Gordon et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Marquis (I) Gillen, Robert Duran, Glenda (I) Bailey, William Ray, Catrina Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Murray Smith, Kristin Olson, Ann Claar, Joan Forbes, James Skadden, Americo Rosario, Eilene Lorance, Barbara Maroney, Linda Tisor, Rick Randall, Christine Waltman, Jeremy Smith, Kayla Dill, Jennifer Carrick, Patrick Dill, Jr., Anthony Gordon, Tina Richards, Elizabeth Johnson, Duane Reddick, John Bailey, Wayne Wildenstein, David Coalson, Kris Olson, Patricia Lugo, Charlotte Cargile, Cheryl Peterson, Ivan Muniz, Nichole Anderson, Betty Walter, Patrice Adragna, Tammy Santi, Shana Davis, Carla Cavesina, Reina Pudder, Saul (I) Palomino, Laura Loveless, Tina (I) Richards, Brandy Villarreal, Sylvia Coppin, Alexander Zayas, Jasmin Castro, Caymen Saine, Ronnie Ferguson, Rovanna Moore, Taziah Muniz, Mary Strickland, Skyla Dill, Lisa Sauter, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr., Sharon Brungardt, Wilma Luther, Jessie Moore, Belinda (I) Lorance, Kimberly Pudder, Tedella Stockwell, Garrett Forbes, Edward Belarde, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Orion Gonzales, Wilbert Rivers, Tamar Sikes, Wayne Walter, Hannah Richards, Sheryl Schilling, Michael Claar, Kevin Cooper, Sharon Barnett, Ronald Stubbs, Barbara Moreland, Hiliaro Trevino, Heather Smalley, Clara Costra, Joanne Drake, Maurice Johnson, Erica Rosario, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Andrea Rosario, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Anglena Johnson, Landis Temple, Kim Boykin, Glenda Bailey, Martin Wittie, Kenneth Oxley, Norman Forbes, Cindy Henderson, Dee Ann Francis, Michael Carrick, Linda Oxley, Tiffany Sallee, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Robert Hoopes, Charles Moncher, Belinda Lorance, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Hunter Preussner, Charlotte Wittie, Rachel Petersen, Raymond Put, Ismael Nunez, Kathryn Gonzales, Marifel Whittmore, Gerald Schneider, Roy Preussner, Judy Bergen, Joann (I) Jackson, Amariz Lugo, Heather (I) Logsdon, Sandy Coalson, Amy Torrans, Mary (I) Strickland, Kevin Sutherland, Stephanie Lorance, Marquel Preussner, Vanda Skadden, Beverly Morgan, Roy Adams, Officer James Johnson, Anthony (I) Smalley, Karen Dixon, Dennis Tisor, Angela Johnson, Marquis Gillen, Michael Lorance, Caleb Carabajal, Saul Palomino, Michael Apodaca, Rosalie Palomino, Richard Petersen, Amber Phillips, Ya'Anna Jackson, Sharon (I) Barnett, Maria Trevino, Castulo Rodriguez, Kayla Krakofsky, Joann Jackson, Billy Bates, Joe Gonzales, Rhonda Cruz, James Whittemore, Larry Johnson, Deanna Saine, Fulya Johnson, Mary Niemetz, Christen Malone, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Tawaiian Muniz, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Jamie Krakofsky, Amy (I) Torrans, Belinda Johnson, Hannah Chandler, Karry Homan, Sandra Bailey, Anthony Smalley, Michelle Walker, William Magginetti, Yasmin Johnson, Richard Costra, Ute Jahnke, Aiden Preussner, Randy Spah, Amy Johnson, Teresa Egli, Patrick Dill, Jeffrey Stockwell, Thomas Strickland, Sr., Alan Gordon, Christen (I) Malone, Heather Logsdon, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Wanda Adams, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Douglas, Kristine Fox, Kelly White, Jacob Carabajal, Roberto Rapalo, Eric Miles, Joan Stubbs, Glennda Davis, Robert Henderson, Curtis Saine, Viktoria Rivers, Mack Tolle and Thomas Strickland, Jr.
