TALBERT v. HUTCHINSON et al
Plaintiff: Charles Talbert
Defendant: SGT. BILESTA, Wellpath, OF. ZAGATA, C.O. Jones, Garcia, Franklin, C.O. Silva, J. DOMINIC, Officer Hutchinson and Sgt. Everett
Case Number: 3:2020cv01902
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form) (lp)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04873 containing electronic documents.
October 8, 2020 ECF DOC. NO. #6 MAILED TO CHARLES TALBERT BY CHAMBERS ON 10/8/2020.(ka, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS MATTER, INCLUDING THE PENDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER IS (ECF DOC. NO. 1) AND REQUEST FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ECF DOC. NO. 3) TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AS THIS IS NOT THE PROPER VENUE FOR THESE CLAIMS ARISING ENTIRELY IN SCI-DALLAS IN THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/8/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CHARLES TALBERT. (jpd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES #4 MAILED TO TALBERT. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR PELIMINARY INJUNCTION & TRO by CHARLES TALBERT. (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BILESTA, J. DOMINIC, EVERETT, FRANKLIN, GARCIA, HUTCHINSON, JONES, SILVA, WELLPATH, ZAGATA, filed by CHARLES TALBERT. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHARLES TALBERT..(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALBERT v. HUTCHINSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. BILESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OF. ZAGATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DOMINIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?