DeRichie v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Michael F. DeRichie
Defendant: Geisinger Clinic, Gerald N. Larar, Gloria A. Pombo, Mark A. Lacey, Geisinger Clinic d/b/a Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Darren L. Jacobs, Heather R. Paduck, Mark M. Skevofilax, United States Of America, Wayne Memorial Health System, Inc., Douglas C. Nathanson and Geisinger Health System Foundation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01183
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time to file Brief In Opposition.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/4/19. (dw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Michael F. DeRichie.(MacGregor, Malcolm) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/4/2019) (cl).
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Defendant, USA's Motion to Dismiss by Michael F. DeRichie.(MacGregor, Malcolm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Doherty on behalf of Gerald N. Larar (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doherty, Grace)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Doherty, Jr on behalf of Gerald N. Larar (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doherty, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (attached to Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses by Mark M. Skevofilax.(Katz, Noah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Clinic d/b/a Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger Health System Foundation re #11 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance (Sheridan, Cindy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy A. Sheridan on behalf of Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Clinic d/b/a Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger Health System Foundation. (Sheridan, Cindy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Dalke, Samuel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Montoro on behalf of Darren L. Jacobs, Mark A. Lacey, Heather R. Paduck (Montoro, Mary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Wylam on behalf of Darren L. Jacobs, Mark A. Lacey, Heather R. Paduck (Wylam, Paul)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah E Katz on behalf of Mark M. Skevofilax. (Katz, Noah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene P. Feeney on behalf of Mark M. Skevofilax. (Feeney, Eugene)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Dalke, Samuel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Douglas C. Nathanson, Gloria A. Pombo.(Eppolito, Charles)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Eppolito, III on behalf of Douglas C. Nathanson, Gloria A. Pombo (Eppolito, Charles)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Petition for Removal by Darren L. Jacobs, Mark A. Lacey, Gerald N. Larar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Montoro, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Of America from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CIVIL 0298. ( Filing fee $ 400 ), filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeRichie v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Clinic
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald N. Larar
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: James A. Doherty, Jr.
Represented By: Grace Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria A. Pombo
Represented By: Charles Eppolito, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Lacey
Represented By: Paul J. Wylam
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Clinic d/b/a Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren L. Jacobs
Represented By: Paul J. Wylam
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather R. Paduck
Represented By: Paul J. Wylam
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark M. Skevofilax
Represented By: Noah E Katz
Represented By: Eugene P. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Samuel S. Dalke
Represented By: Samuel Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Memorial Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas C. Nathanson
Represented By: Charles Eppolito, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Health System Foundation
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. DeRichie
Represented By: Malcolm L. MacGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?