Fetherson v. Blackmon et al
Plaintiff: Dana Fetherson
Defendant: Monty Lee Blackmon, Lancaster County Sheriff Office and Lancaster, County of
Case Number: 0:2016cv03189
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER adopting the 128 Report and Recommendation, granting the Defendant's 110 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's § 1983 claims, and declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 3/27/2018. (bgoo)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying the plaintiff's 42 and 71 motions for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/6/2017. (bgoo)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER adopting the 37 Report and Recommendation and dismissing the action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process as to all Defendants except for Defendant Lieutenant Monty Lee Blackmon. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 4/12/2017. (bgoo)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing Plaintiff to complete and return a summons and Form USM-285 for Defendant Lieutenant Monty Lee Blackmon within fourteen (14) days from the date this order is entered, listing a current address where the defenda nt may be served. (Service documents for Defendant Blackmon due by 12/29/2016. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/15/2016. (bgoo)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting the 13 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process only as to Lancaster County Sheriff Office and County of Lancaster. Plaintiff's remaining claims as to Lieutenant Monty Lee Blackmon remain pending before the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr., on 12/12/2016. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fetherson v. Blackmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Fetherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Lee Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?