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Chemguard and 3M Company, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv03371
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01065, Gordon et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03371-RMG (sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (cpeg, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01065. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-01065 RBJ-KMT to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Sharon Barnett, Sharon (I) Barnett, Billy Bates, Edward Belarde, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Bergen, Kim Boykin, Sharon Brungardt, Caleb Carabajal, Jacob Carabajal, Charlotte Cargile, Jennifer Carrick, Michael Carrick, Jasmin Castro, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, Ann Claar, Michael Claar, David Coalson, Sandy Coalson, Kevin Cooper, Sylvia Coppin, Clara Costra, Richard Costra, Rhonda Cruz, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glennda Davis, Shana Davis, Kayla Dill, Patrick Dill, Jr, Patrick Dill, Skyla Dill, Karen Dixon, Judy Douglas, Joanne Drake, Robert Duran, Teresa Egli, Ronnie Ferguson, Garrett Forbes, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Marquis Gillen, Marquis (I) Gillen, Joe Gonzales, Kathryn Gonzales, Orion Gonzales, Alan Gordon, Anthony Gordon, Cindy Henderson, Robert Henderson, Karry Homan, Robert Hoopes, Joann Jackson, Joann (I) Jackson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Amy Johnson, Angela Johnson, Anglena Johnson, Belinda Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Elizabeth Johnson, Fulya Johnson, James Johnson, Larry Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Yasmin Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Heather Logsdon, Heather (I) Logsdon, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr, Belinda Lorance, Belinda (I) Lorance, Eilene Lorance, Michael Lorance, Stephanie Lorance, Laura Loveless, Amariz Lugo, Patricia Lugo, Wilma Luther, William Magginetti, Roy Adams, Wanda Adams, Patrice Adragna, Nichole Anderson, Michael Apodaca, Glenda Bailey, Glenda (I) Bailey, John Bailey, Sandra Bailey, Christen Malone, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Eric Miles, Charles Moncher, Jessie Moore, Rovanna Moore, Barbara Moreland, Beverly Morgan, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Ivan Muniz, Tawaiian Muniz, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Taziah Muniz, Mary Niemetz, Ismael Nunez, Kris Olson, Kristin Olson, Kenneth Oxley, Linda Oxley, Rosalie Palomino, Saul Palomino, Saul (I) Palomino, Rachel Petersen, Richard Petersen, Cheryl Peterson, Amber Phillips, Aiden Preussner, Hunter Preussner, Marquel Preussner, Roy Preussner, Kimberly Pudder, Reina Pudder, Raymond Put, Rick Randall, Roberto Rapalo, William Ray, Duane Reddick, Hannah Richards, Tina Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Viktoria Rivers, Wilbert Rivers, Castulo Rodriguez, Americo Rosario, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Caymen Saine, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tiffany Sallee, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Tammy Santi, Lisa Sauter, Sheryl Schilling, Gerald Schneider, Tamar Sikes, James Skadden, Vanda Skadden, Anthony Smalley, Anthony (I) Smalley, Heather Smalley, Jeremy Smith, Murray Smith, Randy Spah, Jeffrey Stockwell, Tedella Stockwell, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary Strickland, Mary (I) Strickland, Thomas Strickland, Jr, Thomas Strickland, Sr, Joan Stubbs, Ronald Stubbs, Kevin Sutherland, Landis Temple, Dennis Tisor, Linda Tisor, Mack Tolle, Amy Torrans, Amy (I) Torrans, Hiliaro Trevino, Maria Trevino, Brandy Villarreal, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Wayne Walter, Christine Waltman, Kelly White, James Whittemore, Marifel Whittmore, Wayne Wildenstein, Charlotte Wittie, Martin Wittie, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Alexander Zayas. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 3.2(b) and 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(b), and with the consent of the judges involved and my authority as Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Jackson to serve as the presiding Article III judge. The Clerk of the Court shall modify the Court's records to reflect Judge Jackson as the assigned Article III judge in this case. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/17/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Attorney Hyman is no longer counsel of record in this matter. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/27/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Sharon Barnett, Sharon (I) Barnett, Billy Bates, Edward Belarde, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Bergen, Kim Boykin, Sharon Brungardt, Caleb Carabajal, Jacob Carabajal, Charlotte Cargile, Jennifer Carrick, Michael Carrick, Jasmin Castro, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, Ann Claar, Michael Claar, David Coalson, Sandy Coalson, Kevin Cooper, Sylvia Coppin, Clara Costra, Richard Costra, Rhonda Cruz, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glennda Davis, Shana Davis, Kayla Dill, Patrick Dill, Jr, Patrick Dill, Skyla Dill, Karen Dixon, Judy Douglas, Joanne Drake, Robert Duran, Teresa Egli, Ronnie Ferguson, Garrett Forbes, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Marquis Gillen, Marquis (I) Gillen, Joe Gonzales, Kathryn Gonzales, Orion Gonzales, Alan Gordon, Anthony Gordon, Cindy Henderson, Robert Henderson, Karry Homan, Robert Hoopes, Joann Jackson, Joann (I) Jackson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Amy Johnson, Angela Johnson, Anglena Johnson, Belinda Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Elizabeth Johnson, Fulya Johnson, James Johnson, Larry Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Yasmin Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Heather Logsdon, Heather (I) Logsdon, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr, Belinda Lorance, Belinda (I) Lorance, Eilene Lorance, Michael Lorance, Stephanie Lorance, Laura Loveless, Amariz Lugo, Patricia Lugo, Wilma Luther, William Magginetti, Roy Adams, Wanda Adams, Patrice Adragna, Nichole Anderson, Michael Apodaca, Glenda Bailey, Glenda (I) Bailey, John Bailey, Sandra