G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Darrel's Place Inc et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc and G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Defendant: George McCarthy, Donald Torrence, Darrel's Place Inc and Michelle Gilliam
Case Number: 3:2019cv01988
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Darrel's Place, Inc. d/b/a Darrell's Place, Donald Torrence, Michelle Gilliam, and George McCarthy by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Licensing Agreement, #3 Affidavit of Nicolas Gagliardi, #4 Affidavit of Carl Young, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Eric C. Hale)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hale, Eric)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Damages Hearing set for 9/18/2019 02:30 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Darrel's Place Inc, Michelle Gilliam, George McCarthy, Donald Torrence. (mflo, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to all Defendants byG&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric C. Hale in Support of Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Hale, Eric)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC on #7 amended complaint. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Darrels Place, Inc. d/b/a Darrells Place, #2 Affidavit of Service as to Donald Torrence, #3 Affidavit of Service as to Michelle Gilliam, #4 Affidavit of Service as to George McCarthy)(Hale, Eric) Modified on 8/1/2019 to add text (mflo, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to George McCarthy. (bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Michelle Gilliam. (bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Donald Torrence. (bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Darrel's Place Inc. (bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. (bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC.(bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. Service due by 10/15/2019(Hale, Eric). Modified on 7/18/2019 to delete attachments and file separately on case docket(bshr, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Darrel's Place Inc, Michelle Gilliam, George McCarthy, Donald Torrence. (mflo, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 No Corporate parents, subsidiaries of affiliates by J & J Sports Productions Inc.(mflo, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J & J Sports Productions Inc.(mflo, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darrel's Place Inc, Michelle Gilliam, George McCarthy, Donald Torrence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8561105.), filed by J & J Sports Productions Inc. Service due by 10/15/2019(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Darrel's Place Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Eric C Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Represented By: Eric C Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Torrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel's Place Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?