SCHWARTZ v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ
Defendant: PRICE, JUDGE TONY A OSMAN, C/O BROW, C/O ZEINU TAMIYU, INMATE MEL WINDHELD, MCCALLARY, MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, IVANKA TRUMP, DA LESLEY POTTS, INMATE SHAUNA BINNEL, BEYONCE CARTER, MILLER, BARACK OBAMA, KATHY CATHORN, INMATE ZARICHIS, KIM KARDASHIAN WEST, ZEINU TAMIYU ZEE, MR. SHAWN CARTER, C/O CIARA SINGER, CHRISTOPHER ROLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DONALD TRUMP, C/O DOMINQUE and JAY-Z CARTER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00074
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice as recommended in the Report and Recommendation at ECF no. #6 , the relevant part of which is adopted as the opinion of the Court, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/25/2019. (dlg)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel and as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 6/18/2019. (plp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence to the Court from AUBURN SCHWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (plp)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (jv)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Correspondence to Court from Plaintiff by AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (jv)
May 16, 2019 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Complaint, filed by AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ, recommending that the compaint should be dismissed for failure to prosecute if plaintiff does not make arrangements to pay the filing fee and if she does, it should be dismissed as frivolous; Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2019 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 6/3/2019 (w/document #6 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/16/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (plp)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING; the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied for failure to comply with the Prison Litigation Reform Act. The Clerk shall mark this matter administratively closed until the filing fee is paid or plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with an inmate account statement and as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/16/2019. (plp)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01975. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; THE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS DOCKET NUMBER AS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 5/9/19. 5/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against SHAUNA BINNEL, BROW, BEYONCE CARTER, BEYONCE CARTER, JAY-Z CARTER, SHAWN CARTER, SHAWN CARTER, KATHY CATHORN, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DOMINQUE, MCCALLARY, MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, MILLER, BARACK OBAMA, TONY A OSMAN, LESLEY POTTS, PRICE, PRICE(PSYCHAITRIST), CHRISTOPHER ROLAND, CIARA SINGER, ZEINU TAMIYU, DONALD TRUMP, IVANKA TRUMP, KIM KARDASHIAN WEST, MEL WINDHELD, ZARICHIS, ZEINU TAMIYU ZEE, filed by AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHWARTZ v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE TONY A OSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O BROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O ZEINU TAMIYU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INMATE MEL WINDHELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCALLARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVANKA TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DA LESLEY POTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INMATE SHAUNA BINNEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEYONCE CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARACK OBAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY CATHORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INMATE ZARICHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM KARDASHIAN WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZEINU TAMIYU ZEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. SHAWN CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O CIARA SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ROLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O DOMINQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY-Z CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUBURN COLETTE SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?