Bailey, Christen Malone, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Eric Miles, Charles Moncher, Jessie Moore, Rovanna Moore, Barbara Moreland, Beverly Morgan, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Ivan Muniz, Tawaiian Muniz, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Taziah Muniz, Mary Niemetz, Ismael Nunez, Kris Olson, Kristin Olson, Kenneth Oxley, Linda Oxley, Rosalie Palomino, Saul Palomino, Saul (I) Palomino, Rachel Petersen, Richard Petersen, Cheryl Peterson, Amber Phillips, Aiden Preussner, Hunter Preussner, Marquel Preussner, Roy Preussner, Kimberly Pudder, Reina Pudder, Raymond Put, Rick Randall, Roberto Rapalo, William Ray, Duane Reddick, Hannah Richards, Tina Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Viktoria Rivers, Wilbert Rivers, Castulo Rodriguez, Americo Rosario, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Caymen Saine, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tiffany Sallee, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Tammy Santi, Lisa Sauter, Sheryl Schilling, Gerald Schneider, Tamar Sikes, James Skadden, Vanda Skadden, Anthony Smalley, Anthony (I) Smalley, Heather Smalley, Jeremy Smith, Murray Smith, Randy Spah, Jeffrey Stockwell, Tedella Stockwell, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary Strickland, Mary (I) Strickland, Thomas Strickland, Jr, Thomas Strickland, Sr, Joan Stubbs, Ronald Stubbs, Kevin Sutherland, Landis Temple, Dennis Tisor, Linda Tisor, Mack Tolle, Amy Torrans, Amy (I) Torrans, Hiliaro Trevino, Maria Trevino, Brandy Villarreal, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Wayne Walter, Christine Waltman, Kelly White, James Whittemore, Marifel Whittmore, Wayne Wildenstein, Charlotte Wittie, Martin Wittie, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Alexander Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon (I) Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon (I) Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda (I) Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda (I) Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marquis (I) Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marquis (I) Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann (I) Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann (I) Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anglena Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anglena Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Belinda Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Belinda Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Catrina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Catrina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fulya Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fulya Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Joh
June 22, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Sharon Barnett, Sharon (I) Barnett, Billy Bates, Edward Belarde, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Bergen, Kim Boykin, Sharon Brungardt, Caleb Carabajal, Jacob Carabajal, Charlotte Cargile, Jennifer Carrick, Michael Carrick, Jasmin Castro, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, Ann Claar, Michael Claar, David Coalson, Sandy Coalson, Kevin Cooper, Sylvia Coppin, Clara Costra, Richard Costra, Rhonda Cruz, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glennda Davis, Shana Davis, Kayla Dill, Patrick Dill, Jr, Patrick Dill, Skyla Dill, Karen Dixon, Judy Douglas, Joanne Drake, Robert Duran, Teresa Egli, Ronnie Ferguson, Garrett Forbes, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Marquis Gillen, Marquis (I) Gillen, Joe Gonzales, Kathryn Gonzales, Orion Gonzales, Alan Gordon, Anthony Gordon, Cindy Henderson, Robert Henderson, Karry Homan, Robert Hoopes, Joann Jackson, Joann (I) Jackson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Amy Johnson, Angela Johnson, Anglena Johnson, Belinda Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Elizabeth Johnson, Fulya Johnson, James Johnson, Larry Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Yasmin Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Heather Logsdon, Heather (I) Logsdon, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr, Belinda Lorance, Belinda (I) Lorance, Eilene Lorance, Michael Lorance, Stephanie Lorance, Laura Loveless, Amariz Lugo, Patricia Lugo, Wilma Luther, William Magginetti, Roy Adams, Wanda Adams, Patrice Adragna, Nichole Anderson, Michael Apodaca, Glenda Bailey, Glenda (I) Bailey, John Bailey, Sandra Bailey, Christen Malone, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Eric Miles, Charles Moncher, Jessie Moore, Rovanna Moore, Barbara Moreland, Beverly Morgan, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Ivan Muniz, Tawaiian Muniz, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Taziah Muniz, Mary Niemetz, Ismael Nunez, Kris Olson, Kristin Olson, Kenneth Oxley, Linda Oxley, Rosalie Palomino, Saul Palomino, Saul (I) Palomino, Rachel Petersen, Richard Petersen, Cheryl Peterson, Amber Phillips, Aiden Preussner, Hunter Preussner, Marquel Preussner, Roy Preussner, Kimberly Pudder, Reina Pudder, Raymond Put, Rick Randall, Roberto Rapalo, William Ray, Duane Reddick, Hannah Richards, Tina Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Viktoria Rivers, Wilbert Rivers, Castulo Rodriguez, Americo Rosario, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Caymen Saine, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tiffany Sallee, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Tammy Santi, Lisa Sauter, Sheryl Schilling, Gerald Schneider, Tamar Sikes, James Skadden, Vanda Skadden, Anthony Smalley, Anthony (I) Smalley, Heather Smalley, Jeremy Smith, Murray Smith, Randy Spah, Jeffrey Stockwell, Tedella Stockwell, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary Strickland, Mary (I) Strickland, Thomas Strickland, Jr, Thomas Strickland, Sr, Joan Stubbs, Ronald Stubbs, Kevin Sutherland, Landis Temple, Dennis Tisor, Linda Tisor, Mack Tolle, Amy Torrans, Amy (I) Torrans, Hiliaro Trevino, Maria Trevino, Brandy Villarreal, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Wayne Walter, Christine Waltman, Kelly White, James Whittemore, Marifel Whittmore, Wayne Wildenstein, Charlotte Wittie, Martin