Sherban et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Bernal Squiers, Jeffrey Chadwick, Detective Michael Patterson, Thomas Strickland, Frederick Erwin, Mary Martinez, Joseph Fischer, Carmen Cass, Jacqueline Czosnyka, Rebecca Chavez, Arianna (I) Devires, Carolyn Mosley, Michael Grippo, Dennis Heitz, Amber Nicole Sherban, Drenda Dominguez-Horton, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Kenneth (I) Wilson, Kayla Farris, Donna Yanson, Mary Jordan, Melanie (I) Perez, Elizabeth Johnson, Barbara Schara, Roger Ronas, Levi Hearn, Tad Johnson, Billy Hammer, Vanessa McAlhaney, Heaven Rains, Abel Martinez, Felicia Booth-Voris, Brandon Koski, James Hall, Fawn Caffey, William Haupt, Howard Kyle, Marvlyn Rice, Jacob Wickham, Robert Jago, Misty Beemon, Kenneth Wilson, William (I) Sailor, Jr., Arnell Ferguson, Arianna Devires, Kylee Hawkins, Lori Longnecker, Billy Cotton, Michael Dougherty, Jay (I) Sanner, Brande (I) O'Brien, Melanie Perez, Jerry Zunich, David Stateler, Linda Wms-Blackwell, Tracy Budd, Michael Wolfe, Jr., Marilyn Bennett, Adan Mata, Michael Howells, Christine Cays, Lee Mcdevitt, Gina Flickinger, Jay Sanner, Billie Hayhurst, Marilyn Watson, Mary Fletcher, Wilbert Rivers, Dawn Hrbac, Frank Apodaca, Brittany White, Devon Stevenson, Brenda Aldava, Keisha Hollins, Gabriele Walker, Justin Campbell, Linda Blackwell, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Jose Cerda, Patricia Ealey, Nancy Markes, Tracey Esteve, Randem Beckner, Staci Bills, Brande O'brien, Margaret Greenfield, Stephanie Tinsley, Wilhelmine Kyle, Sonya Jones, Sarah (I) Cerda, Randall Hrabczuk, Brenda Blvetta, Aimee Carroll, Otis Love, John Lunger, Richard Hearn, Warren Cays, Sarah Cerda, William Ellenburg, Jr., Theresa Robinson, Rebecca Cooper, Irina Thomas, Christiane Morrow, Amber Dore, Lucy Wilson, Christopher McAlhaney, James Wadkowski, Joan Wall, Donelle Zinn, Marita Sobotka, Catherine Hawkins, Mark Squire, Lavon Coleman, James Clark, Sami Griffin, Elizabeth (I) Barrientes, Jennifer Galdean, Denise Chapman, James Kota, Kimberlee Lien, Marjorie Lopez, Amanda Erman, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Thaddus Montgomery, Laura Schwab, Choral Yanson, James Chapman, Karen Stateler, Ian Wilson, Patricia Gagnon, Frederick Johnson, Frances Vigil, Donald Walker, Victor Wright, Reann Berumen, David Schara, Robert Linebaugh, Margaret King, Megan Madden, Megan (I) Madden, Judy Lyons, Bernice Erwin, Marvin Brady, Billy Bates, Wanda Jones, Kamas De Workman, James Darnley, Chris Rodgers, Elmer Garcia, Jean Clark, Mary Niemetz, Emily Hancock, Amanda (I) Erman, William Sailor, Jr., Samuel (I) Fortune, Edward Fink, Kenneth Chavez, Wendy Rash, Laura Jacobs, Charlotte Breckenridge, Teresa Sawyer, Kristen Port, Samuel Fortune, Harry Gutierres, Viola Bennett, Veronica Alvarado, Victoria Quintana, Betty Ochle, Tracy Etheridge, Randolph Jones, Eileen Avilez, Kory Lankford, Patrick Vigil, Daniel Bisping, Barbara Lemay, Karl Voehl, Elizabeth Barrientes, Andrea Sanders, Michelle Norton, Rachel Petersen, Amanda Bainbridge, Ruby Etheridge, Josephine Edmundson, Melinda Fischer, Nicole Anderson, Scott Koenig, Debra Marie Williams, Carmen Avila, Alicia Ronas, Bernice Dilldine and Dawn (I) Hrbac
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde PLC, Inc., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., National Foam Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Chemguard and Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03408
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01270, Sherban et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03408-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01270. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01279 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Billy Bates, Randem Beckner, Misty Beemon, Marilyn Bennett, Viola Bennett, Reann Berumen, Staci Bills, Daniel Bisping, Linda Blackwell, Brenda Blvetta, Felicia Booth-Voris, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Marvin Brady, Charlotte Breckenridge, Tracy Budd, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Aimee Carroll, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Jeffrey Chadwick, Denise Chapman, James Chapman, Kenneth Chavez, Rebecca Chavez, James Clark, Jean Clark, Lavon Coleman, Rebecca Cooper, Billy Cotton, Jacqueline Czosnyka, James Darnley, Kamas De Workman, Arianna Devires, Arianna (I) Devires, Bernice Dilldine, Drenda Dominguez-Horton, Amber Dore, Michael Dougherty, Patricia Ealey, Josephine Edmundson, William Ellenburg, Jr, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Bernice Erwin, Frederick Erwin, Tracey Esteve, Ruby Etheridge, Tracy Etheridge, Kayla Farris, Arnell Ferguson, Edward Fink, Joseph Fischer, Melinda Fischer, Mary Fletcher, Gina Flickinger, Samuel Fortune, Samuel (I) Fortune, Patricia Gagnon, Jennifer Galdean, Elmer Garcia, Margaret Greenfield, Sami Griffin, Michael Grippo, Harry Gutierres, James Hall, Billy Hammer, Emily Hancock, William Haupt, Catherine Hawkins, Kylee Hawkins, Billie Hayhurst, Levi Hearn, Richard Hearn, Dennis Heitz, Keisha Hollins, Michael Howells, Randall Hrabczuk, Dawn Hrbac, Dawn (I) Hrbac, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Laura Jacobs, Robert Jago, Elizabeth Johnson, Frederick Johnson, Tad Johnson, Randolph Jones, Sonya Jones, Wanda Jones, Mary Jordan, Margaret King, Scott Koenig, Brandon Koski, James Kota, Howard Kyle, Wilhelmine Kyle, Kory Lankford, Barbara Lemay, Kimberlee Lien, Robert Linebaugh, Lori Longnecker, Marjorie Lopez, Otis Love, John Lunger, Judy Lyons, Megan Madden, Megan (I) Madden, Nancy Markes, Abel Martinez, Mary Martinez, Adan Mata, Brenda Aldava, Veronica Alvarado, Nicole Anderson, Frank Apodaca, Carmen Avila, Eileen Avilez, Amanda Bainbridge, Elizabeth Barrientes, Elizabeth (I) Barrientes, Christopher Mcalhaney, Vanessa Mcalhaney, Lee Mcdevitt, Thaddus Montgomery, Christiane Morrow, Carolyn Mosley, Mary Niemetz, Michelle Norton, Brande O'Brien, Brande (I) O'Brien, Betty Ochle, Michael Patterson, Melanie Perez, Melanie (I) Perez, Rachel Petersen, Kristen Port, Victoria Quintana, Heaven Rains, Wendy Rash, Marvlyn Rice, Wilbert Rivers, Theresa Robinson, Chris Rodgers, Alicia Ronas, Roger Ronas, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Andrea Sanders, Jay Sanner, Jay (I) Sanner, Teresa Sawyer, Barbara Schara, David Schara, Laura Schwab, Amber Nicole Sherban, Marita Sobotka, Bernal Squiers, Mark Squire, David Stateler, Karen Stateler, Devon Stevenson, Thomas Strickland, Irina Thomas, Stephanie Tinsley, Frances Vigil, Patrick Vigil, Karl Voehl, James Wadkowski, Donald Walker, Gabriele Walker, Joan Wall, Marilyn Watson, Brittany White, Jacob Wickham, Debra Marie Williams, Ian Wilson, Kenneth Wilson, Kenneth (I) Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Linda Wms-Blackwell, Michael Wolfe, Jr, Victor Wright, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Choral Yanson, Donna Yanson, Donelle Zinn, Jerry Zunich. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Billy Bates, Randem Beckner, Misty Beemon, Marilyn Bennett, Viola Bennett, Reann Berumen, Staci Bills, Daniel Bisping, Linda Blackwell, Brenda Blvetta, Felicia Booth-Voris, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Marvin Brady, Charlotte Breckenridge, Tracy Budd, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Aimee Carroll, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Jeffrey Chadwick, Denise Chapman, James Chapman, Kenneth Chavez, Rebecca Chavez, James Clark, Jean Clark, Lavon Coleman, Rebecca Cooper, Billy Cotton, Jacqueline Czosnyka, James Darnley, Kamas De Workman, Arianna Devires, Arianna (I) Devires, Bernice Dilldine, Drenda Dominguez-Horton, Amber Dore, Michael Dougherty, Patricia Ealey, Josephine Edmundson, William Ellenburg, Jr, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Bernice Erwin, Frederick Erwin, Tracey Esteve, Ruby Etheridge, Tracy Etheridge, Kayla Farris, Arnell Ferguson, Edward Fink, Joseph Fischer, Melinda Fischer, Mary Fletcher, Gina Flickinger, Samuel Fortune, Samuel (I) Fortune, Patricia Gagnon, Jennifer Galdean, Elmer Garcia, Margaret Greenfield, Sami Griffin, Michael Grippo, Harry Gutierres, James Hall, Billy Hammer, Emily Hancock, William Haupt, Catherine Hawkins, Kylee Hawkins, Billie Hayhurst, Levi Hearn, Richard Hearn, Dennis Heitz, Keisha Hollins, Michael Howells, Randall Hrabczuk, Dawn Hrbac, Dawn (I) Hrbac, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Laura Jacobs, Robert Jago, Elizabeth Johnson, Frederick Johnson, Tad Johnson, Randolph Jones, Sonya Jones, Wanda Jones, Mary Jordan, Margaret King, Scott Koenig, Brandon Koski, James Kota, Howard Kyle, Wilhelmine Kyle, Kory Lankford, Barbara Lemay, Kimberlee Lien, Robert Linebaugh, Lori Longnecker, Marjorie Lopez, Otis Love, John Lunger, Judy Lyons, Megan Madden, Megan (I) Madden, Nancy Markes, Abel Martinez, Mary Martinez, Adan Mata, Brenda Aldava, Veronica Alvarado, Nicole Anderson, Frank Apodaca, Carmen Avila, Eileen Avilez, Amanda Bainbridge, Elizabeth Barrientes, Elizabeth (I) Barrientes, Christopher Mcalhaney, Vanessa Mcalhaney, Lee Mcdevitt, Thaddus Montgomery, Christiane Morrow, Carolyn Mosley, Mary Niemetz, Michelle Norton, Brande O'Brien, Brande (I) O'Brien, Betty Ochle, Michael Patterson, Melanie Perez, Melanie (I) Perez, Rachel Petersen, Kristen Port, Victoria Quintana, Heaven Rains, Wendy Rash, Marvlyn Rice, Wilbert Rivers, Theresa Robinson, Chris Rodgers, Alicia Ronas, Roger Ronas, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Andrea Sanders, Jay Sanner, Jay (I) Sanner, Teresa Sawyer, Barbara Schara, David Schara, Laura Schwab, Amber Nicole Sherban, Marita Sobotka, Bernal Squiers, Mark Squire, David Stateler, Karen Stateler, Devon Stevenson, Thomas Strickland, Irina Thomas, Stephanie Tinsley, Frances Vigil, Patrick Vigil, Karl Voehl, James Wadkowski, Donald Walker, Gabriele Walker, Joan Wall, Marilyn Watson, Brittany White, Jacob Wickham, Debra Marie Williams, Ian Wilson, Kenneth Wilson, Kenneth (I) Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Linda Wms-Blackwell, Michael Wolfe, Jr, Victor Wright, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Choral Yanson, Donna Yanson, Donelle Zinn, Jerry Zunich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michae
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cathe
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Catherine Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Catherine Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kylee Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kylee Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billie Hayhurst(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billie Hayhurst(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Levi Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Levi Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman
June 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Billy Bates, Randem Beckner, Misty Beemon, Marilyn Bennett, Viola Bennett, Reann Berumen, Staci Bills, Daniel Bisping, Linda Blackwell, Brenda Blvetta, Felicia Booth-Voris, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Marvin Brady, Charlotte Breckenridge, Tracy Budd, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Aimee Carroll, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Jeffrey Chadwick, Denise Chapman, James Chapman, Kenneth Chavez, Rebecca Chavez, James Clark, Jean Clark, Lavon Coleman, Rebecca Cooper, Billy Cotton, Jacqueline Czosnyka, James Darnley, Kamas De Workman, Arianna Devires, Arianna (I) Devires, Bernice Dilldine, Drenda Dominguez-Horton, Amber Dore, Michael Dougherty, Patricia Ealey, Josephine Edmundson, William Ellenburg, Jr, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Bernice Erwin, Frederick Erwin, Tracey Esteve, Ruby Etheridge, Tracy Etheridge, Kayla Farris, Arnell Ferguson, Edward Fink, Joseph Fischer, Melinda Fischer, Mary Fletcher, Gina Flickinger, Samuel Fortune, Samuel (I) Fortune, Patricia Gagnon, Jennifer Galdean, Elmer Garcia, Margaret Greenfield, Sami Griffin, Michael Grippo, Harry Gutierres, James Hall, Billy Hammer, Emily Hancock, William Haupt, Catherine Hawkins, Kylee Hawkins, Billie Hayhurst, Levi Hearn, Richard Hearn, Dennis Heitz, Keisha Hollins, Michael Howells, Randall Hrabczuk, Dawn Hrbac, Dawn (I) Hrbac, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Laura Jacobs, Robert Jago, Elizabeth Johnson, Frederick Johnson, Tad Johnson, Randolph Jones, Sonya Jones, Wanda Jones, Mary Jordan, Margaret King, Scott Koenig, Brandon Koski, James Kota, Howard Kyle, Wilhelmine Kyle, Kory Lankford, Barbara Lemay, Kimberlee Lien, Robert Linebaugh, Lori Longnecker, Marjorie Lopez, Otis Love, John Lunger, Judy Lyons, Megan Madden, Megan (I) Madden, Nancy Markes, Abel Martinez, Mary Martinez, Adan Mata, Brenda Aldava, Veronica Alvarado, Nicole Anderson, Frank Apodaca, Carmen Avila, Eileen Avilez, Amanda Bainbridge, Elizabeth Barrientes, Elizabeth (I) Barrientes, Christopher Mcalhaney, Vanessa Mcalhaney, Lee Mcdevitt, Thaddus Montgomery, Christiane Morrow, Carolyn Mosley, Mary Niemetz, Michelle Norton, Brande O'Brien, Brande (I) O'Brien, Betty Ochle, Michael Patterson, Melanie Perez, Melanie (I) Perez, Rachel Petersen, Kristen Port, Victoria Quintana, Heaven Rains, Wendy Rash, Marvlyn Rice, Wilbert Rivers, Theresa Robinson, Chris Rodgers, Alicia Ronas, Roger Ronas, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Andrea Sanders, Jay Sanner, Jay (I) Sanner, Teresa Sawyer, Barbara Schara, David Schara, Laura Schwab, Amber Nicole Sherban, Marita Sobotka, Bernal Squiers, Mark Squire, David Stateler, Karen Stateler, Devon Stevenson, Thomas Strickland, Irina Thomas, Stephanie Tinsley, Frances Vigil, Patrick Vigil, Karl Voehl, James Wadkowski, Donald Walker, Gabriele Walker, Joan Wall, Marilyn Watson, Brittany White, Jacob Wickham, Debra Marie Williams, Ian Wilson, Kenneth Wilson, Kenneth (I) Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Linda Wms-Blackwell, Michael Wolfe, Jr, Victor Wright, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Choral Yanson, Donna Yanson, Donelle Zinn, Jerry Zunich. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Blackwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arianna (I) Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Ellenburg, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel (I) Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaret Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lancio
May 24, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Paul J. Napoli. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6120767)Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Aldava(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Aldava(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Veronica Alvarado(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Veronica Alvarado(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nicole Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nicole Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Apodaca(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Apodaca(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Avila(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Avila(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. B 2.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. B 2.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party R. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party R. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. B.1.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. B.1.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Staci Bills(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Blvetta (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marvin Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charlotte Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party L. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party L. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party T. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party T. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. C.1.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. C.1.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. C.2.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. C.2.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lavon Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party B. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party B. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Darnley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arianna Devires(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernice Dilldine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Drenda Dominguez-Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Dougherty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Josephine Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernice Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frederick Erwin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ruby Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Etheridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party B. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party B. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party C. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party C. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party K. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party K. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arnell Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samuel Fortune(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Galdean(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elmer Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Pa

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherban et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernal Squiers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Chadwick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detective Michael Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Strickland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Erwin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Cass
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Czosnyka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianna (I) Devires
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mosley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grippo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Heitz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Nicole Sherban
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drenda Dominguez-Horton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Iredale-Boyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth (I) Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Farris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Yanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jordan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie (I) Perez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Schara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Ronas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Hearn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tad Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Hammer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa McAlhaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heaven Rains
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Booth-Voris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Koski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fawn Caffey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Haupt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Kyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvlyn Rice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Beemon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William (I) Sailor, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnell Ferguson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianna Devires
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylee Hawkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Longnecker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Cotton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dougherty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay (I) Sanner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brande (I) O'Brien
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Perez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Zunich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stateler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wms-Blackwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Budd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wolfe, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Bennett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Mata
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Cays
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Mcdevitt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Flickinger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Sanner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Hayhurst
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Watson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Fletcher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Rivers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Hrbac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Apodaca
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Stevenson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Aldava
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Hollins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriele Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Blackwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Wright-Tafoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cerda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ealey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Markes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Esteve
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randem Beckner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Bills
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brande O'brien
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Greenfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Tinsley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmine Kyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah (I) Cerda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Hrabczuk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Blvetta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Carroll
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Love
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lunger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hearn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Cays
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Cerda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ellenburg, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiane Morrow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Dore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McAlhaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wadkowski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Wall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donelle Zinn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marita Sobotka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Hawkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Squire
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavon Coleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Griffin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth (I) Barrientes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Galdean
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Chapman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kota
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Lien
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Erman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddus Montgomery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Schwab
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choral Yanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chapman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Stateler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gagnon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reann Berumen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Linebaugh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret King
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Madden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan (I) Madden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Lyons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Erwin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Brady
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Bates
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamas De Workman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Darnley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Rodgers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Niemetz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Hancock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Erman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sailor, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel (I) Fortune
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fink
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rash
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Jacobs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Breckenridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Sawyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Port
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Fortune
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Gutierres
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Bennett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Alvarado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Quintana
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ochle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Etheridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Avilez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Lankford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bisping
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lemay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Voehl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barrientes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Sanders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Norton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Petersen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bainbridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Etheridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Edmundson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Fischer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Koenig
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Marie Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Avila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Ronas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Dilldine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn (I) Hrbac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance