Kraim Wilson v. Richland County Sheriff Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim Wilson
Defendant: The State, Richland Springs, Mayor Steve Benjamin, City of Columbia Police Department and Richland County Sheriff Dept.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02912
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, #11 Order, returned summons from 5 and returned USM-285 from 5 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim Wilson 1601 Assembly Street Columbia, SC 29201. (mmcd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting plaintiff twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) that corrects the deficiencies identified in this order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that corrects those deficiencies, this action will be recommended for summary dismissal. (Amended Complaint due by 10/22/2020.Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/1/2020. (mmcd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 10/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/1/2020. (mmcd)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (mmcd) Modified on 8/14/2020 to correct document number (mmcd).
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2) (mmcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim Wilson. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (mmcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraim Wilson v. Richland County Sheriff Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indigo Ocean Rose Kraim Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Steve Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbia Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?