Wittie, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Alexander Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sharon Barnett, Sharon (I) Barnett, Billy Bates, Edward Belarde, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Bergen, Kim Boykin, Sharon Brungardt, Caleb Carabajal, Jacob Carabajal, Charlotte Cargile, Jennifer Carrick, Michael Carrick, Jasmin Castro, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, Ann Claar, Michael Claar, David Coalson, Sandy Coalson, Kevin Cooper, Sylvia Coppin, Clara Costra, Richard Costra, Rhonda Cruz, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glennda Davis, Shana Davis, Kayla Dill, Patrick Dill, Jr, Patrick Dill, Skyla Dill, Karen Dixon, Judy Douglas, Joanne Drake, Robert Duran, Teresa Egli, Ronnie Ferguson, Garrett Forbes, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Marquis Gillen, Marquis (I) Gillen, Joe Gonzales, Kathryn Gonzales, Orion Gonzales, Alan Gordon, Anthony Gordon, Cindy Henderson, Robert Henderson, Karry Homan, Robert Hoopes, Joann Jackson, Joann (I) Jackson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Amy Johnson, Angela Johnson, Anglena Johnson, Belinda Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Elizabeth Johnson, Fulya Johnson, James Johnson, Larry Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Yasmin Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Heather Logsdon, Heather (I) Logsdon, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr, Belinda Lorance, Belinda (I) Lorance, Eilene Lorance, Michael Lorance, Stephanie Lorance, Laura Loveless, Amariz Lugo, Patricia Lugo, Wilma Luther, William Magginetti, Roy Adams, Wanda Adams, Patrice Adragna, Nichole Anderson, Michael Apodaca, Glenda Bailey, Glenda (I) Bailey, John Bailey, Sandra Bailey, Christen Malone, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Eric Miles, Charles Moncher, Jessie Moore, Rovanna Moore, Barbara Moreland, Beverly Morgan, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Ivan Muniz, Tawaiian Muniz, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Taziah Muniz, Mary Niemetz, Ismael Nunez, Kris Olson, Kristin Olson, Kenneth Oxley, Linda Oxley, Rosalie Palomino, Saul Palomino, Saul (I) Palomino, Rachel Petersen, Richard Petersen, Cheryl Peterson, Amber Phillips, Aiden Preussner, Hunter Preussner, Marquel Preussner, Roy Preussner, Kimberly Pudder, Reina Pudder, Raymond Put, Rick Randall, Roberto Rapalo, William Ray, Duane Reddick, Hannah Richards, Tina Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Viktoria Rivers, Wilbert Rivers, Castulo Rodriguez, Americo Rosario, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Caymen Saine, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tiffany Sallee, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Tammy Santi, Lisa Sauter, Sheryl Schilling, Gerald Schneider, Tamar Sikes, James Skadden, Vanda Skadden, Anthony Smalley, Anthony (I) Smalley, Heather Smalley, Jeremy Smith, Murray Smith, Randy Spah, Jeffrey Stockwell, Tedella Stockwell, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary Strickland, Mary (I) Strickland, Thomas Strickland, Jr, Thomas Strickland, Sr, Joan Stubbs, Ronald Stubbs, Kevin Sutherland, Landis Temple, Dennis Tisor, Linda Tisor, Mack Tolle, Amy Torrans, Amy (I) Torrans, Hiliaro Trevino, Maria Trevino, Brandy Villarreal, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Wayne Walter, Christine Waltman, Kelly White, James Whittemore, Marifel Whittmore, Wayne Wildenstein, Charlotte Wittie, Martin Wittie, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Alexander Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint (noted changes))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 22, 2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 MOTION for Order to File an Amended Complaint filed by Vanda Skadden, Joann (I) Jackson, Joan Forbes, Tina Richards, Sandra Bailey, Shana Davis, Tamar Sikes, Linda Oxley, Catrina Johnson, Rachel Petersen, Sylvia Coppin, Barbara Moreland, Saul Palomino, Jennifer Carrick, William Magginetti, Jamie Krakofsky, Sharon Brungardt, Linda Tisor, Hiliaro Trevino, Carla Cavesina, Christen (I) Malone, Heather Smalley, Roy Preussner, Joe Gonzales, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glenda Bailey, Joan Stubbs, Kimberly Pudder, Caleb Carabajal, Kayla Krakofsky, Kenneth Oxley, Charlotte Wittie, Richard Costra, Marquis Gillen, Heather (I) Logsdon, Amber Phillips, Charlotte Cargile, Rovanna Moore, Wilbert Rivers, Norman Forbes, Kathryn Gonzales, Fulya Johnson, Andrea Rosario, Dennis Tisor, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Belinda (I) Lorance, Robert Duran, John Bailey, Mary Strickland, Karen Dixon, Rhonda Cruz, Sheryl Schilling, Kim Boykin, Sharon (I) Barnett, Kristin Olson, Aiden Preussner, Martin Wittie, Maurice (I) Johnson, Tiffany Sallee, Michael Claar, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Larry Johnson, Anthony Gordon, Curtis Saine, Viktoria Rivers, Garrett Forbes, Patricia Lugo, Eric Miles, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Duane Reddick, Saul (I) Palomino, Mack Tolle, Taziah Muniz, Thomas Strickland, Jr., Marquis (I) Gillen, Hannah Chandler, Jasmin Castro, Rosalie Palomino, Deanna Saine, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Lisa Sauter, Thomas Strickland, Sr., Ann Claar, Kevin Cooper, William Ray, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr., Hannah Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Amy (I) Torrans, Erica Rosario, Randy Spah, Jessie Moore, Tammy Santi, Gerald Schneider, Castulo Rodriguez, Marifel Whittmore, Laura Loveless, Orion Gonzales, Kristine Fox, Brandy Villarreal, Sharon Barnett, Michael Carrick, James Whittemore, Edward Belarde, Cheryl Peterson, Eilene Lorance, Kelly White, Wayne Wildenstein, Judy Bergen, Jeffrey Stockwell, Ute Jahnke, Tawaiian Muniz, Nichole Anderson, Rick Randall, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Belinda Lorance, Roberto Rapalo, Ronnie Ferguson, Wilma Luther, Patrice Adragna, Yasmin Johnson, Clara Costra, Kayla Dill, Ismael Nunez, Patrick Dill, Jr., Judy Douglas, Roy Adams, Maria Trevino, Joann Jackson, Charles Moncher, Anglena Johnson, Anthony (I) Smalley, Anthony Smalley, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Raymond Put, James Skadden, Ronald Stubbs, Elizabeth Johnson, Stephanie Lorance, Jacob Carabajal, Caymen Saine, Ivan Muniz, Glennda Davis, Robert Henderson, Glenda (I) Bailey, Marquel Preussner, Beverly Morgan, Michael Lorance, Wayne Walter, Mary (I) Strickland, Heather Logsdon, Skyla Dill, Alexis Benzinger, Wanda Adams, Michael Apodaca, Cindy Henderson, Belinda Johnson, Americo Rosario, Teresa Egli, Maurice Johnson, Mary Niemetz, Amy Johnson, Karry Homan, Reina Pudder, Angela Johnson, Joanne Drake, David Coalson, Jeremy Smith, Kris Olson, Kevin Sutherland, Christine Waltman, Tedella Stockwell, Alan Gordon, Patrick Dill, Billy Bates, Hunter Preussner, Amariz Lugo, Sandy Coalson, Amy Torrans, James Johnson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Landis Temple, Murray Smith, Barbara Maroney, Alexander Zayas, Richard Petersen, Christen Malone, Robert Hoopes, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Dee Ann Francis, Sanra Moss-Reddick. