Cordero-Ladner v. D12 et al
Plaintiff: Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner and Joey
Defendant: Paul D. Rosengerg, Warren Mitch, Interscope Records, Universal Music Group, CD Baby, Goliath Management, Kuniva, Interscope Geffen A&M, Kon Artis, Waverly Walter Alford, Von Carlisle, Downtown Music Studios, Jay-Z, Mr. Porter, D12 Band, Spotify Technology S.A., Shady Records, Top Prospect, Universal Music Publishing Group, ASCAP, Bizarre, Songtrust, Andre Romelle, Spotif AB, Distrokid, Matrimonial Community Property Carter-Knowles, DJ Green Lantern, Too Short, Rufus Arthur Johnson, Ondre Moore, Downtown, James D'Agostino, King Gordy, AVL Digital Group, Obie Trice, III, Google, Denaun Montez Porter, Lil Wayne, D12, Ricore Shelton, Obie Trice, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Global Top Prospect Inc., Does 1-5, Swifty McVay, Ricore Jermaine Shelton, Todd Anthony Shaw, Shawn Corey Carter, Beyonce Giselle Knowles-Carter, Goliath Records, Muse-Downey Corporation, Dr. Dre, THISisHURLEY, DeShaun Dupree Holton Estate, YouTube, Michael Carter, Jr., Eminem, Downtown Music Publishing, Spotify, The Dirty Dozen, Proof Estate, Doe 2, Doe 1, Doe 5, Doe 4, Doe 3 and Spotify AB
Case Number: 3:2021cv01009
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiff's First Motion Submitting Opposition Motion filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of CD Baby, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Songtrust Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martinez-Casado, Maria)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER noted #119 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/21/2021. (EES)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER noted #119 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/21/2021. (EES)
June 15, 2021 Filing 119 ***CASE PARTICIPANTS*** First MOTION Submitting Opposition Motion, First INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion in Oppositon to Motion filed by Defendants filed by Susan Marie Cordero-Ladner on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified docket security on 6/17/2021 (rim).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/11/2021. (EES)
June 10, 2021 Filing 117 MOTION to Deem Unopposed Moving Defendants' Respective Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 re #114 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants Spotify USA Inc., Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. and Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 filed by Spotify, Google, Spotify Technology S.A., Spotify AB, #112 MOTION to dismiss as to Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner filed by Songtrust, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, CD Baby, #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Universal Music Publishing Group, Goliath Management, Shady Records, Kon Artis, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Interscope Geffen A&M, Goliath Records, Mr. Porter, Interscope Records, Paul D. Rosengerg, Denaun Montez Porter, Universal Music Group, #107 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Distrokid filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of CD Baby, Distrokid, Downtown, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Goliath Management, Goliath Records, Google, Interscope Records, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Denaun Montez Porter, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Spotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A., Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group, YouTube Responses due by 6/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #114 , #112 , #109 , #107 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
June 8, 2021 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of James D'Agostino, DJ Green Lantern Responses due by 6/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
June 3, 2021 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/7/2021 to File Answer without submitting to the Court's jurisdiction filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of James D'Agostino Responses due by 6/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified docket event on 6/4/2021 (rim).
May 20, 2021 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants Spotify USA Inc., Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. and Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Google, Spotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. Responses due by 6/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
May 20, 2021 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCD Baby, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Songtrust. (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
May 20, 2021 Filing 112 MOTION to dismiss as to Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner filed by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of CD Baby, Songtrust, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios Responses due by 6/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James Ball)(Martinez-Casado, Maria)
May 19, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer until 5/29/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of James D'Agostino Responses due by 6/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified docket event and text title on 5/20/2021 (rim).
May 14, 2021 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement byGoliath Management, Goliath Records, Interscope Geffen A&M, Interscope Records, Shady Records, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group. (Hertell-Stubbe, Hans)
May 14, 2021 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe on behalf of Kon Artis, Goliath Management, Goliath Records, Interscope Geffen A&M, Interscope Records, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Mr. Porter, Denaun Montez Porter, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hertell-Stubbe, Hans)
May 10, 2021 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Distrokid Responses due by 5/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
May 10, 2021 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Distrokid Responses due by 5/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
May 10, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #106 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative to sever or transfer, #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (rim)
May 7, 2021 Filing 106 ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative to sever or transfer filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Distrokid Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 5/10/2021 (rim).
