JONES v. SWEPI LP et al

Plaintiff: ROSA JONES
Defendant: BARBARA KINNAN, RICHARD KINNAN, SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC and SWEPI LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00050
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendants SWEPI LP and Shell Energy Holding GP, LCC to file an Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through 3/22/19. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/14/19. (bdb)
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Puz, Rodger)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J. R. Hall on behalf of SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Hall, J.)
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Eric Cottle, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney. Notice of Appearance for Rodger L. Puz, Esq., and J. R. Hall, Esq. by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP (Puz, Rodger) Modified text on 3/15/2019. (cel)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that, for the reasons stated in the Court's #20 Memorandum Opinion, that #9 Partial Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Defendants shall file their Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 3/15/19. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/25/19. (bdb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/25/19. (bdb) (Main Document 20 replaced on 2/25/19 to correct error on page 4) (bdb)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Richard Kinnan and Barbara Kinnan are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/19/19. (bdb)
February 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROSA JONES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Giannetti, Anthony)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Support filed by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Cottle, Eric)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to BARBARA KINNAN, RICHARD KINNAN (nll)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ROSA JONES. (Giannetti, Anthony)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ROSA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Giannetti, Anthony)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ROSA JONES (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Giannetti, Anthony)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Simone N. Dejarnett on behalf of SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Dejarnett, Simone)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Gafner on behalf of SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Gafner, Katherine)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Cottle, Eric)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cottle, Eric)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Brandon A. Swartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/22/19. (bdb)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Brandon A. Swartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5000176) by ROSA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Swartz, Brandon)
January 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Giannetti on behalf of ROSA JONES. (Giannetti, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/18/19. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI LP. (cel)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-18-16385 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4997202) filed by SWEPI LP, SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. SWEPI LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA JONES
Represented By: Brandon A. Swartz
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA KINNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD KINNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC
Represented By: Eric R.I. Cottle
Represented By: Katherine M. Gafner
Represented By: Rodger L. Puz
Represented By: J. R. Hall
Represented By: Simone N. Dejarnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWEPI LP
Represented By: Eric R.I. Cottle
Represented By: Katherine M. Gafner
Represented By: Rodger L. Puz
Represented By: J. R. Hall
Represented By: Simone N. Dejarnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?