December 6, 2023 |
Filing
586
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 583 Motion to Compel Discovery, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/6/23. (akr)
|
March 29, 2023 |
Filing
569
MEMORANDUM OPINION. For the reasons set forth herein, the renewed Motion to Dismiss LabMD's defamation per se claim, Count II, as to Statement Nos. 10, 14, 15, 17 and 18 is denied. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/29/23. (akr)
|
December 9, 2022 |
Filing
559
ORDER granting 517 Second Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by LABMD, INC. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Attorney Davies as counsel of record for LabMD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/9/22. (akr)
|
May 13, 2021 |
Filing
541
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 531 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting 534 Motion for Attorney Fees. LabMD is ordered to pay to Tiversa the amount of $4,927.50 on or before June 13, 2021, and to pay to Boback the amount of $2,115.00 on or before June 13, 2021. Such payments are to be delivered to counsel for Tiversa and Boback. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/13/21. (akr)
|
February 4, 2021 |
Filing
529
MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons set forth herein, the Court finds LabMD, Inc. ("LabMD") to be in civil contempt for failure to abide by prior Orders of this Court relative to the sanctions imposed against LabMD. Defendants Tiversa Hold ing Corp. and Robert J. Boback are permitted to file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs associated with the civil contempt proceeding on or before March 4, 2021. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/4/21. (akr)
|
May 7, 2020 |
Filing
494
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 474 Motion to Vacate/Stay as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 05/07/2020. (tjw)
|
March 24, 2020 |
Filing
466
ORDER OF COURT denying 422 Plaintiff LabMD's Motion to Extend Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Dissipation of Assets. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 287 Consent Order dated 10/16/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 03/24/2020. (tjw)
|
March 11, 2020 |
Filing
462
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 426 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs by TIVERSA HOLDING CORP. and granting 427 Motion for Attorney Fees by ROBERT J. BOBACK as set forth herein. LabMD is ordered to pay to Tiversa the amo unt of $10,892.50 on or before April 3, 2020, and to pay to Boback the amount of $1,163.50 on or before April 3, 2020. Such payments are to be delivered to counsel for Tiversa and Boback. Attorney James Hawkins is ordered to pay the sum of $4,737.75 to the law firm of McGuireWoods LLP on or before April 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 03/11/2020. (tjw)
|
August 16, 2019 |
Filing
413
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 393 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2) filed by TIVERSA HOLDING CORP. and granting 402 MOTION for Joinder as to 393 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2) filed by ROBERT J. BOBACK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 08/16/2019. (tjw)
|
July 15, 2019 |
Filing
408
MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 377 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by LABMD, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/15/2019. (tjw)
|
May 28, 2019 |
Filing
351
ORDER denying 339 Motion for Discovery Coordination Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/28/2019. (ndf)
|
May 8, 2018 |
Filing
316
ORDER denying 310 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/8/18. (ard)
|
December 20, 2017 |
Filing
300
ORDER granting 298 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed in its entirety until further order of court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/20/17. (ard)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
238
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 191 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and 193 Motion for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) - all as more fully set forth in the Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/14/17. (mwm)
|
November 23, 2016 |
Filing
185
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 137 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Count II (as to Defamatory Statements 1-12, 14-15 and 17-20), Count III, Count IV, Count V, and Count VI and DENIED as to Count II (as to Defamatory Statements 13 and 16). It i s further ORDERED that Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly's 166 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, if any party wishes to appeal from this Order, a notice of appeal, as provided in Fed. R. App. P. 3, must be filed with the Clerk of Court, United States District Court, at 700 Grant Street, Room 3110, Pittsburgh, PA 15219, within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/23/16. (bdb)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
154
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 102 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 139 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/23/16. (ard)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
129
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/22/16. (bdb) (Main Document 129 replaced on 2/22/2016) (bdb). Modified on 2/22/16. (bdb) Document Modified/Replaced on 2/22/16 to correct typographical error. (bdb)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing
30
OPINION AND ORDER granting 23 Sealed Motion; denying 26 Motion for Disclosure of Plaintiff's Original RICO Case Statement and co-Defendant's Unredacted Motion to Modify; however, as more fully set forth in the Opinion and Order, IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that execution of this Order modifying the docket as set forth below shall be stayed until the expiration of the fourteen-day (14) period permitted under the Magistrate Judges Act, 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), and Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules of Court, to file an appeal from this Order to the District Judge, and, in the event an appeal is filed from this Order, this Order shall be stayed until the resolution of such an appeal;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the absence of an app eal filed on or before April 1, 2015, the Clerk shall unseal ECF No. 18 and all exhibits thereto, docket ECF No. 19 as Plaintiffs Amended RICO Case Statement, and unseal ECF Nos. 23 and 24, Defendants' Motion to Modify and Brief in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/17/2015. (ndf )
|