lh)
|