Quinn v. Tritt et al
Plaintiff: |
Phillip Quinn |
Defendant: |
Brenda L. Tritt, Kathy Brittain, Joseph Sankus, Daniel Rhome, Schuylkill County Municipal Water Authority and Pat Caulfield |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00632 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Schuylkill |
Presiding Judge: |
Malachy E Mannion |
Presiding Judge: |
Karoline Mehalchick |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2021 |
Filing
139
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 131 132 - granting 97 SCWA Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of SCWA Defendants on all counts; granting 100 DOC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of DOC Defendants on all counts; dismissing as moot 106 Motion to Appoint Counsel; dismissing as moot 110 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 116 Motion to Stay; dismissing as moot 130 SCWA Defendants' Motion to Strike. Clerk of Court directed to close case. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/30/21. (dw)
|
February 13, 2020 |
Filing
65
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ;(1) The Report of Judge Mehalchick, (Doc. 62), is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY;(2) SCMWAs motion to dismiss, (Doc. 32), is DENIED;(3) The case is REMANDED to Judge Mehalchick for further proceedings. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick; ; denying 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting 62 Report and Recommendations.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/13/20. (bs)
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing
59
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) The R & R is adopted in part and not adopted in part. (See order for details).ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick for further proceedings including mot. to dismiss (doc. 32) and mot. to compel (doc. 44). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/30/19. (bs)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing
28
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety; the plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies identified in Judge Mehalchicks Report, if he still wishes to pursue this action, no later than February 27, 2019;ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick. (See order for full details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/30/19. (bs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?