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/18/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Sharon Barnett, Sharon (I) Barnett, Billy Bates, Edward Belarde, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Bergen, Kim Boykin, Sharon Brungardt, Caleb Carabajal, Jacob Carabajal, Charlotte Cargile, Jennifer Carrick, Michael Carrick, Jasmin Castro, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, Ann Claar, Michael Claar, David Coalson, Sandy Coalson, Kevin Cooper, Sylvia Coppin, Clara Costra, Richard Costra, Rhonda Cruz, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glennda Davis, Shana Davis, Kayla Dill, Patrick Dill, Jr, Patrick Dill, Skyla Dill, Karen Dixon, Judy Douglas, Joanne Drake, Robert Duran, Teresa Egli, Ronnie Ferguson, Garrett Forbes, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Marquis Gillen, Marquis (I) Gillen, Joe Gonzales, Kathryn Gonzales, Orion Gonzales, Alan Gordon, Anthony Gordon, Cindy Henderson, Robert Henderson, Karry Homan, Robert Hoopes, Joann Jackson, Joann (I) Jackson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Amy Johnson, Angela Johnson, Anglena Johnson, Belinda Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Elizabeth Johnson, Fulya Johnson, James Johnson, Larry Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Yasmin Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Heather Logsdon, Heather (I) Logsdon, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr, Belinda Lorance, Belinda (I) Lorance, Eilene Lorance, Michael Lorance, Stephanie Lorance, Laura Loveless, Amariz Lugo, Patricia Lugo, Wilma Luther, William Magginetti, Roy Adams, Wanda Adams, Patrice Adragna, Nichole Anderson, Michael Apodaca, Glenda Bailey, Glenda (I) Bailey, John Bailey, Sandra Bailey, Christen Malone, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Eric Miles, Charles Moncher, Jessie Moore, Rovanna Moore, Barbara Moreland, Beverly Morgan, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Ivan Muniz, Tawaiian Muniz, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Taziah Muniz, Mary Niemetz, Ismael Nunez, Kris Olson, Kristin Olson, Kenneth Oxley, Linda Oxley, Rosalie Palomino, Saul Palomino, Saul (I) Palomino, Rachel Petersen, Richard Petersen, Cheryl Peterson, Amber Phillips, Aiden Preussner, Hunter Preussner, Marquel Preussner, Roy Preussner, Kimberly Pudder, Reina Pudder, Raymond Put, Rick Randall, Roberto Rapalo, William Ray, Duane Reddick, Hannah Richards, Tina Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Viktoria Rivers, Wilbert Rivers, Castulo Rodriguez, Americo Rosario, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Caymen Saine, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tiffany Sallee, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Tammy Santi, Lisa Sauter, Sheryl Schilling, Gerald Schneider, Tamar Sikes, James Skadden, Vanda Skadden, Anthony Smalley, Anthony (I) Smalley, Heather Smalley, Jeremy Smith, Murray Smith, Randy Spah, Jeffrey Stockwell, Tedella Stockwell, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary Strickland, Mary (I) Strickland, Thomas Strickland, Jr, Thomas Strickland, Sr, Joan Stubbs, Ronald Stubbs, Kevin Sutherland, Landis Temple, Dennis Tisor, Linda Tisor, Mack Tolle, Amy Torrans, Amy (I) Torrans, Hiliaro Trevino, Maria Trevino, Brandy Villarreal, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Wayne Walter, Christine Waltman, Kelly White, James Whittemore, Marifel Whittmore, Wayne Wildenstein, Charlotte Wittie, Martin Wittie, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Alexander Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Second Amended Complaint (mark-through), #3 Second Amended Complaint (Clean))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon (I) Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon (I) Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda (I) Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda (I) Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marquis (I) Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marquis (I) Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann (I) Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann (I) Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anglena Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anglena Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Catrina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Catrina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fulya Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fulya Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice (I) Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice (I) Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yasmin Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yasmin Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Krakofsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Logsdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Logsdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather (I) Logsdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather (I) Logsdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda (I) Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda (I) Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eilene Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eilene Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Lorance(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephanie Lorance(pty:pla),
