Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Wood et al
Plaintiff: Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Charles David Wood, Jr, AMS Staff Leasing, Inc., Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc., Highpoint Risk Services, LLC, Aspen Administrators, Inc. and AMS Staff Leasing II, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv03719
Filed: September 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 425 OPINION AND ORDER ON ACTUARIAL REPORT. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/7/2017. (cbru, )
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 OPINION and ORDER on Non-Jury Issues. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/20/2017. (cbru, )
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and finding as moot in part 293 MOTION in Limine. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/20/2017. (cbru, )
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 OPINION and ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and finding as moot in part 287 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony Regarding Companion's Claims Handling and Reserves Process. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/19/2017. (cbru, )
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 OPINION AND ORDER denying 200 MOTION to Seal Document, 218 MOTION to Seal Document, 240 MOTION to Seal Document, 244 MOTION to Seal Document, 248 MOTION to Seal Document, 250 MOTION to Seal Document (Plaintiff's exhibits and unredacted memoranda due by 3/7/2017, Defendants' exhibits and unredacted memoranda due by 3/28/2017) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/23/2017. (cbru, )
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 OPINION AND ORDER denying 199 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 202 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 239 Motion to Strike; denying 252 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/10/2017.(cbru, )
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 94 Motion for Clarification; Continuing and Clarifying Stay. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/7/2016.(cbru, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Wood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles David Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMS Staff Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highpoint Risk Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMS Staff Leasing II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?