HAKALA v. PARK et al
Plaintiff: GARY HAKALA
Defendant: DR. MIN PARK, DR. PHILLIP BALK, B. BILOHLAVEK and DARLA COWDEN
Case Number: 2:2012cv01506
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 115 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 121 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Plaintiff has thirty days to file an appeal, which must be filed with the Clerk of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on March 29, 2017. (kcc)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OPINION on Defendant B. Bilohlavek's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No.61]. The Motion will be denied. An appropriate Order will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 3/6/2015. (vad)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings for summary judgment purposes as to Plaintiff's alleged failure to exhaust pursuant to the PLRA; denying 48 Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's failure to state a c laim and denying without prejudice for summary judgment purposes as to Plaintiff's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies pursuant to the PLRA and to demonstrate the requisite personal involvement of each Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on May 29, 2014. (kcc)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendations re 27 and DENYING 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 07/03/13. (lck)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAKALA v. PARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY HAKALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MIN PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. PHILLIP BALK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. BILOHLAVEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARLA COWDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?