May 17, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Sharon Barnett, Sharon (I) Barnett, Billy Bates, Edward Belarde, Alexis Benzinger, Judy Bergen, Kim Boykin, Sharon Brungardt, Caleb Carabajal, Jacob Carabajal, Charlotte Cargile, Jennifer Carrick, Michael Carrick, Jasmin Castro, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, Ann Claar, Michael Claar, David Coalson, Sandy Coalson, Kevin Cooper, Sylvia Coppin, Clara Costra, Richard Costra, Rhonda Cruz, Rhonda (I) Cruz, Glennda Davis, Shana Davis, Kayla Dill, Patrick Dill, Jr, Patrick Dill, Skyla Dill, Karen Dixon, Judy Douglas, Joanne Drake, Robert Duran, Teresa Egli, Ronnie Ferguson, Garrett Forbes, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Marquis Gillen, Marquis (I) Gillen, Joe Gonzales, Kathryn Gonzales, Orion Gonzales, Alan Gordon, Anthony Gordon, Cindy Henderson, Robert Henderson, Karry Homan, Robert Hoopes, Joann Jackson, Joann (I) Jackson, Ya'Anna Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Amy Johnson, Angela Johnson, Anglena Johnson, Belinda Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Elizabeth Johnson, Fulya Johnson, James Johnson, Larry Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Maurice (I) Johnson, Yasmin Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Heather Logsdon, Heather (I) Logsdon, Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr, Belinda Lorance, Belinda (I) Lorance, Eilene Lorance, Michael Lorance, Stephanie Lorance, Laura Loveless, Amariz Lugo, Patricia Lugo, Wilma Luther, Wilma (I) Luther, Roy Adams, Wanda Adams, Patrice Adragna, Nichole Anderson, Michael Apodaca, Glenda Bailey, Glenda (I) Bailey, John Bailey, Sandra Bailey, William Magginetti, Christen Malone, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Eric Miles, Charles Moncher, Jessie Moore, Rovanna Moore, Barbara Moreland, Beverly Morgan, Sanra Moss-Reddick, Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick, Ivan Muniz, Tawaiian Muniz, Tawaiian (I) Muniz, Taziah Muniz, Mary Niemetz, Ismael Nunez, Kris Olson, Kristin Olson, Kenneth Oxley, Linda Oxley, Rosalie Palomino, Saul Palomino, Saul (I) Palomino, Rachel Petersen, Richard Petersen, Cheryl Peterson, Amber Phillips, Aiden Preussner, Hunter Preussner, Marquel Preussner, Roy Preussner, Kimberly Pudder, Reina Pudder, Raymond Put, Rick Randall, Roberto Rapalo, William Ray, Duane Reddick, Hannah Richards, Tina Richards, Tina (I) Richards, Viktoria Rivers, Wilbert Rivers, Castulo Rodriguez, Americo Rosario, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Caymen Saine, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tiffany Sallee, Tiffany (I) Sallee, Tammy Santi, Lisa Sauter, Sheryl Schilling, Gerald Schneider, Tamar Sikes, James Skadden, Vanda Skadden, Anthony Smalley, Anthony (I) Smalley, Heather Smalley, Jeremy Smith, Murray Smith, Randy Spah, Jeffrey Stockwell, Tedella Stockwell, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary Strickland, Mary (I) Strickland, Thomas Strickland, Jr, Thomas Strickland, Sr, Joan Stubbs, Ronald Stubbs, Kevin Sutherland, Landis Temple, Dennis Tisor, Linda Tisor, Mack Tolle, Amy Torrans, Amy (I) Torrans, Hiliaro Trevino, Maria Trevino, Brandy Villarreal, Brandy (I) Villarreal, Michelle Walker, Betty Walter, Wayne Walter, Christine Waltman, Kelly White, James Whittemore, Marifel Whittmore, Wayne Wildenstein, Charlotte Wittie, Martin Wittie, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Alexander Zayas.(McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/8/18. Text Only Entry (pglov) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1) Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2) ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3) Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/07/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon (I) Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon (I) Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda (I) Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda (I) Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marquis (I) Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marquis (I) Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anglena Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anglena Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Belinda Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Belinda Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Catrina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Catrina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fulya Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fulya Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yasmin Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yasmin Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patric
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6086928)Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roy Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roy Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wanda Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wanda Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrice Adragna(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrice Adragna(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nichole Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nichole Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Apodaca(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Apodaca(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glenda Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glenda Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glenda Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glenda Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Belarde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Benzinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Bergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kim Boykin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Caleb Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Carabajal(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charlotte Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jasmin Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Cavesina(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hannah Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ann Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandy Coalson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sylvia Coppin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clara Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Costra(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glennda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shana Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Skyla Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karen Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Drake(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Teresa Egli(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ronnie Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garrett Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joan Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Norman Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristine Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dee Ann Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marquis Gillen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Orion Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alan Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cindy Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karry Homan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Hoopes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ya'Anna Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ute Jahnke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Micha

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis (I) Gillen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Duran
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda (I) Bailey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ray
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrina Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice (I) Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Olson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Claar
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Forbes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Skadden
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americo Rosario
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eilene Lorance
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Maroney
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tisor
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Randall
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Waltman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Dill
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Carrick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dill, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gordon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Richards
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Reddick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bailey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Wildenstein
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Coalson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Olson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lugo
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Cargile
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Peterson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Muniz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Anderson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Walter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Adragna
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Santi
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Davis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Cavesina
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Pudder
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul (I) Palomino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Loveless
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina (I) Richards
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Villarreal
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Coppin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Zayas
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Castro
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caymen Saine
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ferguson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rovanna Moore
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taziah Muniz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Strickland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyla Dill
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sauter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brungardt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Luther
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Moore
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda (I) Lorance
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Pudder
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tedella Stockwell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Forbes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Belarde
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda (I) Cruz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orion Gonzales
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Rivers
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Sikes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Walter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Richards
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Schilling
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Claar
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cooper
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Barnett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Stubbs
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Moreland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiliaro Trevino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Smalley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Costra
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Drake
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Rosario
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawaiian (I) Muniz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Rosario
