Adams et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Robert Sayers, Tammy Higginbotham, Melissa Niday, Charles White, Beth Sayers, Ruben Ortega, Jennifer Servant, Claudia Slater, Angie Peterie, Alfred Neal, Jr., Gordon Randall, John Sigala, Joseph Mattson, Lawrence Pohlman, Joshua Phillips, John Sims, Verna Coil, Lorinda Gustine, Ramon Sigala, Larry Nixon, Alfred Neal, Adan Mata, Julie Royston, Carmen McConnell, Ernest Whitford, Joe Sigala, Bea Folk, Gary Niemetz, Felice Kay Alonzo, Joanne Roderick, Brett Morrison, Cody Hopkins, Sharolyn Neal, Kim Adams, John Wilson, Sr., Claudia Adams, Amber Kois, Heather Bartee, Martha Mattson, James Hopkins, Ingrid Nixon, Terry Allnut, Howard Coil, Paul Hopkins, Taneeshia Cole, Michael Slater, Rodney Royston, Steve Starke, Jeffrey Nixon, Cay Kline, Linda Long, Gerald Gustine, Janis White, Toby Routt, Lawrence Green, Latoia Neal, Randi Kline, Alice Chambers, Cheryl Sims, Ronald Servant, Don Starke, Miaja Starke, Adrienne Ortega, Billy Long, Joyce Noon, Jaralee Schutt, Genette Noon, Alice Cole, Leda Bartee, Breanna Pohlman, Cecelia Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Jessica Pohlman, Gary Bartee, Jeffrey Newton, Jennifer Whitford, Joseph Kois, Kevin Cole, Carol McKennon, Amanda Starke, Trina McKennon, Penelope Alonzo, Bonnie Morrison and Chartrese Tuthill
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde PLC, Inc., National Foam Inc, Williams Holdings, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03369
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 34 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-00705, Adams et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03369-RMG (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-00705. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from The District of Colorado 18-cv-705 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/12/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Claudia Adams, Kim Adams, Terry Allnut, Felice Kay Alonzo, Penelope Alonzo, Gary Bartee, Heather Bartee, Leda Bartee, Alice Chambers, Howard Coil, Verna Coil, Alice Cole, Kevin Cole, Taneeshia Cole, Bea Folk, Lawrence Green, Gerald Gustine, Lorinda Gustine, Tammy Higginbotham, Cody Hopkins, James Hopkins, Paul Hopkins, Cay Kline, Randi Kline, Amber Kois, Cecelia Kois, Joseph Kois, Billy Long, Linda Long, Adan Mata, Joseph Mattson, Martha Mattson, Carmen McConnell, Carol McKennon, Trina McKennon, Bonnie Morrison, Brett Morrison, Alfred Neal, Latoia Neal, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Jr., Jeffrey Newton, Melissa Niday, Gary Niemetz, Ingrid Nixon, Jeffrey Nixon, Larry Nixon, Genette Noon, Joyce Noon, Adrienne Ortega, Ruben Ortega, Angie Peterie, Joshua Phillips, Breanna Pohlman, Jessica Pohlman, Lawrence Pohlman, Gordon Randall, Joanne Roderick, Toby Routt, Julie Royston, Rodney Royston, Beth Sayers, Robert Sayers, Jaralee Schutt, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Jennifer Servant, Ronald Servant, Joe Sigala, John Sigala, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sims, Claudia Slater, Kaitlyn Slater, Michael Slater, Amanda Starke, Don Starke, Miaja Starke, Steve Starke, Chartrese Tuthill, Charles White, Janis White, Ernest Whitford, Jennifer Whitford, John Wilson, Sr.. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 29 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting #27 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants are granted an extension to file an answer or other responsive pleading no later than December 21, 2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/6/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ingebretsen, Stephen) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Claudia Adams, Kim Adams, Terry Allnut, Felice Kay Alonzo, Penelope Alonzo, Gary Bartee, Heather Bartee, Leda Bartee, Alice Chambers, Howard Coil, Verna Coil, Alice Cole, Kevin Cole, Taneeshia Cole, Bea Folk, Lawrence Green, Gerald Gustine, Lorinda Gustine, Tammy Higginbotham, Cody Hopkins, James Hopkins, Paul Hopkins, Cay Kline, Randi Kline, Amber Kois, Cecelia Kois, Joseph Kois, Billy Long, Linda Long, Adan Mata, Joseph Mattson, Martha Mattson, Carmen McConnell, Carol McKennon, Trina McKennon, Bonnie Morrison, Brett Morrison, Alfred Neal, Latoia Neal, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Jr., Jeffrey Newton, Melissa Niday, Gary Niemetz, Ingrid Nixon, Jeffrey Nixon, Larry Nixon, Genette Noon, Joyce Noon, Adrienne Ortega, Ruben Ortega, Angie Peterie, Joshua Phillips, Breanna Pohlman, Jessica Pohlman, Lawrence Pohlman, Gordon Randall, Joanne Roderick, Toby Routt, Julie Royston, Rodney Royston, Beth Sayers, Robert Sayers, Jaralee Schutt, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Jennifer Servant, Ronald Servant, Joe Sigala, John Sigala, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sims, Claudia Slater, Kaitlyn Slater, Michael Slater, Amanda Starke, Don Starke, Miaja Starke, Steve Starke, Chartrese Tuthill, Charles White, Janis White, Ernest Whitford, Jennifer Whitford, John Wilson, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.. Buckeye Fire Equipment Co. answer due 9/7/2018. (Rodgers, Jesse) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Tyco Fire Products, L.P., Chemguard, 3M Company, The, Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.. Tyco