Allen v. EGS Financial Care, Inc.

Plaintiff: Harold Allen
Defendant: EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02341
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK: Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/30/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/14/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 11/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2019. Pretrial Memos due by 11/19/2019. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/26/2019 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on the January 2020 trial term (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/4/2019. (jr)
January 28, 2019 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by Harold Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Protocol, #2 Exhibit(s) B- Defendant's Proposed Protective Order)(Freeman, Brett)
January 23, 2019 10 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant EGS Financial Care, Inc. filed by EGS Financial Care, Inc..(Salvo, Cindy)
January 19, 2019 9 Supplement by EGS Financial Care, Inc.. to #8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant . (cThurston, Robert)
January 19, 2019 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by EGS Financial Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Thurston, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(cThurston, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 2/4/2019 at 1:30 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/7/2019. (jr)
December 20, 2018 6 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/20/2018. (jr)
December 18, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by EGS Financial Care, Inc.. (Salvo, Cindy)
December 17, 2018 4 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Cindy Salvo. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/17/18. (lg)
December 17, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Thurston certificate of admission forwarded to Scranton Attorney Admissions Clerk to update our records. (lg)
December 17, 2018 3 Supplement by EGS Financial Care, Inc.. to #2 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice , Code of Conduct, signed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Admission for Robert Thurston, Esq.)(Salvo, Cindy)
December 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Verified New Jersey bar record of Attorney Cindy D. Salvo. (lg)
December 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Salvo is instructed to re-file page 3 of the petition for admission indicating associate counsel who is generally admitted to this Court (Attorney Robert T. Thurston is not showing in our Court data base as being generally admitted and therefore is not eligible to be listed as associate counsel); please use the civil event "supplement"; do not refile the petition or another fee will be charged. (lg)
December 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Salvo is instructed to file a signed Code of Conduct page for the petition for special admission using the civil event "supplement" - do not refile the petition or another fee will be charged. (lg)
December 13, 2018 2 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Cindy D. Salvo on behalf of EGS Financial Care, Inc. Attorney Cindy Salvo is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4623565.. (Salvo, Cindy)
December 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: NEF for Notice of Removal regenerated (after adding plaintiff's attorney to the docket, per the civil cover sheet) (lg)
December 10, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Salvo. (ch1)
December 7, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Salvo instructed to update firm address/phone number using "utilities" tab in ECF. (nr)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EGS Financial Care, Inc. from Luzerne County, case number 2018-12722. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4618767), filed by EGS Financial Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Represented By: Cindy D. Salvo
Represented By: Robert C cThurston
Represented By: Robert C. Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Allen
Represented By: Brett M. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?