ARMSTRONG TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. v. CHR SOLUTIONS, INC
Plaintiff: |
ARMSTRONG TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. |
Defendant: |
CHR SOLUTIONS, INC |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00787 |
Filed: |
June 15, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Pittsburgh Office |
County: |
Butler |
Presiding Judge: |
Maureen P. Kelly |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 5, 2020 |
Filing
162
OPINION and ORDER re 144 MOTION to Deposit Funds Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 filed by ARMSTRONG TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. indicating that the Court will permit the escrow deposit of Armstrong's funds. In addition, it is also ORD ERED that upon Armstrong's deposit of funds pursuant to a separately filed Order of Court permitting said deposit, any contract interest accruals upon said funds will cease as against CHR's counterclaim in this matter. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/05/2020. (rtw)
|
August 7, 2019 |
Filing
108
OPINION re Third-Party Defendants Virginia Gardea's and Vantage Point Solutions, Inc.'s 92 MOTION TO DISMISS CHR Solutions, Inc.'s Second Amended Third-Party Claims, indicating that said Motion will be granted in part, and denied in part. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/7/19. (rtw)
|
April 25, 2019 |
Filing
85
ORDER denying, without prejudice, CHR's 81 Motion to Compel Discovery from Third-Party Defendant, Vantage Point Solutions, Inc. Counsel are directed to continue to communicate to resolve issues and modify timelines for discovery as necessary for the circumstances of this case. If counsel are not able to resolve discovery issues by consent agreement, upon motion of any party, a discovery status conference will be scheduled. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/25/19. (rtw)
|
April 24, 2019 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting, without prejudice, 70 the Third-Party Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VIRGINIA GARDEA and VANTAGE POINT SOLUTIONS, INC. CHR is granted leave to file Second Amended Third-Party Claims no later than May 24, 2019. The Motion to Dismiss CHR's claim for attorneys' fees is GRANTED, and said claim is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/24/19. (rtw)
|
December 20, 2018 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Third-Party Defendants. CHR Solutions, Inc. is afforded opportunity to file its Amended Complaint on or before January 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/20/2018. (bjl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?