OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC.
Plaintiff: OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC.
Defendant: INDUSTRY TERMINAL AND SALVAGE COMPANY, HEARTLAND BARGE MANAGEMENT, LLC and MCKEES ROCKS HARBOR SERVICES, LLC
Cross Defendant: CROUNSE CORPORATION and INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC
Cross Claimant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Claimant: AMERICAN RIVER TRANSPORTATION CO., LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01647
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER indicating that the Court having issued an #21 Order granting the Consent Motion to Consolidate of American River Transportation Co., LLC, and since Civil Action No. 18-1647 is now consolidated and all further filings occurring at the lead case at Civil Action No. 18-533, the instant case shall be considered CLOSED. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by American River Transportation Co., LLC, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2), it is hereby ORDERED that Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-1647 is now consolidated with the case pending under Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-533. The cases shall proceed under case number 2:18-cv-533. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/4/19. (rtw) (Main Document 21 replaced on 2/4/2019 to reflect correct date of Order) (rtw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCKEES ROCKS HARBOR SERVICES, LLC. (Johnson, James)
February 4, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Johnson advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 2/11/2019. (ksa)
February 4, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Bratton advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 2/11/2019. (ksa)
February 4, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Sullivan advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 2/11/2019. (ksa)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement identifying Archer Daniels Midland Co. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by American River Transportation Co., LLC. (Flotte, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by American River Transportation Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Flotte, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 CLAIM in Limitation by American River Transportation Co., LLC. (Flotte, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability by American River Transportation Co., LLC. (Flotte, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Claim in Limitation of McKees,, COUNTERCLAIM against OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. by MCKEES ROCKS HARBOR SERVICES, LLC. (Johnson, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INDUSTRY TERMINAL AND SALVAGE COMPANY. (McQuiston, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. by HEARTLAND BARGE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (DePaul, Louis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HEARTLAND BARGE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (DePaul, Louis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 United States' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Exoneration or Limitation, Third CROSSCLAIM against CROUNSE CORPORATION, INDUSTRY TERMINAL AND SALVAGE COMPANY, Ingram Barge Company LLC by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hyde, Matthew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. by CROUNSE CORPORATION. (Bratton, Gary )
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Industry Terminal's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. by INDUSTRY TERMINAL AND SALVAGE COMPANY. (McQuiston, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. by Ingram Barge Company LLC. (Sullivan, Megan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability. (ksa)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Approval of the Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, for an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice, and for Issuance of an Injunction. Notice to be published for four consecutive weeks prior to February 1, 2019, the date fixed for filing of claims. Further details as indicated in Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/17/18. (rtw) (Main Document 6 replaced with signed Order on 12/20/2018 ) (rtw) Modified text on 12/20/2018. (rtw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for (1) Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking; (2) an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice; and (3) Issuance of an Injunction by OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. (Watson, Dennis) Modified text on 12/13/2018. (ksa)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Ponzo on behalf of OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. (Ponzo, Aaron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie Bagnato on behalf of OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. (Bagnato, Marjorie)
December 12, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Watson advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 12/19/2018. (ksa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4961872), filed by OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHIO RIVER SALVAGE, INC.
Represented By: Marjorie Bagnato
Represented By: Aaron M. Ponzo
Represented By: Dennis A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CROUNSE CORPORATION
Represented By: Gary Ray Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Megan Ahrens Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRY TERMINAL AND SALVAGE COMPANY
Represented By: David M. McQuiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARTLAND BARGE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Louis A. DePaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKEES ROCKS HARBOR SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: James W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Matthew Robb Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: AMERICAN RIVER TRANSPORTATION CO., LLC
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?