United States Of America v. Bogart et al
Plaintiff: |
United States Of America |
Defendant: |
Dustin B. Bogart, Marcy A. Bogart and Southern Country Ranch |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv00347 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Williamsport Office |
County: |
Northumberland |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher C. Conner |
Nature of Suit: |
Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause of Action: |
26 U.S.C. § 7401 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 15, 2018 |
Filing
164
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion to Vacate, ECF No. 135, is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/15/2018. (jr)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
111
ORDER: Chief United States Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson's Report and Recommendation 104 is ADOPTED in full; Defendants' motions to dismiss are DENIED 77 95 ; the case is remanded to Chief Magistrate Judge Carlson for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/15. (km)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing
103
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, the defendants motion for motion for a Judicial Determination on the Law, (Doc. 86 .), is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 8, 2014. (kjn)
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/9/14. (km)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
44
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): In accordance with the Court's Memorandum, filed this same date [ECF No. 43] - Defendants Dustin B. Bogart, Marcy A. Bogart, and Southern Country Ranch's 39 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/5/13. (km)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Bogart Defendants have 14 days from the entry of this Order in which to file an amended motion to dismiss. If they fail to file such a motion, the Court will proceed on their original Motion to Dismiss 11 . Plaintiff will have 14 days from the date of service of Defendants' amended motion in which to file an opposition to the same. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/14/2014. (km)
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: DENYING dft Bogart's motion to continue and supplement for reconsideration 25 ; dft shall notify the Court, in writing, within 14 days of this Order of whether he intends to file an amended motion to dismiss or proceed w/ the motion to dismiss presently before the Court; if dft fails to notify the Court w/in 14 days, the Court will presume he intends to proceed on the current motion to dismiss and plaintiff will have an additional 14 days in which to file an opposition to the motion. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/16/13. (km)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying the Bogarts' motion for reconsideration 22 & granting Bogarts' request for addt'l 30 days to obtain cnsl. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/05/12. (ki)
|
October 12, 2012 |
Filing
21
ORDER denying deft Dustin Bogart's motion to strike 13 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/12/12. (ki)
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Dustin Bogart's motion for ext of time 15 to fine cnsl is GRANTED - has 60 days to notify ct if he wishes to file amended motion to dismiss or stand on the one currently before the ct.; 2. Briefing ddls on current MTD 11 & motion to strike 12 STAYED pending Dustin Bogarts notification to the ct.; 3. To extent Dustin Bogard is making request for cnsl on behalf of either Marcy Bogart or Southern Country Ranch the motion is DENIED. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/30/12. (ki)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf shall respond to 2nd MTD 11 in acc w/ both FRCP & MDPA Local Rules.; 2. Motion to dismiss 6 DENIED as MOOT w/out prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/22/12. (ki)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?