Williams v. Higher Power Electrical, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chris Williams and Christopher Williams
Defendant: Cobra Energy, LLC, Higher Power Electrical, LLC and Cobra Acquisitions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01366
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting #7 "Application and Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/26/2019. (ebb)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #6 "Application and Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/26/2019. (ebb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Williams upon Cobra Acquisitions, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Williams upon Cobra Energy, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Higher Power Electrical, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Paul Botras to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6365765) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Christopher Williams Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Andrew Frisch to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6365788) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Christopher Williams Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cobra Acquisitions, LLC, Cobra Energy, LLC, Higher Power Electrical, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
April 16, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #3 Motion to allow Andrew Frisch to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6365788), #2 Motion to allow Paul M. Botros to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6365765). ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (mcm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Motion to allow Andrew Frisch to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6365788) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Chris Williams Responses due by 4/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 4/22/2019 (mcm).
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Motion to allow Paul M. Botros to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6365765) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Chris Williams Responses due by 4/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 4/22/2019 (mcm).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cobra Acquisitions, LLC, Cobra Energy, LLC, Higher Power Electrical, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6365743.), filed by Chris Williams. Service due by 7/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Higher Power Electrical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Williams
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobra Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higher Power Electrical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobra Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?