Cox v. Dell et al
Plaintiff: Robert McDaniel Cox
Defendant: NFN Dell and NFN NLN
Case Number: 2:2009cv02715
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Sanctions Signed by Chief Judge David C Norton on 08/3/2011.(jsch, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER affirming 47 Report and Recommendations; granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge David C Norton on 9/24/2010.(eric, )
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 41 Motion "for Review and Removal of Magistrate Bristow Marchant." Signed by Chief Judge David C Norton on 8/27/10. (rpol, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Dell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McDaniel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?