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Womack-Garrett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anglena Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landis Temple
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Boykin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Bailey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Wittie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Oxley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Forbes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Henderson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Ann Francis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carrick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Oxley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Sallee
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy (I) Villarreal
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hoopes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Moncher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Lorance
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Preussner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wittie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Petersen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Put
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Nunez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Gonzales
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marifel Whittmore
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Schneider
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Preussner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bergen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann (I) Jackson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amariz Lugo
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather (I) Logsdon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Coalson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Torrans
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary (I) Strickland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sutherland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lorance
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquel Preussner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda Skadden
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Morgan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Adams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer James Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony (I) Smalley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Dixon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tisor
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Gillen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lorance
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Carabajal
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Palomino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Apodaca
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Palomino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Petersen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Phillips
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ya'Anna Jackson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon (I) Barnett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Trevino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castulo Rodriguez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Krakofsky
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Jackson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Bates
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Gonzales
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Cruz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Whittemore
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Saine
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulya Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Niemetz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen Malone
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tedella (I) Stockwell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawaiian Muniz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany (I) Sallee
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Krakofsky
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy (I) Torrans
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Chandler
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karry Homan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bailey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Smalley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Walker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Magginetti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmin Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Costra
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Jahnke
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiden Preussner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Spah
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Egli
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dill
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Stockwell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Strickland, Sr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Gordon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen (I) Malone
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Logsdon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanra Moss-Reddick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Adams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Benzinger
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Douglas
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Fox
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly White
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Carabajal
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Rapalo
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Miles
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Stubbs
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glennda Davis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henderson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Saine
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viktoria Rivers
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Tolle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?