HAMILTON v. SUPERINTENDENT, ESTOCK et al
Petitioner: Shawn James Hamilton
Respondent: The Attorney General Of The State Of Pennsylvania, The District Attorney of the County of Luzerne, . and Superintendent, Estock
Case Number: 3:2020cv01476
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to habeas petition. Respondents shall file an answer and memorandum of law on or before 11/9/20. Petitioner may, if he so chooses, file a reply to the answer within 14 days of the date on which the answer is filed. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/18/20 (jam)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Habeas Corpus by Superintendent, Estock, The Attorney General Of The State Of Pennsylvania, The District Attorney of the County of Luzerne.(McMonagle, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Served on Superintendent Estock, Luzerne County District Attorney and PA State Atty General; (ep)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2020.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/2/20. (ep)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Shawn James Hamilton to have his Petition construed and ruled under 28 USC 2254;. (ep)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Petitioner is GRANTED leave to elect, within 45 days of the date of this Order, to withdraw the petition or to have the petition construed and ruled upon under 28 USC 2254. Petitioner shall FILE within 45 days of the date of this Order, the attached election form, indicating an election to withdraw the petition or to have the petition construed and ruled upon under 28 USC 2254. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the petition being construed and ruled upon under 28 USC 2254. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/24/20. (jam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forn) (ao)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03260 containing electronic documents. (ao)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/3/20. 8/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PPE216373 (dmc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by SHAWN JAMES HAMILTON. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMILTON v. SUPERINTENDENT, ESTOCK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General Of The State Of Pennsylvania
Represented By: James L McMonagle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The District Attorney of the County of Luzerne, .
Represented By: James L McMonagle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent, Estock
Represented By: James L McMonagle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn James Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?