Bell v. Rothrock et al

Plaintiff: T. Montana Bell
Defendant: Hearing Examinder T. Pilosi, D.O.C., C/O Rothrock, Sgt. Roberts, C/O Myers and C/O Womer
Case Number: 4:2018cv02177
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
0 Judge: Matthew W Brann
1 Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2019 6 ANSWER to Petition for Removal by D.O.C., Myers, T. Pilosi, Roberts, Rothrock, Womer.(Enerson, Caleb)
November 26, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before 1/9/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 11/26/18 (ms)
November 21, 2018 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to to File a Responsive Pleading by D.O.C., Myers, T. Pilosi, Roberts, Rothrock, Womer.(Enerson, Caleb)
November 13, 2018 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. Signed on 11/13/18. (ch1)
November 13, 2018 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Conset to Proceed Civil Action) (ch1)
November 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roberts, Myers, Womer, T. Pilosi, Rothrock, D.O.C. from Centre County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018cv3812. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4596370), filed by Roberts, Myers, Womer, T. Pilosi, Rothrock, D.O.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Centre County Compl., #3 Notice of Removal)(ch1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Rothrock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearing Examinder T. Pilosi
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.C.
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Rothrock
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Roberts
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Myers
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Womer
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Montana Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?