GILBERT v. N.E. REGIONAL COUNSEL
Petitioner: MARCUS GILBERT
Respondent: N.E. REGIONAL COUNSEL, WARDEN OF FCI MCKEAN, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL and UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00248
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, costs to be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/3/2021. (dm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 14668004991), filed by MARCUS GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 14668004991 (cww)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MARCUS GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILBERT v. N.E. REGIONAL COUNSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARCUS GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N.E. REGIONAL COUNSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN OF FCI MCKEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?