Murray v. Wetzel et al
Plaintiff: Irving Murray
Defendant: John E. Wetzel, T Debalso, B. Mason, M Damore, J Silva, K Kellner, J Hinman, Dorina Varner, Courtney Rodgers, J Steinhart, B. Houser and Correct Care Solutions
Case Number: 3:2017cv00491
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: JV
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Conaboy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER: 1. MJ Carlsons R and R's Docs. 225 , 226 , 228 are ADOPTED in their entireties;2. All mtns related to a PI regarding the treatment of Murrays Hepatitis C 172 , 175 , 182 , 189 , 199 are DENIED as moot;3. The mtn to dismiss filed by Marsh, Moore, Noel, and Everding 140 is GRANTED, and all claims against those Dfts are DISMISSED;4. The mtn to dismiss filed by Cowan, Miller, and Palmigiano 144 is GRANTED IN PART. Murrays Eighth Amendment claim against Miller and Cowan rela ted to the treatment provided for Murrays Hepatitis C shall proceed. All claims against Palmigiano, and claims against Cowan and Miller related to Murrays fall from his bunk and subsequent medical treatment, as well as claims related to alleged viola tions of Murrays First Amendment rights, are DISMISSED; and5. Murrays mtn for relief 161 is GRANTED IN PART, to the extent that Murrays claims for monetary damages against Dfts in their individual capacities shall not be dismissed at this stage of litigation.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/21/19. (ma)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Since all of the Plaintiffs federal claims against Defendants Correct Care and Rogers in this matter have been dismissed, jurisdiction will be declined with respect to any state law claims against those two Defendants. An appropriate Order will enter. re 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Courtney Rodgers, Correct Care Solutions Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 3/15/18. (cc)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Corrections Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 52) is PARTIALLY GRANTED. Dismissal is GRANTED in favor of Defendants Wetzel, Debalso, Masdon, Silva, Varner, and Hinman on the basis of lack of personal involvement. Dismissal is GRANTED in favor of Defenant Damore and with respect to all claims of verbal harassment.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 2/13/18. (ga)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). The Clerk of Court is directed to CONSOLIDATE Civil No. 3:cv-17-482 into Civil No. 17-491, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket Pla intiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc.1) as a Motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief in Civil No. 3:17-cv-491. Plaintiff's motin to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue the Ad ministrative Order to the Warden directing the Warden to begin deducting money from the inmate's account. The Clerk of Court is appointed to serve a copy of the Complaint along with AO398, AO399.Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 4/10/17. (ga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Wetzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Debalso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Damore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Hinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorina Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Rodgers
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Steinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?