Salgado Colon v. Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zuleyka Salgado Colon
Defendant: Jane Doe, Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc., Bayamon Medical Center, Corporations A,B and C, Mario Davila Fernandez, John Does 1,2 and 3, Conyugal Partnership Davila-Doe and Unknown Insurance Companies A Through H
Case Number: 3:2019cv01797
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting co-Defendant Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc.'s #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer (or pleading) due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/10/2019. (JG)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Juan M. Martinez-Nevarez on behalf of Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc. (Martinez-Nevarez, Juan)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting co-Defendant Mario Davila-Fernandez's #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer (or pleading) due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/20/2019. (JG)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 18, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Mario Davila Fernandez Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dominguez-Perez, Igor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Bayamon Medical Center served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; Conyugal Partnership Davila-Doe served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; Mario Davila Fernandez served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; Jane Doe served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Efron, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bayamon Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons (Efron, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conyugal Partnership Davila-Doe, Corporations A,B and C, Mario Davila Fernandez, Jane Doe, Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc., John Does 1,2 and 3 & Unknown Insurance Companies A Through H. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (rim)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6551094.), filed by Zuleyka Salgado Colon. Service due by 11/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Efron, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salgado Colon v. Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Hermanos Melendez, Inc.
Represented By: Juan M. Martinez-Nevarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayamon Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations A,B and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Davila Fernandez
Represented By: Igor Dominguez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1,2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conyugal Partnership Davila-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies A Through H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuleyka Salgado Colon
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?