Ayala-Suarez v. USPS et al

Plaintiff: Jose Luis Ayala-Suarez
Defendant: United States of America (U.S. Postal Service) and USPS
Case Number: 3:2018cv01971
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Ayala-Suarez upon USPS served on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Medina-Medina, Francisco)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Ayala-Suarez upon United States of America (U.S. Postal Service) served on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Medina-Medina, Francisco)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USPS, United States of America (U.S. Postal Service) (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (vdm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6189065.), filed by Jose Luis Ayala-Suarez. Service due by 3/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summon United States, #4 Summons Summon USPS, #5 Exhibit Unworn Declaration)(Medina-Medina, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala-Suarez v. USPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Ayala-Suarez
Represented By: Francisco J. Medina-Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America (U.S. Postal Service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?