Drummond v. Spartanburg County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Edward Drummond
Defendant: Spartanburg County Jail, Sargent Blackwell, Neal Urch, Asley McCann, Det Brock and Det Reyes
Case Number: 5:2015cv04713
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court overrules Plaintiff's objections, adopts the Report 148 , and incorporates it herein.Therefore, it is the judgment of this Court Defendants' Amended Motion for Su mmary Judgment 138 is GRANTED, Plaintiff's state claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE so Plaintiff can bring those claims in state court if he wishes to do so, and Plaintiff's motions for summary judgment 121 , 142 are DENIED. Consequently, Plaintiff's motion concerning medical records is RENDERED MOOT.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 07/11/2017. (dsto, )
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 116 ), and incorporates it herein. Therefore, it is the judgment of this Court Defendants' motion for summary judgment (E CF No. 93 ) is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims for denial of access to courts and medical indifference, and DENIED as to Plaintiff's claims related to due process; and Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (ECF No. 115 ) is DENIE D.As per the Magistrate Judge's suggestion Defendants shall be provided an opportunity to submit additional briefing concerning Plaintiff's housing/classification and conditions of confinement claims in light of Dilworth. The Court will leave the briefing schedule of these matters to the sound discretion of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/25/2017. (mcot, )
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 53 Motion to Protect and/or Seal Whistle Blower; 59 Motion for Mediation, Motion to File Documents under Seal; 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting 54 , 81 Motions for Issuance of Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/1/2016. (mcot, )
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: The undersigned grants Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, ECF No. 44 ; grants in part (as to claim for punitive damages) and denies in part Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, ECF No. 47 ; denies Motion to Amend, ECF No.[ 55]; and denies Motion to Amend, ECF No. 60 . The undersigned denies Plaintiff's Motion for Conspiracy and Special Verdict, ECF No. 52 . The Clerk is instructed to docket ECF No. 44 as a supplemental pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Up on attachment by the Clerk, Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Supplemental Pleadings in accordance with Rule 15(a)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants' time to respond will begin and service will b e effected when the Clerk dockets the supplemental pleading.Plaintiff is hereby advised that the time to amend his Complaint is over, and the court will not consider any other Motions to Amend absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 06/24/2016.(dsto, )
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Plaintiff's action against Defendant McDonald is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/23/2016. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond v. Spartanburg County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Urch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asley McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?