Stacy et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hybert, Robin McGaughey, Cleveland Holloway, Jason Lederer, John Mager, Roger Trujillo, Sarah Clarose, Kelsey Christy, Sedrick Krause, Jered Keith, Margaret Montoya, Drew Albers, Thomas Dingerson, Debra Baker, Stacy Sessom, Steven Grippo, Lori Ann Bodkin, Tina Farrell, Sylvia Garvin, Diane Cooper, Sarah Stacy, Jaime Miranda, Olga Hines, Jacob Benjamin, Wesley Hawthorne, Valdemar Olvera, David Pepper, Kevin (I) M. Stevenson, Felicia Guelker, Rachael Musser, Darlene Dickerson, Christopher Clenney, Veronika Rhodes, Sheila Mortrud, Barbara Lorio, Daniel Geyer, Russell Rohrer, Lori Castle, Jeremy Turney, Heather M. Grimaldo, Shannon Stevenson, Jennifer Moon, Alexander Monteith, Stephanie Payne, Lawrence LaRocco, Britany (I) Mitchell, Christopher Gregory, Laura L. Hawthorne, John Quinlivan, Samantha Barnwell, Katherine Canepa, Rene Lorio, Russell Hagdorn, Ashley Mohawk, Thomas Moyer, Frances Musser, Andrea (I) Macholz, Carlos Espinoza, Brian Peterson, Vicky Anderson, Michelle D. Davis, Donald Spessard, Marques Patterson, Elaine Maesca, Richard Hessek, Steven Remtema, Elaine Shea, Kenneth Payne, Gary Stacy, Amber Gregory, Joshua (I) Ashmore, Bonnie Moon Walker, Jennifer Shipp, Vernon Stout, Michelle (I) D. Davis, Maureen Hansen, Freda Miller, Phyllis Benfield, Colleen Shroka, Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer, Tanya (I) Lynn Marcus, Edward Hines, Rita Roedel Fish, Stella Vialpando, Tracy Gutierrez, Jeffery Curry, Shirley Dingerson, Tori Harris, Frank Barnwell, Duane Moody, Gary Bingham, Nicole Yarber, Susanne Canada, Heather (I) M. Grimaldo, Laville Coles, Ward Harris, Valerie Fields, Cyndi Hybert, Laura (I) L. Hawthorne, Robert Rodriguez, Michael McCullough, Brody Keiley, Sean Halstead, Carol Smith, Mary Schips, Sharon Smith, Gary Kuhfeld, Jeremy Hardy, William Garvin, Bradley Buetow, Melissa Downs, Natalie Bazilewich, Jill Hessek, Ronald Turner, Kevin M. Stevenson, Richard Robinson, Kayla Ward, Ester Kaminski, Edward Krezinski, Rachael (I) Musser, Jeffrey (I) Canada, Howard Gibson, Michael McNair, Paul Wiley, Oneil Levasseur, Sr., Tamra Mott, Kyle Sandy, Anthony Stout, Amanda (I) Ford, Mark Nielsen, Tina (I) Farrell, Tanya Lynn Marcus, Jennifer Mathis, Amber Stout, Travis Cronin, Marc Schips, Wendy Mentzer, Diana Culver, John Shroka, John Kaminski, Guadalupe Gonzalez, Kenneth Smith, Aedan Moyer, Steven Boneta, Jordan Sanner, Joseph Sigala, Felicia (I) Guelker, Angela Patterson, Brian Esteve, Phyllis Davis, Timothy Henricks, Tim Fish, Brent Acuncius, Elric Moyer, Andrea Macholz, Thomas Cornett, Michael Maresca, Allen Anderson, Loni Quinlivan, Richard Clarose, Lori (I) Ann Bodkin, Katie Wisell, Genevieve Bell, Vincent Walker, Joshua Ashmore, Sharon Livingston, Kelly Easdon, Terah Wilson, Joseph Benfield, Dale Coleman, Jamie Coleman, Gregory Johnson, Breanna Zimbelman, Mark (I) Nielsen, Phillip Hawthorne, Corby Olivas, Carol Mager, Thomas Miller, Joan Barnwell, Christopher Wilson, Richard Musser, Jose Castaneda, Austin Keehn, Natalie (I) Bazilewich, Britany Mitchell, Harry Park, Terah (I) Wilson, Robert Arthur Long, John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr., Donna Fults, Mark McGee, Brandon Strehl, Jeffrey Canada, Amanda Ford, Mark Comeau, Anna Miranda, Sheena Remtema, Alfred Shea, Amber (I) Gregory, Kelsey Keehn, Rebecca Parsons, Kim Easdon, Stacy Albers, Michael Miler, Martin Yeager and Kelvin Mathis
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., 3M Company, The, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03402
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01193, Stacy et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03402-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01193. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado18-cv-01193 RBJ, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Joan Barnwell, Samantha Barnwell, Natalie Bazilewich, Natalie (I) Bazilewich, Genevieve Bell, Joseph Benfield, Phyllis Benfield, Jacob Benjamin, Gary Bingham, Lori Ann Bodkin, Lori (I) Ann Bodkin, Steven Boneta, Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer, Bradley Buetow, Jeffrey Canada, Jeffrey (I) Canada, Susanne Canada, Katherine Canepa, Jose Castaneda, Lori Castle, Kelsey Christy, Richard Clarose, Sarah Clarose, Christopher Clenney, Dale Coleman, Jamie Coleman, Laville Coles, Mark Comeau, Diane Cooper, Thomas Cornett, Travis Cronin, Diana Culver, Jeffery Curry, Michelle D. Davis, Michelle (I) D. Davis, Phyllis Davis, Darlene Dickerson, Shirley Dingerson, Thomas Dingerson, Melissa Downs, Kelly Easdon, Kim Easdon, Carlos Espinoza, Brian Esteve, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Valerie Fields, Rita Roedel Fish, Tim Fish, Amanda Ford, Amanda (I) Ford, Donna Fults, Sylvia Garvin, William Garvin, Daniel Geyer, Howard Gibson, Guadalupe Gonzalez, Amber Gregory, Amber (I) Gregory, Christopher Gregory, Heather M. Grimaldo, Heather (I) M. Grimaldo, Steven Grippo, Felicia Guelker, Felicia (I) Guelker, Tracy Gutierrez, Russell Hagdorn, Sean Halstead, John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr, Maureen Hansen, Jeremy Hardy, Tori Harris, Ward Harris, Laura L. Hawthorne, Laura (I) L. Hawthorne, Phillip Hawthorne, Wesley Hawthorne, Timothy Henricks, Jill Hessek, Richard Hessek, Edward Hines, Olga Hines, Cleveland Holloway, Cyndi Hybert, Michael Hybert, Gregory Johnson, Ester Kaminski, John Kaminski, Austin Keehn, Kelsey Keehn, Brody Keiley, Jered Keith, Sedrick Krause, Edward