SIERRA v. DANERI et al
Plaintiff: Mr. ANTONIO SIERRA
Defendant: MICHAEL CLARK, JOHN DANERI, JOSH SHAPIRO and TOM WOLF
Case Number: 1:2019cv00208
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Corrections by ANTONIO SIERRA. Motions referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope) (nll)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS to #2 Report and Recommendation by ANTONIO SIERRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (plp)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO REMAND OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANTONIO SIERRA. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANTONIO SIERRA. It is hereby recommended that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauper [ECF No. #1 ] be GRANTED. The Clerk should be ordered to docket the Complaint. It is further recommended that this action be dismissed as legally frivolous in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). The Clerk of Courts should be directed to close this case. Objections to R&R due by 8/19/2019 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 8/22/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 8/5/2019. (dm)
August 5, 2019 Case reassigned to Presiding Judge Susan Paradise Baxter and referred to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. (sdp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTONIO SIERRA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP motion, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Consent to jurisdiction by magistrate judge or district judge option, #5 Motion for Bail, #6 Exhibit, #7 Letter to the Court, #8 Envelope) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIERRA v. DANERI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DANERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. ANTONIO SIERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?