Thomas v. Duvall et al
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Thomas
Defendant: Angela R. Duvall, W.M. Ritchie, Ron Smith, I Ritchie, Gill, Dixon, Wendle, Dunkle, Constance Green and James Eckard
Case Number: 3:2016cv00451
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: Susan E. Schwab
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 100 motion to disqualify Sawicki as counsel at trial is conditionally GRANTED.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/17/2020. (jr) (Main Document 128 replaced on 11/17/2020) (jr).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 116 Thomas' Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/21/2020. (lg)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Thomas' 107 motion for sanctions is DENIED. Briefing on Defendants 100 motion to disqualify counsel shall resume in accordance with this Court's 4/17/2020 Order. Brief in Opposition due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/7/2020. (jr)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 87 Chief magistrate Judge Schwab's Report and Recommendation is adoplted; 67 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part; a telephonic status conference shall be scheduled. (see order for further/complete details) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/12/19. (lg)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 32 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART, consistent with this Order; Additional Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; and All Defendants shall Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/2/2018. (See Order for further details.) (jr)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab's 13 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants' 5 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Def endant Ray Dunkle is DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE; Counts I, II, III and VI are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; Plaintiff is, however, granted leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days of this Order; and this case is REMANDED to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/10/2017. (jn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Duvall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Thomas
Represented By: Marianne Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela R. Duvall
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.M. Ritchie
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Smith
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Ritchie
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixon
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendle
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunkle
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Green
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eckard
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?