Fire Products, L.P. answer due 9/4/2018; Chemguard answer due 9/4/2018; 3M Company, The answer due 9/4/2018; Kidde PLC, Inc. answer due 9/4/2018; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. answer due 9/4/2018; National Foam, Inc. answer due 9/4/2018; UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. answer due 9/4/2018. (Ingebretsen, Stephen) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brett Morrison, Bonnie Morrison, Ronald Servant, Jaralee Schutt, Joseph Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heather Bartee, Charles White, Martha Mattson, Randi Kline, Michael Slater, Cody Hopkins, Genette Noon, Gordon Randall, Steve Starke, Joyce Noon, Joseph Mattson, Bea Folk, Beth Sayers, Amber Kois, Leda Bartee, Kevin Cole, Tammy Higginbotham, Latoia Neal, Taneeshia Cole, Chartrese Tuthill, Adrienne Ortega, Amanda Starke, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Carol McKennon, Verna Coil, Melissa Niday, Jennifer Servant, Toby Routt, Jeffrey Nixon, Lawrence Green, James Hopkins, Ernest Whitford, Breanna Pohlman, Julie Royston, Joanne Roderick, Claudia Slater, Joe Sigala, Joshua Phillips, Miaja Starke, Cay Kline, Robert Sayers, Jessica Pohlman, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sigala, Kim Adams, Paul Hopkins, Claudia Adams, Trina McKennon, Jennifer Whitford, Adan Mata, Carmen McConnell, Don Starke, Gary Niemetz, Gerald Gustine, John Sims, Rodney Royston, Howard Coil, Linda Long, Lawrence Pohlman, Janis White, Cecelia Kois, Ingrid Nixon, Billy Long, Lorinda Gustine, Gary Bartee, John Wilson, Sr., Terry Allnut, Alfred Neal, Jr., Alice Cole, Angie Peterie, Ruben Ortega, Alice Chambers, Jeffrey Newton, Penelope Alonzo, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Larry Nixon, Felice Kay Alonzo. UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brett Morrison, Bonnie Morrison, Ronald Servant, Jaralee Schutt, Joseph Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heather Bartee, Charles White, Martha Mattson, Randi Kline, Michael Slater, Cody Hopkins, Genette Noon, Gordon Randall, Steve Starke, Joyce Noon, Joseph Mattson, Bea Folk, Beth Sayers, Amber Kois, Leda Bartee, Kevin Cole, Tammy Higginbotham, Latoia Neal, Taneeshia Cole, Chartrese Tuthill, Adrienne Ortega, Amanda Starke, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Carol McKennon, Verna Coil, Melissa Niday, Jennifer Servant, Toby Routt, Jeffrey Nixon, Lawrence Green, James Hopkins, Ernest Whitford, Breanna Pohlman, Julie Royston, Joanne Roderick, Claudia Slater, Joe Sigala, Joshua Phillips, Miaja Starke, Cay Kline, Robert Sayers, Jessica Pohlman, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sigala, Kim Adams, Paul Hopkins, Claudia Adams, Trina McKennon, Jennifer Whitford, Adan Mata, Carmen McConnell, Don Starke, Gary Niemetz, Gerald Gustine, John Sims, Rodney Royston, Howard Coil, Linda Long, Lawrence Pohlman, Janis White, Cecelia Kois, Ingrid Nixon, Billy Long, Lorinda Gustine, Gary Bartee, John Wilson, Sr., Terry Allnut, Alfred Neal, Jr., Alice Cole, Angie Peterie, Ruben Ortega, Alice Chambers, Jeffrey Newton, Penelope Alonzo, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Larry Nixon, Felice Kay Alonzo. Kidde PLC, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brett Morrison, Bonnie Morrison, Ronald Servant, Jaralee Schutt, Joseph Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heather Bartee, Charles White, Martha Mattson, Randi Kline, Michael Slater, Cody Hopkins, Genette Noon, Gordon Randall, Steve Starke, Joyce Noon, Joseph Mattson, Bea Folk, Beth Sayers, Amber Kois, Leda Bartee, Kevin Cole, Tammy Higginbotham, Latoia Neal, Taneeshia Cole, Chartrese Tuthill, Adrienne Ortega, Amanda Starke, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Carol McKennon, Verna Coil, Melissa Niday, Jennifer Servant, Toby Routt, Jeffrey Nixon, Lawrence Green, James Hopkins, Ernest Whitford, Breanna Pohlman, Julie Royston, Joanne Roderick, Claudia Slater, Joe Sigala, Joshua Phillips, Miaja Starke, Cay Kline, Robert Sayers, Jessica Pohlman, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sigala, Kim Adams, Paul Hopkins, Claudia Adams, Trina McKennon, Jennifer Whitford, Adan Mata, Carmen McConnell, Don Starke, Gary Niemetz, Gerald Gustine, John Sims, Rodney Royston, Howard Coil, Linda Long, Lawrence Pohlman, Janis White, Cecelia Kois, Ingrid Nixon, Billy Long, Lorinda Gustine, Gary Bartee, John Wilson, Sr., Terry Allnut, Alfred Neal, Jr., Alice Cole, Angie Peterie, Ruben Ortega, Alice Chambers, Jeffrey Newton, Penelope Alonzo, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Larry Nixon, Felice Kay Alonzo. Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brett Morrison, Bonnie Morrison, Ronald Servant, Jaralee Schutt, Joseph Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heather Bartee, Charles White, Martha Mattson, Randi Kline, Michael Slater, Cody Hopkins, Genette Noon, Gordon Randall, Steve Starke, Joyce Noon, Joseph Mattson, Bea Folk, Beth Sayers, Amber Kois, Leda Bartee, Kevin Cole, Tammy Higginbotham, Latoia Neal, Taneeshia Cole, Chartrese Tuthill, Adrienne Ortega, Amanda Starke, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Carol McKennon, Verna Coil, Melissa Niday, Jennifer Servant, Toby Routt, Jeffrey Nixon, Lawrence Green, James Hopkins, Ernest Whitford, Breanna Pohlman, Julie Royston, Joanne Roderick, Claudia Slater, Joe Sigala, Joshua Phillips, Miaja Starke, Cay Kline, Robert Sayers, Jessica Pohlman, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sigala, Kim Adams, Paul Hopkins, Claudia Adams, Trina McKennon, Jennifer Whitford, Adan Mata, Carmen McConnell, Don Starke, Gary Niemetz, Gerald Gustine, John Sims, Rodney Royston, Howard Coil, Linda Long, Lawrence Pohlman, Janis White, Cecelia Kois, Ingrid Nixon, Billy Long, Lorinda Gustine, Gary Bartee, John Wilson, Sr., Terry Allnut, Alfred Neal, Jr., Alice Cole, Angie Peterie, Ruben Ortega, Alice Chambers, Jeffrey Newton, Penelope Alonzo, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Larry Nixon, Felice Kay Alonzo. Chemguard waiver sent on 6/13/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brett Morrison, Bonnie Morrison, Ronald Servant, Jaralee Schutt, Joseph Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heather Bartee, Charles White, Martha Mattson, Randi Kline, Michael Slater, Cody Hopkins, Genette Noon, Gordon Randall, Steve Starke, Joyce Noon, Joseph Mattson, Bea Folk, Beth Sayers, Amber Kois, Leda Bartee, Kevin Cole, Tammy Higginbotham, Latoia Neal, Taneeshia Cole, Chartrese Tuthill, Adrienne Ortega, Amanda Starke, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Carol McKennon, Verna Coil, Melissa Niday, Jennifer Servant, Toby Routt, Jeffrey Nixon, Lawrence Green, James Hopkins, Ernest Whitford, Breanna Pohlman, Julie Royston, Joanne Roderick, Claudia Slater, Joe Sigala, Joshua Phillips, Miaja Starke, Cay Kline, Robert Sayers, Jessica Pohlman, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sigala, Kim Adams, Paul Hopkins, Claudia Adams, Trina McKennon, Jennifer Whitford, Adan Mata, Carmen McConnell, Don Starke, Gary Niemetz, Gerald Gustine, John Sims, Rodney Royston, Howard Coil, Linda Long, Lawrence Pohlman, Janis White, Cecelia Kois, Ingrid Nixon, Billy Long, Lorinda Gustine, Gary Bartee, John Wilson, Sr., Terry Allnut, Alfred Neal, Jr., Alice Cole, Angie Peterie, Ruben Ortega, Alice Chambers, Jeffrey Newton, Penelope Alonzo, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Larry Nixon, Felice Kay Alonzo. Tyco Fire Products, L.P. waiver sent on 6/13/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pending in the consolidate Bell, et al. cases, 16-cv-02351-RBJ, at ECF No. 141 is a motion to certify a class. No response has been filed. Now, some of the same plaintiffs' lawyers have filed Adams, 18-cv-00705-KMT, drawn to Magistrate Judge Tafoya, joining dozens of individuals, seemingly making similar claims against the same or similar group of companies. The Court would appreciate a status report from lead counsel on both sides providing their understanding of the different approaches plaintiffs seem to be taking in these cases. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/20/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tate James Kunkle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert of Service)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to 3M by Plaintiffs Claudia Adams, Kim Adams, Terry Allnut, Felice Kay Alonzo, Penelope Alonzo, Gary Bartee, Heather Bartee, Leda Bartee, Alice Chambers, Howard Coil, Verna Coil, Alice Cole, Kevin Cole, Taneeshia Cole, Bea Folk, Lawrence Green, Gerald Gustine, Lorinda Gustine, Tammy Higginbotham, Cody Hopkins, James Hopkins, Paul Hopkins, Cay Kline, Randi Kline, Amber Kois, Cecelia Kois, Joseph Kois, Billy Long, Linda Long, Adan Mata, Joseph Mattson, Martha Mattson, Carmen McConnell, Carol McKennon, Trina McKennon, Bonnie Morrison, Brett Morrison, Alfred Neal, Latoia Neal, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Jr., Jeffrey Newton, Melissa Niday, Gary Niemetz, Ingrid Nixon, Jeffrey Nixon, Larry Nixon, Genette Noon, Joyce Noon, Adrienne Ortega, Ruben Ortega, Angie Peterie, Joshua Phillips, Breanna Pohlman, Jessica Pohlman, Lawrence Pohlman, Gordon Randall, Joanne Roderick, Toby Routt, Julie Royston, Rodney Royston, Beth Sayers, Robert Sayers, Jaralee Schutt, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Jennifer Servant, Ronald Servant, Joe Sigala, John Sigala, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sims, Claudia Slater, Kaitlyn Slater, Michael Slater, Amanda Starke, Don Starke, Miaja Starke, Steve Starke, Chartrese Tuthill, Charles White, Janis White, Ernest Whitford, Jennifer Whitford, John Wilson, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request, #2 Summons Summons Request, #3 Summons Summons Request, #4 Summons Summons Request, #5 Summons Summons Request, #6 Summons Summons Request, #7 Summons Summons Request, #8 Summons Summons Request)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION to Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul J. Napoli on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter Jay Shkolnik on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony Dean Tracy on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Dean Tracy added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Tracy, Anthony) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Leah Caroline Garrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Leah Caroline Garrett added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Garrett, Leah) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla) (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Patrick J. Lanciotti. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Williams Holdings, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6014791)Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Claudia Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kim Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Allnut(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Felice Kay Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Penelope Alonzo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leda Bartee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alice Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Howard Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Verna Coil(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alice Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Taneeshia Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bea Folk(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lawrence Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lorinda Gustine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy Higginbotham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cody Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cay Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randi Kline(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cecelia Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Kois(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Long(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Long(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party K. M.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party T. M.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adan Mata(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martha Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen McConnell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Trina McKennon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bonnie Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brett Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latoia Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharolyn Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Neal, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Newton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melissa Niday(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Niemetz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ingrid Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genette Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce Noon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrienne Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruben Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angie Peterie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Breanna Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lawrence Pohlman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gordon Randall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Roderick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Toby Routt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julie Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rodney Royston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party K. S.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beth Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Sayers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaralee Schutt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heddy Senechek-Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ronald Servant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ramon Sigala(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Claudia Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaitlyn Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Slater(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Don Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miaja Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steve Starke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chartrese Tuthill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles White(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janis White(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ernest Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Whitford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Wilson, Sr.(pty:pla), filed by Brett Morrison, Bonnie Morrison, Ronald Servant, Jaralee Schutt, Joseph Kois, Kaitlyn Slater, Heather Bartee, Charles White, Martha Mattson, Randi Kline, Michael Slater, Cody Hopkins, Genette Noon, Gordon Randall, Steve Starke, Joyce Noon(individually and as administrator of the Estate of Regan Noon), Joseph Mattson, Bea Folk, Beth Sayers, Amber Kois, Leda Bartee, Kevin Cole, Tammy Higginbotham, Latoia Neal, Taneeshia Cole, Chartrese Tuthill, Adrienne Ortega, T. M., Amanda Starke, Heddy Senechek-Servant, Carol McKennon, Verna Coil, Melissa Niday, Jennifer Servant, Toby Routt, Jeffrey Nixon, Lawrence Green, James Hopkins, Ernest Whitford, Breanna Pohlman, Julie Royston, Joanne Roderick, Claudia Slater, Joe Sigala, Joshua Phillips, Miaja Starke, K. S., Cay Kline, Robert Sayers, Jessica Pohlman, Ramon Sigala, Cheryl Sims, John Sigala, Kim Adams, Paul Hopkins, Claudia Adams, K. M., Trina McKennon, Jennifer Whitford, Adan Mata, Carmen McConnell, John Wilson, Sr., Don Starke, Gary Niemetz, Gerald Gustine, John Sims, Rodney Royston, Howard Coil, Linda Long, Lawrence Pohlman, Janis White, Cecelia Kois, Ingrid Nixon, Joyce Noon, Billy Long, Lorinda Gustine, Gary Bartee, John Wilson, Sr.(individually and as administrator of the Estate of Doris Wilson), Terry Allnut, Alfred Neal, Jr., Alice Cole, Angie Peterie, Ruben Ortega, Alice Chambers, Jeffrey Newton, Penelope Alonzo, Sharolyn Neal, Alfred Neal, Larry Nixon, Felice Kay Alonzo.(Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sayers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Higginbotham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Niday
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Sayers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Ortega
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Servant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Slater
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Peterie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Randall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sigala
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mattson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Pohlman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Coil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorinda Gustine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Sigala
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Nixon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Mata
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Royston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen McConnell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Whitford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Sigala
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bea Folk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Niemetz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felice Kay Alonzo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Roderick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Morrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Hopkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharolyn Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Adams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilson, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Adams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Kois
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Bartee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Mattson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hopkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Nixon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Allnut
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Coil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hopkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taneeshia Cole
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Slater
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Royston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Starke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nixon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cay Kline
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Gustine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Routt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Green
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoia Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Kline
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Chambers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Sims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Servant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Starke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miaja Starke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Ortega
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Noon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaralee Schutt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genette Noon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Cole
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leda Bartee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Pohlman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Kois
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Slater
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heddy Senechek-Servant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Pohlman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bartee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Newton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Whitford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kois
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cole
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol McKennon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Starke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina McKennon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penelope Alonzo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Morrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chartrese Tuthill
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Anthony Dean Tracy
Represented By: Leah Caroline Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?