Krezinski, Gary Kuhfeld, Lawrence LaRocco, Jason Lederer, Oneil Levasseur, Sr., Sharon Livingston, Robert Arthur Long, Barbara Lorio, Rene Lorio, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Elaine Maesca, Brent Acuncius, Drew Albers, Stacy Albers, Allen Anderson, Vicky Anderson, Joshua Ashmore, Joshua (I) Ashmore, Debra Baker, Frank Barnwell, Carol Mager, John Mager, Tanya Lynn Marcus, Tanya (I) Lynn Marcus, Michael Maresca, Jennifer Mathis, Kelvin Mathis, Michael McCullough, Robin McGaughey, Mark McGee, Michael McNair, Wendy Mentzer, Michael Miler, Freda Miller, Thomas Miller, Anna Miranda, Jaime Miranda, Britany Mitchell, Britany (I) Mitchell, Ashley Mohawk, Alexander Monteith, Margaret Montoya, Duane Moody, Jennifer Moon, Sheila Mortrud, Tamra Mott, Aedan Moyer, Elric Moyer, Thomas Moyer, Frances Musser, Rachael Musser, Rachael (I) Musser, Richard Musser, Mark Nielsen, Mark (I) Nielsen, Corby Olivas, Valdemar Olvera, Harry Park, Rebecca Parsons, Angela Patterson, Marques Patterson, Kenneth Payne, Stephanie Payne, David Pepper, Brian Peterson, John Quinlivan, Loni Quinlivan, Sheena Remtema, Steven Remtema, Veronika Rhodes, Richard Robinson, Robert Rodriguez, Russell Rohrer, Kyle Sandy, Jordan Sanner, Marc Schips, Mary Schips, Stacy Sessom, Alfred Shea, Elaine Shea, Jennifer Shipp, Colleen Shroka, John Shroka, Joseph Sigala, Carol Smith, Kenneth Smith, Sharon Smith, Donald Spessard, Gary Stacy, Sarah Stacy, Kevin M. Stevenson, Kevin (I) M. Stevenson, Shannon Stevenson, Amber Stout, Anthony Stout, Vernon Stout, Brandon Strehl, Roger Trujillo, Ronald Turner, Jeremy Turney, Stella Vialpando, Bonnie Moon Walker, Vincent Walker, Kayla Ward, Paul Wiley, Christopher Wilson, Terah Wilson, Terah (I) Wilson, Katie Wisell, Nicole Yarber, Martin Yeager, Breanna Zimbelman. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Joan Barnwell, Samantha Barnwell, Natalie Bazilewich, Natalie (I) Bazilewich, Genevieve Bell, Joseph Benfield, Phyllis Benfield, Jacob Benjamin, Gary Bingham, Lori Ann Bodkin, Lori (I) Ann Bodkin, Steven Boneta, Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer, Bradley Buetow, Jeffrey Canada, Jeffrey (I) Canada, Susanne Canada, Katherine Canepa, Jose Castaneda, Lori Castle, Kelsey Christy, Richard Clarose, Sarah Clarose, Christopher Clenney, Dale Coleman, Jamie Coleman, Laville Coles, Mark Comeau, Diane Cooper, Thomas Cornett, Travis Cronin, Diana Culver, Jeffery Curry, Michelle D. Davis, Michelle (I) D. Davis, Phyllis Davis, Darlene Dickerson, Shirley Dingerson, Thomas Dingerson, Melissa Downs, Kelly Easdon, Kim Easdon, Carlos Espinoza, Brian Esteve, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Valerie Fields, Rita Roedel Fish, Tim Fish, Amanda Ford, Amanda (I) Ford, Donna Fults, Sylvia Garvin, William Garvin, Daniel Geyer, Howard Gibson, Guadalupe Gonzalez, Amber Gregory, Amber (I) Gregory, Christopher Gregory, Heather M. Grimaldo, Heather (I) M. Grimaldo, Steven Grippo, Felicia Guelker, Felicia (I) Guelker, Tracy Gutierrez, Russell Hagdorn, Sean Halstead, John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr, Maureen Hansen, Jeremy Hardy, Tori Harris, Ward Harris, Laura L. Hawthorne, Laura (I) L. Hawthorne, Phillip Hawthorne, Wesley Hawthorne, Timothy Henricks, Jill Hessek, Richard Hessek, Edward Hines, Olga Hines, Cleveland Holloway, Cyndi Hybert, Michael Hybert, Gregory Johnson, Ester Kaminski, John Kaminski, Austin Keehn, Kelsey Keehn, Brody Keiley, Jered Keith, Sedrick Krause, Edward Krezinski, Gary Kuhfeld, Lawrence LaRocco, Jason Lederer, Oneil Levasseur, Sr., Sharon Livingston, Robert Arthur Long, Barbara Lorio, Rene Lorio, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Elaine Maesca, Brent Acuncius, Drew Albers, Stacy Albers, Allen Anderson, Vicky Anderson, Joshua Ashmore, Joshua (I) Ashmore, Debra Baker, Frank Barnwell, Carol Mager, John Mager, Tanya Lynn Marcus, Tanya (I) Lynn Marcus, Michael Maresca, Jennifer Mathis, Kelvin Mathis, Michael McCullough, Robin McGaughey, Mark McGee, Michael McNair, Wendy Mentzer, Michael Miler, Freda Miller, Thomas Miller, Anna Miranda, Jaime Miranda, Britany Mitchell, Britany (I) Mitchell, Ashley Mohawk, Alexander Monteith, Margaret Montoya, Duane Moody, Jennifer Moon, Sheila Mortrud, Tamra Mott, Aedan Moyer, Elric Moyer, Thomas Moyer, Frances Musser, Rachael Musser, Rachael (I) Musser, Richard Musser, Mark Nielsen, Mark (I) Nielsen, Corby Olivas, Valdemar Olvera, Harry Park, Rebecca Parsons, Angela Patterson, Marques Patterson, Kenneth Payne, Stephanie Payne, David Pepper, Brian Peterson, John Quinlivan, Loni Quinlivan, Sheena Remtema, Steven Remtema, Veronika Rhodes, Richard Robinson, Robert Rodriguez, Russell Rohrer, Kyle Sandy, Jordan Sanner, Marc Schips, Mary Schips, Stacy Sessom, Alfred Shea, Elaine Shea, Jennifer Shipp, Colleen Shroka, John Shroka, Joseph Sigala, Carol Smith, Kenneth Smith, Sharon Smith, Donald Spessard, Gary Stacy, Sarah Stacy, Kevin M. Stevenson, Kevin (I) M. Stevenson, Shannon Stevenson, Amber Stout, Anthony Stout, Vernon Stout, Brandon Strehl, Roger Trujillo, Ronald Turner, Jeremy Turney, Stella Vialpando, Bonnie Moon Walker, Vincent Walker, Kayla Ward, Paul Wiley, Christopher Wilson, Terah Wilson, Terah (I) Wilson, Katie Wisell, Nicole Yarber, Martin Yeager, Breanna Zimbelman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt
June 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Russell Hagdorn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Russell Hagdorn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sean Halstead(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sean Halstead(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maureen Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maureen Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremy Hardy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremy Hardy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tori Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tori Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ward Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Russell Hagdorn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Russell Hagdorn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sean Halstead(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sean Halstead(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maureen Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maureen Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Hardy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Hardy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tori Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tori Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ward Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ward Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura (I) L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura (I) L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wesley Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wesley Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Henricks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Henricks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman ad
June 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #6 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Joan Barnwell, Samantha Barnwell, Natalie Bazilewich, Natalie (I) Bazilewich, Genevieve Bell, Joseph Benfield, Phyllis Benfield, Jacob Benjamin, Gary Bingham, Lori Ann Bodkin, Lori (I) Ann Bodkin, Steven Boneta, Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer, Bradley Buetow, Jeffrey Canada, Jeffrey (I) Canada, Susanne Canada, Katherine Canepa, Jose Castaneda, Lori Castle, Kelsey Christy, Richard Clarose, Sarah Clarose, Christopher Clenney, Dale Coleman, Jamie Coleman, Laville Coles, Mark Comeau, Diane Cooper, Thomas Cornett, Travis Cronin, Diana Culver, Jeffery Curry, Michelle D. Davis, Michelle (I) D. Davis, Phyllis Davis, Darlene Dickerson, Shirley Dingerson, Thomas Dingerson, Melissa Downs, Kelly Easdon, Kim Easdon, Carlos Espinoza, Brian Esteve, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Valerie Fields, Rita Roedel Fish, Tim Fish, Amanda Ford, Amanda (I) Ford, Donna Fults, Sylvia Garvin, William Garvin, Daniel Geyer, Howard Gibson, Guadalupe Gonzalez, Amber Gregory, Amber (I) Gregory, Christopher Gregory, Heather M. Grimaldo, Heather (I) M. Grimaldo, Steven Grippo, Felicia Guelker, Felicia (I) Guelker, Tracy Gutierrez, Russell Hagdorn, Sean Halstead, John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr, Maureen Hansen, Jeremy Hardy, Tori Harris, Ward Harris, Laura L. Hawthorne, Laura (I) L. Hawthorne, Phillip Hawthorne, Wesley Hawthorne, Timothy Henricks, Jill Hessek, Richard Hessek, Edward Hines, Olga Hines, Cleveland Holloway, Cyndi Hybert, Michael Hybert, Gregory Johnson, Ester Kaminski, John Kaminski, Austin Keehn, Kelsey Keehn, Brody Keiley, Jered Keith, Sedrick Krause, Edward Krezinski, Gary Kuhfeld, Lawrence LaRocco, Jason Lederer, Oneil Levasseur, Sr., Sharon Livingston, Robert Arthur Long, Barbara Lorio, Rene Lorio, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Elaine Maesca, Brent Acuncius, Drew Albers, Stacy Albers, Allen Anderson, Vicky Anderson, Joshua Ashmore, Joshua (I) Ashmore, Debra Baker, Frank Barnwell, Carol Mager, John Mager, Tanya Lynn Marcus, Tanya (I) Lynn Marcus, Michael Maresca, Jennifer Mathis, Kelvin Mathis, Michael McCullough, Robin McGaughey, Mark McGee, Michael McNair, Wendy Mentzer, Michael Miler, Freda Miller, Thomas Miller, Anna Miranda, Jaime Miranda, Britany Mitchell, Britany (I) Mitchell, Ashley Mohawk, Alexander Monteith, Margaret Montoya, Duane Moody, Jennifer Moon, Sheila Mortrud, Tamra Mott, Aedan Moyer, Elric Moyer, Thomas Moyer, Frances Musser, Rachael Musser, Rachael (I) Musser, Richard Musser, Mark Nielsen, Mark (I) Nielsen, Corby Olivas, Valdemar Olvera, Harry Park, Rebecca Parsons, Angela Patterson, Marques Patterson, Kenneth Payne, Stephanie Payne, David Pepper, Brian Peterson, John Quinlivan, Loni Quinlivan, Sheena Remtema, Steven Remtema, Veronika Rhodes, Richard Robinson, Robert Rodriguez, Russell Rohrer, Kyle Sandy, Jordan Sanner, Marc Schips, Mary Schips, Stacy Sessom, Alfred Shea, Elaine Shea, Jennifer Shipp, Colleen Shroka, John Shroka, Joseph Sigala, Carol Smith, Kenneth Smith, Sharon Smith, Donald Spessard, Gary Stacy, Sarah Stacy, Kevin M. Stevenson, Kevin (I) M. Stevenson, Shannon Stevenson, Amber Stout, Anthony Stout, Vernon Stout, Brandon Strehl, Roger Trujillo, Ronald Turner, Jeremy Turney, Stella Vialpando, Bonnie Moon Walker, Vincent Walker, Kayla Ward, Paul Wiley, Christopher Wilson, Terah Wilson, Terah (I) Wilson, Katie Wisell, Nicole Yarber, Martin Yeager, Breanna Zimbelman. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalie (I) Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lori (I) Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey (I) Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle (I) D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda (I) Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber (I) Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather (I) M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felicia (I) Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Russell Hagdorn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Russell Hagdorn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sean Halstead(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sean Halstead(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maureen Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maureen Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeremy Hardy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeremy Hardy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tori Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tori Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ward Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ward Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura (I) L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura (I) L. Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wesley Hawthorne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wesley Hawthorne(pty:
May 16, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Patrick James Lanciotti. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Patrick J. Lanciotti. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6105840)Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brent Acuncius(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brent Acuncius(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Drew Albers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Drew Albers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Stacy Albers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Stacy Albers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Allen Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Allen Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Vicky Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Vicky Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joshua Ashmore(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joshua Ashmore(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party V. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party V. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Debra Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Debra Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Frank Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Frank Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joan Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Samantha Barnwell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Genevieve Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phyllis Benfield(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacob Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gary Bingham(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bradley Buetow(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffrey Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Susanne Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Katherine Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jose Castaneda(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lori Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kelsey Christy(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sarah Clarose(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Clenney(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dale Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jamie Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Laville Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark Comeau(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Diane Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Thomas Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Travis Cronin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Diana Culver(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffery Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle D. Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phyllis Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Darlene Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shirley Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Thomas Dingerson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Melissa Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kelly Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kim Easdon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carlos Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brian Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party K. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party K. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Valerie Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rita Roedel Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tim Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anna Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anna Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Donna Fults(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.1(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.1(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.2(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.2(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.3(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. G.3(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sylvia Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party William Garvin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Daniel Geyer(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Howard Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Guadalupe Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Heather M. Grimaldo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steven Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Felicia Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tracy Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Lo