May 7, 2021 Filing 105 ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Distrokid Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 5/10/2021 (rim).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #101 Motion for extension of time Answer deadline due by 5/15/2021. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/4/2021. (EES)
April 30, 2021 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement byDistrokid. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 29, 2021 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement byGoogle, YouTube. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 29, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION for extension of time until May 15, 2021 to Respond to the Complaint filed by Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe on behalf of Eminem, Goliath Management, Goliath Records, Interscope Records, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Denaun Montez Porter, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group Responses due by 5/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hertell-Stubbe, Hans)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #98 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #99 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/28/2021. (EES)
April 27, 2021 Filing 99 Motion to allow Ivana Dukanovic to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7279029) filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Spotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. Responses due by 5/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 27, 2021 Filing 98 Motion to allow Elana Nightingale Dawson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7279004) filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Spotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. Responses due by 5/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 27, 2021 Filing 97 Motion to allow Allison Stillman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7278971) filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Spotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. Responses due by 5/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 27, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Spotify (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
April 27, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Spotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Motion for extension of time Answer deadline due by 5/19/2021. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/27/2021. (EES)
April 23, 2021 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement bySpotify, Spotify AB, Spotify Technology S.A.. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
April 19, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for extension of time until 5/19/2021 to respond to service of complaint filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of James D'Agostino Responses due by 5/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 19, 2021 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CD Baby, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Songtrust re #79 Notice of Appearance, #89 Notice of Appearance (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #76 Motion for extension of time; granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #80 Motion for extension of time; granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #87 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/16/2021. (EES)
April 15, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Songtrust (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
April 15, 2021 Filing 88 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2021 to File Answer filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Songtrust Responses due by 4/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
April 13, 2021 Filing 87 Motion to allow James Sammataro to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7259997) filed by Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe on behalf of Eminem, Goliath Management, Goliath Records, Interscope Records, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group Responses due by 4/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hertell-Stubbe, Hans)
April 12, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of Distrokid (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) Modified docket event and text on 4/13/2021 (rim).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #84 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/12/2021. (EES)
April 9, 2021 Filing 84 Motion to allow A. John P. Mancini to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100076258) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Google, YouTube Responses due by 4/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Receipt of Payment)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 9, 2021 Filing 83 Motion to allow Sara A. Slavin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100076258) filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Google, YouTube Responses due by 4/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Receipt of Payment)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 7, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/7/2021 to file respond to service of complaintwithout submitting to the Court's jurisdiction filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Distrokid Responses due by 4/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
April 6, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Spotif AB, Spotify Technology S.A. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
April 6, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION for extension of time until May 20, 2021 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Spotif AB Responses due by 4/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
April 5, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. Martinez-Casado on behalf of CD Baby (Martinez-Casado, Maria)
April 5, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of CD Baby Responses due by 4/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
April 2, 2021 Filing 77 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Google, YouTube Responses due by 4/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
April 1, 2021 Filing 76 First MOTION for extension of time until May 5, 2021 to File Respective Responses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe on behalf of Eminem, Goliath Management, Goliath Records, Interscope Records, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group Responses due by 4/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hertell-Stubbe, Hans)
April 1, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe on behalf of Eminem, Goliath Management, Goliath Records, Interscope Records, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group (Hertell-Stubbe, Hans)
January 26, 2021 Filing 74 Summons Issued as to ASCAP, AVL Digital Group, CD Baby, Shawn Corey Carter, James D'Agostino, DJ Green Lantern, Distrokid, Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4, Doe 5, Downtown, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown Music Studios, Dr. Dre, Google, Interscope Geffen A&M, Jay-Z, Beyonce Giselle Knowles-Carter, Matrimonial Community Property Carter-Knowles, Muse-Downey Corporation, Andre Romelle, Ricore Jermaine Shelton, Songtrust, Spotif AB, Spotify, Spotify Technology S.A., Obie Trice, III, Universal Music Publishing Group, YouTube (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 26, 2021 Filing 73 Summons Issued as to Waverly Walter Alford, Kon Artis, Bizarre, Von Carlisle, Michael Carter, Jr, D12, D12 Band, DeShaun Dupree Holton Estate, Eminem, Global Top Prospect Inc., Goliath Management, Goliath Records, King Gordy, Interscope Records, Rufus Arthur Johnson, Kuniva, Lil Wayne, Marshall Bruce Mathers, Warren Mitch, Mr. Porter, Ondre Moore, Denaun Montez Porter, Proof Estate, Paul D. Rosengerg, Shady Records, Todd Anthony Shaw, Swifty McVay, THISisHURLEY, The Dirty Dozen, Too Short, Top Prospect, Universal Music Group (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 22, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE Summon Universal Music Publishing Group by Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summon Ricore Shelton (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 20, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #12 Notice (Other), #36 Notice (Other), #43 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other). ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate documents, refer to documents: #7 , #11 , #34 and #42 . *** (rim)
January 15, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 43 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate Document d.e.#42 .*** NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 1/20/2021 (rim).
January 15, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 36 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate Document d.e.#34 .*** NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 1/20/2021 (rim).
January 15, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate Document d.e.#11 .*** NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 1/20/2021 (rim).
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate document d.e.#7 .*** NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan) Modified on 1/20/2021 (rim).
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Cordero-Ladner, Susan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100074755) (arg)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner. Service due by 4/8/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordero-Ladner v. D12 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramon Cordero-Ladner
Represented By: Susan Marie Cordero-Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey
Represented By: Susan Marie Cordero-Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Rosengerg
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Mitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interscope Records
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Baby
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goliath Management
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuniva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interscope Geffen A&M
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kon Artis
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waverly Walter Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Music Studios
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Porter
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D12 Band
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify Technology S.A.
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Allison L. Stillman
Represented By: Ivana Dukanovic
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shady Records
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Prospect
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Group
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Songtrust
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Romelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotif AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distrokid
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrimonial Community Property Carter-Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ Green Lantern
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Too Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rufus Arthur Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ondre Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D'Agostino
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Gordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVL Digital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obie Trice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Represented By: Sara A. Slavin
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denaun Montez Porter
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lil Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricore Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obie Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Bruce Mathers
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Top Prospect Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swifty McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricore Jermaine Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Corey Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyonce Giselle Knowles-Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goliath Records
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muse-Downey Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THISisHURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeShaun Dupree Holton Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube
Represented By: Sara A. Slavin
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eminem
Represented By: Hans Helmut Hertell-Stubbe
Represented By: James G. Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Music Publishing
Represented By: Maria E. Martinez-Casado
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Allison L. Stillman
Represented By: Ivana Dukanovic
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dirty Dozen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proof Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify AB
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Allison L. Stillman
Represented By: Ivana Dukanovic
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?