Jones v. Hashagen et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Defendant: Hashagen, Linhart, Joseph Semon, Michael D. Klopotoski and Dempsey
Case Number: 4:2009cv00887
Filed: May 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: Malachy E. Mannion
Presiding Judge: James F. McClure
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting motions to dismiss 78 & 95 , denying motion to strike 102 as moot, directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case, & deeming any appeal from this order as frivolous & not in good faith. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/26/12. (ki)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING pltf's motion to supplement his complaint 107 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/20/12. (ki)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re: 5/12/11 Order 68 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. W/in 60 days of date of this order pltf Jones shall provide addt'l info to ID defts CO Linhert & Dr. Dempsey inc @ min each deft's 1st name & if avail each deft's address & last known place of employment.; 2. Failure to comply w/ preceding para may result in dismissal of complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 05/20/11. (ki)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Overruling plaintiff Jones' 51 objections to Magistrate Judge Carlson's report and recommendation; adopting in full Magistrate Judge Carlson's report and recommendation; granting defendants Hashagen and Semon� 39;s 40 motion for summary judgment; entering final judgment in favor of defendants Hashagen and Semon and against plaintiff Jones; dismissing the complaint, with prejudice, as against defendant Klopotoski; directing the clerk to close the case file. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 11/10/10. (km, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: United States Magistrate Carlson's 18 report and recommendation is adopted in full; to the extent plaintiff's claims seek damages from defendants Hashagen, Semon, Klopotoski based upon those defendants acting in thei r official capacities, plaintiff's claims against those defendants are dismissed; plaintiff's claim against defendant Klopotoski is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and plaintiff may amend his complaint within 30 days of the entry of this order; defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies is denied without prejujdice; the case is remanded to the U.S. Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this memorandum and order. Signed by Honorable James F. McClure, Jr on 1/12/10. (km, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - 1. To the extent that Jones seeks damages from state officials acting in their official capacity, the complaint should be DISMISSED since the pltf is barred from obtaining such relief by constitutional and statutory constr aints. 2. In its current form, the Pltfs complaint against Warden Klopotoski fails to state a valid cause of action under the Eighth Amendment and should be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted without prejudice to the plaintiff being granted leave to amend his complaint to address the deficiencies identified in this report and recommendation, provided that he does so without undue delay, by amending the complaint within 30 days of the entry of an order adopti ng this report and recommendation. 3. With respect to the dfts motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, that motion and Jones response, invite the Court to consider matters outside the pleadings, a task which falls beyond t he reach of a Rule 12 motion to dismiss. Therefore, this aspect of the dfts motion should be DENIED without prejudice to the filing of any appropriate motions for summary judgment on this issue pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 30, 2009. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hashagen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Semon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Klopotoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?