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacy et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hybert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin McGaughey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Holloway
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lederer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mager
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Clarose
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Christy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedrick Krause
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jered Keith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Albers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dingerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Baker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Sessom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Grippo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Bodkin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Garvin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stacy
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Miranda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Hines
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Benjamin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hawthorne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valdemar Olvera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pepper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin (I) M. Stevenson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Guelker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Musser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Dickerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Clenney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronika Rhodes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Mortrud
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lorio
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Geyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Rohrer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Castle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Turney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M. Grimaldo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Stevenson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Moon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Monteith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Payne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence LaRocco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britany (I) Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gregory
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura L. Hawthorne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Quinlivan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Barnwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Canepa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Lorio
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Hagdorn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Mohawk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Moyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Musser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea (I) Macholz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Espinoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle D. Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Spessard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marques Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Maesca
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hessek
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Remtema
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Shea
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Payne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stacy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Gregory
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua (I) Ashmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Moon Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Shipp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Stout
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) D. Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Hansen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Benfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Shroka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Brunt-Schweitzer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya (I) Lynn Marcus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hines
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Roedel Fish
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Vialpando
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Curry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Dingerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tori Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Barnwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Moody
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bingham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Yarber
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Canada
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather (I) M. Grimaldo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laville Coles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Fields
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndi Hybert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura (I) L. Hawthorne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCullough
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brody Keiley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Halstead
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Schips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Kuhfeld
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hardy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Garvin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Buetow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Downs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Bazilewich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Hessek
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Turner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M. Stevenson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Ward
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Kaminski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Krezinski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael (I) Musser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey (I) Canada
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McNair
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wiley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneil Levasseur, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Mott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Sandy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Stout
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Ford
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nielsen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina (I) Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Lynn Marcus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mathis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Stout
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Cronin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Schips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Mentzer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Culver
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shroka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kaminski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aedan Moyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Boneta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Sanner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sigala
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia (I) Guelker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Esteve
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Henricks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Fish
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Acuncius
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elric Moyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Macholz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cornett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Maresca
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loni Quinlivan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Clarose
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori (I) Ann Bodkin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Wisell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ashmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Livingston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Easdon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terah Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Benfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Coleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Coleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Zimbelman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark (I) Nielsen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Hawthorne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corby Olivas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Mager
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Barnwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Musser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Castaneda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Keehn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie (I) Bazilewich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britany Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Park
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terah (I) Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arthur Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Randolph Hamiliton, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Fults
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McGee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Strehl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Canada
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Ford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Comeau
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch |