Jordan v. Wilson et al

Plaintiff: Diana Jordan
Defendant: John Mobley, John Tate, Lir Derieg, Benjamin Stitely, Alan Wilson and EB McLeod
Case Number: 3:2019cv01518
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation by Diana Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mflo, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #7 Order, and 9 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail to Diana Jordan (bgoo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, South Carolina 29201. (bgoo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the Plaintiff's #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis be denied. In the event Plaintiff pays the filing fee, the undersigned recommends the district judge dismiss this case without prejudice to file in an appropriate court and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 5/28/2019. (bgoo)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 5/28/2019. (bgoo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Diana Jordan. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diana Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lir Derieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Stitely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?