Hall et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan (I) Hancock, Terry Schramek, Shaun Lackovic, Jonathan (I) Wickham, Megan Scott, Christine Smith, Tayetaniel Hall, Vivian Bryant, Michael Mowery, Linda Martinez, Naomi Wickham, Linda Levings, Douglas Tait, Latisha Gutierrez, Bonnie Mcguigan, Nadine Germaine Jackson, Micah Bregard, Ernest Meno, Julia Maes, Nayethaniel Hall, Nicole Frahm, Rusty (I) Bregard, Jan Patterson, Kayla Farris, Amanda (I) Marucci, James Medina, Tocarra Laster, Albert Caldera, June Miller, Joann Baker, Jason Garcia, Lauren Barnette, Silverio Gonzalez, Robert Cuppy, Jeanette Millar, Roi Moehring, Jenna Tait, Richard Arnold, Michael (I) Howells, Mary Hartley, Michael Warriax, Edna Daniels, Debbie Otto, Joyce Covington, Kristina Heim, Cellie Cuppy, Brittny Vasquez, Maria (I) Brambila, Raymondo Torres, Monika Torrez, Amanda Marucci, Daniel Porras, Josh Brown, Michael Ochoa, Michael Pacheco, Timothy Martinez, Joyce (I) Covington, Kathleen Baker, Brenda Hicks-Rimel, Trevor Gordon, Roberto Gallegos, Amy Goergen, Michael Miller, Xuan Lepp, Anthony Holt, Colin Vanhorne, Sheyenne Gaster, Daniel Lopez, Daniela Stoyanova, Jean Hill, Katrina Greenfield, Brandon Valdez, Lenora Rowley, Bradley Huggins, Clifton Bishop, Stephanie Palacios, Charles Collick, Anthony Rowley, Richard Brautigan, Jason Canitz, Willard Pace, Tito Haley, Tamela Duran, Kenneth Smith, Gary Miller, Kenneth Buterbaugh, Deborah James, Emily Vanley, Jonathan Largent, Amy Berwick, Faith (I) Puglisi, Domanick (I) Castellanos, Linda (I) Martinez, Arianna Devries, Jenna (I) Tait, Aecha Devereaux, Amber L Borata, Jennifer Keach, Jesus Alvarez, Jesse Cotton, Domanick Castellanos, Debra Long, Silvia Marquez, Mason Collier, Desiree Lorenzana, Dante Alvarez, Skyler Digirolamo, Rusty Bregard, Paul Pauley, Kelsea Schnieders, Adelaida Cardenas, Karla Pace, Mark Clements, Teresa Pethtel, Christina Hilleren, Adrian Giron, Janice Pratt, Adelle Rank, Icela Howard, Eugenio Espinoza, Suzanne Arnold, Nikolay Ginkv, Anthony Edmonds, Alice Bailey, Joseph Madden, Daylon Cortez, Regina Gunsenhouser, Stephanie Purye, Rachel Magariner, Orrette Shelton, Jonathan Wickham, Conrad Montoya, David Hart, Kenneth Fish, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Cameron Bailey, Amy (I) Goergen, John Detemple, Michael Howells, Dominic Howard, Faith Puglisi, Wilalak Warriax, Ashleye Damuth, Cindy Shelstad, Paul Gregor, Ella Galbearth, Joseph Huggins, Michael Strehl, Julieann Gardner, Heidy Montoya, Eric Johnson, Johnathan Hancock, Michael Tracy, Rachele Rank, Anthony (I) Edmonds, Malik Webb, Fahra Bowman, Adam Ross, Pauline Long, Candace Sargent, Silvia (I) Marquez, Daniel Desantos, Maria Brambila, Monty Wilson, Chad Bishop, Rose Gonzalez, Justin Gabbard, Joseph (I) Huggins, Kayla (I) Farris, Dena Hoder, Christine Collick, Naomi (I) Wickham, Rusty (I) Huggins, Aziz Bowman, Amber (I) L. Borata, Alice Orcutt, Kerry Duran, Peggy Martin, Emilian Wojcik, Marie Levasseur, Nadine (I) Germaine Jackson, Amanda Bainbridge, Janice Williams, Deborah Susan Bevington, Deborah (I) Susan Bevington, Ja'shon Hoder, Regina Mcnutt, Phastima Laird, Erin Rambeau, Riddlon Durazo, Merrilee Mccolgan and Conrad (I) Montoya
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, 3M Company, The, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03414
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01298, Hall et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03414-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01298. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01298 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Kathleen Baker, Lauren Barnette, Amy Berwick, Deborah Susan Bevington, Deborah (I) Susan Bevington, Chad Bishop, Clifton Bishop, Amber L Borata, Amber (I) L. Borata, Aziz Bowman, Fahra Bowman, Maria Brambila, Maria (I) Brambila, Richard Brautigan, Micah Bregard, Rusty Bregard, Rusty (I) Bregard, Josh Brown, Vivian Bryant, Kenneth Buterbaugh, Albert Caldera, Jason Canitz, Adelaida Cardenas, Domanick Castellanos, Domanick (I) Castellanos, Mark Clements, Charles Collick, Christine Collick, Mason Collier, Daylon Cortez, Jesse Cotton, Joyce Covington, Joyce (I) Covington, Cellie Cuppy, Robert Cuppy, Ashleye Damuth, Edna Daniels, Daniel Desantos, John Detemple, Aecha Devereaux, Arianna Devries, Skyler Digirolamo, Kerry Duran, Tamela Duran, Riddlon Durazo, Anthony Edmonds, Anthony (I) Edmonds, Eugenio Espinoza, Kayla Farris, Kayla (I) Farris, Kenneth Fish, Nicole Frahm, Justin Gabbard, Ella Galbearth, Roberto Gallegos, Jason Garcia, Julieann Gardner, Sheyenne Gaster, Nadine Germaine Jackson, Nikolay Ginkv, Adrian Giron, Amy Goergen, Amy (I) Goergen, Rose Gonzalez, Silverio Gonzalez, Trevor Gordon, Katrina Greenfield, Paul Gregor, Regina Gunsenhouser, Latisha Gutierrez, Tito Haley, Nayethaniel Hall, Tayetaniel Hall, Johnathan Hancock, Johnathan (I) Hancock, David Hart, Mary Hartley, Kristina Heim, Brenda Hicks-Rimel, Jean Hill, Christina Hilleren, Dena Hoder, Ja'shon Hoder, Anthony Holt, Dominic Howard, Icela Howard, Michael Howells, Michael (I) Howells, Bradley Huggins, Joseph Huggins, Joseph (I) Huggins, Rusty (I) Huggins, Nadine (I) Germaine Jackson, Deborah James, Eric Johnson, Jennifer Keach, Shaun Lackovic, Phastima Laird, Jonathan Largent, Tocarra Laster, Xuan Lepp, Marie Levasseur, Linda Levings, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Daniel Lopez, Desiree Lorenzana, Joseph Madden, Julia Maes, Rachel Magariner, Silvia Marquez, Silvia (I) Marquez, Peggy Martin, Linda Martinez, Linda (I) Martinez, Dante Alvarez, Jesus Alvarez, Richard Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Alice Bailey, Cameron Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Joann Baker, Timothy Martinez, Amanda Marucci, Amanda (I) Marucci, Merrilee Mccolgan, Bonnie Mcguigan, Regina Mcnutt, James Medina, Ernest Meno, Jeanette Millar, Gary Miller, June Miller, Michael Miller, Roi Moehring, Conrad Montoya, Conrad (I) Montoya, Heidy Montoya, Michael Mowery, Michael Ochoa, Alice Orcutt, Debbie Otto, Karla Pace, Willard Pace, Michael Pacheco, Stephanie Palacios, Jan Patterson, Paul Pauley, Teresa Pethtel, Daniel Porras, Janice Pratt, Faith Puglisi, Faith (I) Puglisi, Stephanie Purye, Erin Rambeau, Adelle Rank, Rachele Rank, Adam Ross, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Candace Sargent, Kelsea Schnieders, Terry Schramek, Megan Scott, Cindy Shelstad, Orrette Shelton, Christine Smith, Kenneth Smith, Daniela Stoyanova, Michael Strehl, Douglas Tait, Jenna Tait, Jenna (I) Tait, Raymondo Torres, Monika Torrez, Michael Tracy, Brandon Valdez, Colin Vanhorne, Emily Vanley, Brittny Vasquez, Michael Warriax, Wilalak Warriax, Malik Webb, Jonathan Wickham, Jonathan (I) Wickham, Naomi Wickham, Naomi (I) Wickham, Janice Williams, Monty Wilson, Emilian Wojcik. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Kathleen Baker, Lauren Barnette, Amy Berwick, Deborah Susan Bevington, Deborah (I) Susan Bevington, Chad Bishop, Clifton Bishop, Amber L Borata, Amber (I) L. Borata, Aziz Bowman, Fahra Bowman, Maria Brambila, Maria (I) Brambila, Richard Brautigan, Micah Bregard, Rusty Bregard, Rusty (I) Bregard, Josh Brown, Vivian Bryant, Kenneth Buterbaugh, Albert Caldera, Jason Canitz, Adelaida Cardenas, Domanick Castellanos, Domanick (I) Castellanos, Mark Clements, Charles Collick, Christine Collick, Mason Collier, Daylon Cortez, Jesse Cotton, Joyce Covington, Joyce (I) Covington, Cellie Cuppy, Robert Cuppy, Ashleye Damuth, Edna Daniels, Daniel Desantos, John Detemple, Aecha Devereaux, Arianna Devries, Skyler Digirolamo, Kerry Duran, Tamela Duran, Riddlon Durazo, Anthony Edmonds, Anthony (I) Edmonds, Eugenio Espinoza, Kayla Farris, Kayla (I) Farris, Kenneth Fish, Nicole Frahm, Justin Gabbard, Ella Galbearth, Roberto Gallegos, Jason Garcia, Julieann Gardner, Sheyenne Gaster, Nadine Germaine Jackson, Nikolay Ginkv, Adrian Giron, Amy Goergen, Amy (I) Goergen, Rose Gonzalez, Silverio Gonzalez, Trevor Gordon, Katrina Greenfield, Paul Gregor, Regina Gunsenhouser, Latisha Gutierrez, Tito Haley, Nayethaniel Hall, Tayetaniel Hall, Johnathan Hancock, Johnathan (I) Hancock, David Hart, Mary Hartley, Kristina Heim, Brenda Hicks-Rimel, Jean Hill, Christina Hilleren, Dena Hoder, Ja'shon Hoder, Anthony Holt, Dominic Howard, Icela Howard, Michael Howells, Michael (I) Howells, Bradley Huggins, Joseph Huggins, Joseph (I) Huggins, Rusty (I) Huggins, Nadine (I) Germaine Jackson, Deborah James, Eric Johnson, Jennifer Keach, Shaun Lackovic, Phastima Laird, Jonathan Largent, Tocarra Laster, Xuan Lepp, Marie Levasseur, Linda Levings, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Daniel Lopez, Desiree Lorenzana, Joseph Madden, Julia Maes, Rachel Magariner, Silvia Marquez, Silvia (I) Marquez, Peggy Martin, Linda Martinez, Linda (I) Martinez, Dante Alvarez, Jesus Alvarez, Richard Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Alice Bailey, Cameron Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Joann Baker, Timothy Martinez, Amanda Marucci, Amanda (I) Marucci, Merrilee Mccolgan, Bonnie Mcguigan, Regina Mcnutt, James Medina, Ernest Meno, Jeanette Millar, Gary Miller, June Miller, Michael Miller, Roi Moehring, Conrad Montoya, Conrad (I) Montoya, Heidy Montoya, Michael Mowery, Michael Ochoa, Alice Orcutt, Debbie Otto, Karla Pace, Willard Pace, Michael Pacheco, Stephanie Palacios, Jan Patterson, Paul Pauley, Teresa Pethtel, Daniel Porras, Janice Pratt, Faith Puglisi, Faith (I) Puglisi, Stephanie Purye, Erin Rambeau, Adelle Rank, Rachele Rank, Adam Ross, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Candace Sargent, Kelsea Schnieders, Terry Schramek, Megan Scott, Cindy Shelstad, Orrette Shelton, Christine Smith, Kenneth Smith, Daniela Stoyanova, Michael Strehl, Douglas Tait, Jenna Tait, Jenna (I) Tait, Raymondo Torres, Monika Torrez, Michael Tracy, Brandon Valdez, Colin Vanhorne, Emily Vanley, Brittny Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDiv
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Trevor Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Trevor Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katrina Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katrina Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Gregor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Gregor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Gunsenhouser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Gunsenhouser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latisha Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latisha Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tito Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tito Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nayethaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nayethaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tayetaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt adde
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trevor Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trevor Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katrina Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katrina Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Gregor(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Gregor(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Gunsenhouser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Gunsenhouser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latisha Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latisha Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tito Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tito Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nayethaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nayethaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tayetaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tayetaniel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnathan Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnathan Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnathan (I) Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnathan (I) Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Hart(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Hart(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristina Heim(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristina Heim(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Hicks-
June 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kathleen Baker, Lauren Barnette, Amy Berwick, Deborah Susan Bevington, Deborah (I) Susan Bevington, Chad Bishop, Clifton Bishop, Amber L Borata, Amber (I) L. Borata, Aziz Bowman, Fahra Bowman, Maria Brambila, Maria (I) Brambila, Richard Brautigan, Micah Bregard, Rusty Bregard, Rusty (I) Bregard, Josh Brown, Vivian Bryant, Kenneth Buterbaugh, Albert Caldera, Jason Canitz, Adelaida Cardenas, Domanick Castellanos, Domanick (I) Castellanos, Mark Clements, Charles Collick, Christine Collick, Mason Collier, Daylon Cortez, Jesse Cotton, Joyce Covington, Joyce (I) Covington, Cellie Cuppy, Robert Cuppy, Ashleye Damuth, Edna Daniels, Daniel Desantos, John Detemple, Aecha Devereaux, Arianna Devries, Skyler Digirolamo, Kerry Duran, Tamela Duran, Riddlon Durazo, Anthony Edmonds, Anthony (I) Edmonds, Eugenio Espinoza, Kayla Farris, Kayla (I) Farris, Kenneth Fish, Nicole Frahm, Justin Gabbard, Ella Galbearth, Roberto Gallegos, Jason Garcia, Julieann Gardner, Sheyenne Gaster, Nadine Germaine Jackson, Nikolay Ginkv, Adrian Giron, Amy Goergen, Amy (I) Goergen, Rose Gonzalez, Silverio Gonzalez, Trevor Gordon, Katrina Greenfield, Paul Gregor, Regina Gunsenhouser, Latisha Gutierrez, Tito Haley, Nayethaniel Hall, Tayetaniel Hall, Johnathan Hancock, Johnathan (I) Hancock, David Hart, Mary Hartley, Kristina Heim, Brenda Hicks-Rimel, Jean Hill, Christina Hilleren, Dena Hoder, Ja'shon Hoder, Anthony Holt, Dominic Howard, Icela Howard, Michael Howells, Michael (I) Howells, Bradley Huggins, Joseph Huggins, Joseph (I) Huggins, Rusty (I) Huggins, Nadine (I) Germaine Jackson, Deborah James, Eric Johnson, Jennifer Keach, Shaun Lackovic, Phastima Laird, Jonathan Largent, Tocarra Laster, Xuan Lepp, Marie Levasseur, Linda Levings, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Daniel Lopez, Desiree Lorenzana, Joseph Madden, Julia Maes, Rachel Magariner, Silvia Marquez, Silvia (I) Marquez, Peggy Martin, Linda Martinez, Linda (I) Martinez, Dante Alvarez, Jesus Alvarez, Richard Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Alice Bailey, Cameron Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Joann Baker, Timothy Martinez, Amanda Marucci, Amanda (I) Marucci, Merrilee Mccolgan, Bonnie Mcguigan, Regina Mcnutt, James Medina, Ernest Meno, Jeanette Millar, Gary Miller, June Miller, Michael Miller, Roi Moehring, Conrad Montoya, Conrad (I) Montoya, Heidy Montoya, Michael Mowery, Michael Ochoa, Alice Orcutt, Debbie Otto, Karla Pace, Willard Pace, Michael Pacheco, Stephanie Palacios, Jan Patterson, Paul Pauley, Teresa Pethtel, Daniel Porras, Janice Pratt, Faith Puglisi, Faith (I) Puglisi, Stephanie Purye, Erin Rambeau, Adelle Rank, Rachele Rank, Adam Ross, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Candace Sargent, Kelsea Schnieders, Terry Schramek, Megan Scott, Cindy Shelstad, Orrette Shelton, Christine Smith, Kenneth Smith, Daniela Stoyanova, Michael Strehl, Douglas Tait, Jenna Tait, Jenna (I) Tait, Raymondo Torres, Monika Torrez, Michael Tracy, Brandon Valdez, Colin Vanhorne, Emily Vanley, Brittny Vasquez, Michael Warriax, Wilalak Warriax, Malik Webb, Jonathan Wickham, Jonathan (I) Wickham, Naomi Wickham, Naomi (I) Wickham, Janice Williams, Monty Wilson, Emilian Wojcik. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah (I) Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber (I) L. Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria (I) Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty (I) Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Albert Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Domanick (I) Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joyce (I) Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aecha Devereaux(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony (I) Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla (I) Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy (I) Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Silverio Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Trevor Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Trevor Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katrina Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katrina Greenfield(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Gregor(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Gregor(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Gunsenhouser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to
May 25, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Louise Rita Caro. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6123717)Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dante Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dante Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jesus Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jesus Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Suzanne Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Suzanne Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party H. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party H. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alice Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alice Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cameron Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cameron Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joann Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joann Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kathleen Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lauren Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amy Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Deborah Susan Bevington(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chad Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Clifton Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber L Borata(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aziz Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Fahra Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Maria Brambila(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Brautigan(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Micah Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rusty Bregard(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Josh Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Vivian Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kenneth Buterbaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party D. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party D. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party N. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party N. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party T. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party T. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Z. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Z. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jason Canitz(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adelaida Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Domanick Castellanos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charles Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christine Collick(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mason Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Daylon Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jesse Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joyce Covington(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cellie Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Cuppy(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ashleye Damuth(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Edna Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Daniel Desantos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Detemple(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Arianna Devries(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Skyler Digirolamo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kerry Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tamela Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Riddlon Durazo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. E.1(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. E.1(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. E.2.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. E.2.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anthony Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Eugenio Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party E. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party E. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party V. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party V. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Z. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Z. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nicole Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Justin Gabbard(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ella Galbearth(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Roberto Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jason Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Julieann Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sheyenne Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nadine Germaine Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nikolay Ginkv(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adrian Giron(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to par

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan (I) Hancock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Schramek
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Lackovic
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan (I) Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayetaniel Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Bryant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mowery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Levings
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Tait
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Mcguigan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Germaine Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Bregard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Meno
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Maes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayethaniel Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Frahm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty (I) Bregard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Farris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Marucci
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Medina
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tocarra Laster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Caldera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Baker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Barnette
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverio Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cuppy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Millar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roi Moehring
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Tait
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arnold
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael (I) Howells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hartley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Warriax
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Daniels
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Otto
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Covington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Heim
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellie Cuppy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittny Vasquez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria (I) Brambila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymondo Torres
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Torrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Marucci
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Porras
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ochoa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pacheco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce (I) Covington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Baker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hicks-Rimel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Gordon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Goergen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuan Lepp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Holt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Vanhorne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheyenne Gaster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Stoyanova
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Hill
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Greenfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Valdez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Rowley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Huggins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Bishop
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Palacios
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Collick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rowley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brautigan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Canitz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard Pace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tito Haley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamela Duran
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Buterbaugh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Vanley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Largent
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Berwick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith (I) Puglisi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domanick (I) Castellanos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda (I) Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianna Devries
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna (I) Tait
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aecha Devereaux
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber L Borata
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Keach
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Alvarez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Cotton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domanick Castellanos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Marquez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Collier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Lorenzana
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Alvarez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler Digirolamo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Bregard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pauley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsea Schnieders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaida Cardenas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Pace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pethtel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Hilleren
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Giron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Pratt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelle Rank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icela Howard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Espinoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Arnold
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolay Ginkv
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Edmonds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Bailey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Madden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daylon Cortez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Gunsenhouser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Purye
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Magariner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orrette Shelton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fish
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Bainbridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Bailey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy (I) Goergen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Detemple
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Howard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Puglisi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilalak Warriax
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashleye Damuth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Shelstad
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gregor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Galbearth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Huggins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Strehl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieann Gardner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidy Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Hancock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tracy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachele Rank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony (I) Edmonds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Webb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fahra Bowman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ross
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Sargent
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia (I) Marquez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Desantos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Brambila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Bishop
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Gabbard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph (I) Huggins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla (I) Farris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Hoder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Collick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi (I) Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty (I) Huggins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Bowman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber (I) L. Borata
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Orcutt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Duran
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilian Wojcik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Levasseur
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine (I) Germaine Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bainbridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Susan Bevington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah (I) Susan Bevington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ja'shon Hoder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Mcnutt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phastima Laird
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Rambeau
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riddlon Durazo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrilee Mccolgan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad (I) Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance