ALLEN v. BEARD et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY C. ALLEN
Defendant: JEFFREY A. BEARD, JOHN SHAFFER, FRED MAUE, M.D., LANCE COUTURIER, GARY GALLUCCI, PETE SAAVEDRA, GREGORY MOHRING, GEORGE REPOSKY, M. F. SCHOMPERT, C. A. STONER, L. W. STALEY, M. MAINS, EDWARD MANCHAS, HARRY E. WILSON, MARK KRYSEVIG, LINDA D. HARRIS, BILITSKI and ROGER WATERS
Case Number: 2:2007cv01398
Filed: October 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Francis X. Caiazza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying 174 Motion for trial transcripts. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5-19-10. (nam)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS, superseding all prior versions. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3-23-10. (nam)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. The parties shall file any objections thereto by 5:00 p.m. this date, March 17, 2010. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3-17-10. (nam)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2-26-10. (nam)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 90 Motion for appointment of Yassim Mohammad, but directing the Clerk of Court, on behalf of the Allegheny County Bar Foundation of the Allegheny County Bar Association, to request a lawyer to consider entering an appearance on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11-18-09. (nam)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM ORDER. 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 77 Report and Recommendation is adopted as the Opinion of the Court. 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 78 Report and Recommendation is adopted as the Opinion of the Court. Only Plaintiff's claims of excessive force and retaliation made against Defendants Stoner, Mains, Staley, Schompert, and Reposky now remain. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 08/12/09. (eca)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 68 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GARY GALLUCCI, HARRY E. WILSON, JEFFREY A. BEARD, ROGER WATERS, MARK KRYSEVIG, LINDA D. HARRIS, EDWARD MANCHAS, LANCE COUTURIER, JOHN SHAFFER, GREGORY MOHRING, BILITSKI, FRED MAUE, M.D. be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2009. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/9/09. (mlw)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING 57 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by ANTHONY C. ALLEN. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9-5-08. (nam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. BEARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY C. ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A. BEARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED MAUE, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCE COUTURIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY GALLUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETE SAAVEDRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY MOHRING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE REPOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. F. SCHOMPERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. A. STONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. W. STALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. MAINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD MANCHAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY E. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK KRYSEVIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA D. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILITSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER WATERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?